Conchado et al v. Kauff's, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ahmad Jones, Antonio Sturgis, David Devito and Yosbrey Conchado
Defendant: Francis Geoffrey Russell, Geoffrey Russell, Kauff's, Inc., Geoff Russell and Guardian Fleet Services, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80344
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDERSETTING TRIAL DATE : ( Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 10/21/2020 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge United States Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order, pursuant to Local Rule 16.1.B, for the purpose of setting pre-trial deadline dates, for determining possible consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge for trial, and for the purpose of setting any settlement conferences in lieu of or in addition to mediation if the partiesso request. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 27, 2020 Filing 23 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Francis Geoffrey Russell. (Zinkil, Melissa)
April 27, 2020 Filing 22 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Guardian Fleet Services, Inc., Kauff's, Inc.. (Zinkil, Melissa)
April 24, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Certify Class Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice to Similarly Situated Employees filed by Guardian Fleet Services, Inc., Kauff's, Inc., Francis Geoffrey Russell. Replies due by 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Marvin "Gene" Craig)(Zinkil, Melissa)
April 10, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Certify Class Motion to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice to Similarly Situated Employees by Yosbrey Conchado, David Devito, Ahmad Jones, Antonio Sturgis. Responses due by 4/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Daniel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guardian Fleet Services, Inc., Kauff's, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Guardian Fleet Services, Inc. for Kauff's, Inc.; Other Affiliate Guardian Transportation Inc., Other Affiliate Crockett's Companies, LLC, Other Affiliate ESOP - Guardian Fleet Services, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust for Guardian Fleet Services, Inc. (Zinkil, Melissa)
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 Defendants Kauff's, Inc. and Guardian Fleet Services, Inc.'s ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Guardian Fleet Services, Inc., Kauff's, Inc.. (Zinkil, Melissa)
April 9, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant Francis Geoffrey Russell's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Francis Geoffrey Russell. (Zinkil, Melissa)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney John D. Cox; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Scott D. Spiegel. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 4/1/2020. (jdr) Modified to correct attorney last name entered on 4/1/2020 (jc).
April 1, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Scott D. Spiegel. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12683352 by Guardian Fleet Services, Inc., Kauff's, Inc., Francis Geoffrey Russell. Responses due by 4/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Certification of Payment of Admission Fee, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zinkil, Melissa)
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John D. Cox. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12683205 by Guardian Fleet Services, Inc., Kauff's, Inc., Francis Geoffrey Russell. Responses due by 4/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Certification of Payment of Admission Fee, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Zinkil, Melissa)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #12 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs served their Complaint upon Defendants Kauff and Guardian on March 5, 2020, and upon Defendant Russell on March 9, 2020. (DE #12 at 2). Therefore, Defendants Kauff's and Guardian's responses to the Complaint are due by March 26, 2020, and Defendant Russell's response is due by March 30, 2020. In the present Motion, Defendants request that the deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint be extended to April 15, 2020. Defendants make this request because their counsel was retained yesterday and because Covid-19 is delaying counsel's ability to investigate the allegations in Plaintiffs' Complaint. (DE #12 at 2). Under these circumstances, I find good cause to grant a limited extension; Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to April 9, 2020. Finally, I am sensitive to the challenges lawyers are facing as a result of Covid-19. However, I will not grant wholesale continuances of any deadline based upon generalizations. The Parties are advised that extensions will not be granted absent a showing of good cause supported by specific facts. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/25/2020. (jdr)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Guardian Fleet Services, Inc., Kauff's, Inc., Francis Geoffrey Russell. Attorney Melissa Segarra Zinkil added to party Guardian Fleet Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Segarra Zinkil added to party Kauff's, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Melissa Segarra Zinkil added to party Francis Geoffrey Russell(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zinkil, Melissa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ahmad Jones, Yosbrey Conchado, Antonio Sturgis, David Devito. Francis Geoffrey Russell served on 3/9/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Levine, Daniel)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ahmad Jones, Yosbrey Conchado, Antonio Sturgis, David Devito. Guardian Fleet Services, Inc. served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Levine, Daniel)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Ahmad Jones, Yosbrey Conchado, Antonio Sturgis, David Devito. Kauff's, Inc. served on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Levine, Daniel)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. On March 2, 2020, Plaintiffs filed this FLSA case as a collective action. (DE #1 ). The next day, Plaintiffs moved for conditional certification. (DE #7 ). The Motion does not contain a certificate of service and it is unclear whether Defendants were served with the Motion. Additionally, no summons has been returned executed as to any of the Defendants. Therefore, it is also unclear whether Defendants have been served. As a result, I will deny the Motion for Conditional Certification without prejudice. Plaintiffs may refile the Motion once Defendants appear in this matter or default. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/17/2020. (jdr)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Certify Class to Conditionally Certify Collective Action and Facilitate Notice to Similarly Situated Employees by Yosbrey Conchado, David Devito, Ahmad Jones, Antonio Sturgis. Responses due by 3/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Notification, #2 Exhibit B - Declarations)(Levine, Daniel)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Daniel R. Levine on behalf of Yosbrey Conchado, David Devito, Ahmad Jones, Antonio Sturgis (Attachments: #1 Consent - Yosbrey Conchado, #2 Consent - David Devito, #3 Consent - Antonio Sturgis, #4 Consent - Ahmad Jones) (Levine, Daniel)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Francis Geoffrey Russell. (drz)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Guardian Fleet Services, Inc. (drz)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kauff's, Inc. (drz)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Collective Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against Guardian Fleet Services, Inc., Kauff's, Inc., Francis Geoffrey Russell. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12536189, filed by Ahmad Jones, Yosbrey Conchado, Antonio Sturgis, David Devito. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Kauff's, #3 Summon(s) Guardian, #4 Summon(s) Russell)(Levine, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conchado et al v. Kauff's, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Geoffrey Russell
Represented By: John D. Cox
Represented By: Melissa Segarra Zinkil
Represented By: Scott D. Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Russell
Represented By: John D. Cox
Represented By: Melissa Segarra Zinkil
Represented By: Scott D. Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kauff's, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Cox
Represented By: Melissa Segarra Zinkil
Represented By: Scott D. Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoff Russell
Represented By: John D. Cox
Represented By: Melissa Segarra Zinkil
Represented By: Scott D. Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Fleet Services, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Cox
Represented By: Melissa Segarra Zinkil
Represented By: Scott D. Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Jones
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Sturgis
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Devito
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yosbrey Conchado
Represented By: Daniel R. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?