Herbert Souza et al v. Sanofi-Aventis, U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sara Souza and Herbert Souza
Defendant: Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi-Aventis US Services, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80368
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PRETRIAL ORDER #1 Setting Initial Conference. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 51 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of California. Case Number 5:19-cv-02161 with documents 1-47. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-80368-RLR on 3/3/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 49 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 48 Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 5:19-cv-02161. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
February 21, 2020 Filing 47 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2924, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
February 21, 2020 Filing 46 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Stay #37 is taken off the 2/27/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 2/27/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 10, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sanofi-Aventis US Services answer now due 3/13/2020; Sanofi-Aventis, U.S. LLC answer now due 3/13/2020; Chattem, Inc. answer now due 3/13/2020; Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. answer now due 3/13/2020; GlaxoSmithKline LLC. answer now due 3/13/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Sanofi-Aventis US Services; Sanofi-Aventis, U.S. LLC; Chattem, Inc..(Attorney Christopher M Young added to party Chattem, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher M Young added to party Sanofi-Aventis US Services(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher M Young added to party Sanofi-Aventis, U.S. LLC(pty:dft))(Young, Christopher)
January 31, 2020 Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Pursuant to the Response and Proofs of Service filed, the Order to Show Cause #36 is hereby discharged.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 30, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF 36) filed by plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Stanoch, David)
January 30, 2020 Filing 42 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza, upon Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dave Bulakowski, Agent, CSC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Stanoch, David)
January 30, 2020 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza, upon Defendant Chattem, Inc. served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cathy Jones, Agent, CSC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Stanoch, David)
January 30, 2020 Filing 40 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza, upon Defendant Sanofi-Aventis, U.S. LLC served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lisa Constant, Customer Service Associate, CSC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Stanoch, David)
January 30, 2020 Filing 39 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza, upon Defendant Sanofi-Aventis US Services served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lisa Constant, Customer Service Associate, CSC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Stanoch, David)
January 30, 2020 Filing 38 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza, upon Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gary Scappini, Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Stanoch, David)
January 29, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending All Deadlines Pending JPML Decision filed by plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order) (Stanoch, David)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/5/2020. (vdr)
January 9, 2020 Filing 35 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC., Sanofi-Aventis US Services, Sanofi-Aventis, U.S. LLC. (iv)
January 8, 2020 Filing 34 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Kanner, Allan)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Ruben Honik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Herbert Souza and Sara Souza, designating Behram Parekh as local counsel #32 . (iv)
December 30, 2019 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ruben Honik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 12/16/2019, Receipt No. 26M79FDN) filed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Parekh, Behram)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Herbert Souza and Sara Souza, designating Behram Parekh as local counsel #30 . (iv)
December 19, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 11/20/2019, Receipt No. 26LLCD5T) filed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Parekh, Behram)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: The Application of Non-Resident Attorney Ruben Honik to Appear Pro Hac Vice #27 is stricken for failure to comply with the Local Rules. See Notice of Deficiency #28 . (cw)
December 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ruben Honik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24960652) #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
December 16, 2019 Filing 27 **STRICKEN** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ruben Honik to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24960652) filed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Parekh, Behram) Modified on 12/18/2019 (cw).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Marlene J Goldenberg APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza and Sara Souza, designating Behram V. Parekh as local counsel. (et)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Layne C Hilton APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza and Sara Souza, designating Behram V. Parekh as local counsel. (et)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Conlee S Whiteley APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza and Sara Souza, designating Behram V. Parekh as local counsel. (et)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Annemieke M. Tennis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza and Sara Souza, designating Behram V. Parekh as local counsel. (et)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Application of Non-Resident Attorney David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza is stricken for failure to comply with the Local Rules. See Notice of Deficiency #20 . (cw)
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24819394) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NJ missing. (lt)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marlene J. Goldenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24824421) filed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Parekh, Behram)
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 **STRICKEN** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. Stanoch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24819394) filed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Parekh, Behram) Modified on 11/26/2019 (cw).
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Layne C. Hilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24811618) filed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Parekh, Behram)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Conlee S. Whiteley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24811548) filed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Parekh, Behram)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Annemieke M. Tennis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24811420) filed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Attachments: #1 Order) (Parekh, Behram)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-02161 FMO(SPx). (rn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza, (Parekh, Behram)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Behram V Parekh on behalf of Plaintiffs Herbert Souza, Sara Souza (Attorney Behram V Parekh added to party Herbert Souza(pty:pla), Attorney Behram V Parekh added to party Sara Souza(pty:pla))(Parekh, Behram)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ruben Honik. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Marlene J Goldenberg. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Layne Hilton. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John R Davis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David J Stanoch. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Conlee S Whiteley. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Annemieke Tennis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24755546 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Herbert Souza, Sara Souza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Allan Kanner added to party Herbert Souza(pty:pla), Attorney Allan Kanner added to party Sara Souza(pty:pla))(Kanner, Allan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbert Souza et al v. Sanofi-Aventis, U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Souza
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: David J. Stanoch
Represented By: Conlee S. Whiteley
Represented By: Ruben Honik
Represented By: Layne C. Hilton
Represented By: Marlene J. Goldenberg
Represented By: Behram V. Parekh
Represented By: Annemieke M. Tennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Souza
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: David J. Stanoch
Represented By: Conlee S. Whiteley
Represented By: Ruben Honik
Represented By: Layne C. Hilton
Represented By: Marlene J. Goldenberg
Represented By: Behram V. Parekh
Represented By: Annemieke M. Tennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis US Services
Represented By: Christopher M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?