Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al v. Newton Group Transfers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America and The Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Newton Group Exit, LLC, Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc., The Newton Group ESA LLC, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Interval Broker Direct, LLC, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Newton Group Transfers, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC and Shell Vacations, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv80402
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 73 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Murphy, Eugene) Modified text on 7/28/2021 (ebz).
June 28, 2021 Filing 72 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Rodney A. Max. Disposition: Settled in full.(Max, Rodney)
June 27, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 25, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Settlement by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Murphy, Eugene)
March 26, 2021 Filing 69 Plaintiff's REPLY to Defendants Opposition by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Murphy, Eugene)
March 26, 2021 Filing 68 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #67 Statement to Defendants Rule 56.1 Statement of "Additional Facts" by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Murphy, Eugene)
March 11, 2021 Filing 67 Statement of: OF MATERIAL FACTS RULE 56.1 by Newton Group Exit, LLC re #65 Statement, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of T. Panopoulos, #2 Exhibit Underwriting Guidelines)(Hubbard, Robert)
March 11, 2021 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law filed by Newton Group Exit, LLC. Replies due by 3/18/2021. (Hubbard, Robert)
February 17, 2021 Filing 65 Statement of: Material Facts Rule 56.1 by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America re #64 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1 Declaration to 56.1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Murphy, Eugene)
February 17, 2021 Filing 64 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 3/3/2021 (Murphy, Eugene)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #62 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions Today. Plaintiffs shall file their dispositive motion by 5:00 p.m. on February 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 2/17/2021. (cbn)
February 17, 2021 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Dispositive Motions today by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 3/3/2021 (Murphy, Eugene)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying #59 Motion To Extend Deadlines And Setting Briefing Schedule. Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2021. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 2/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 2, 2021 Filing 60 MEDIATION REPORT by Rodney A. Max. Disposition: Adjourned.(Max, Rodney)
January 29, 2021 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time DEADLINES re #42 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by Newton Group Exit, LLC. Responses due by 2/12/2021 (Hubbard, Robert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 58 MEDIATION REPORT by Rodney A. Max. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Max, Rodney)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #56 Renewed Joint Motion to Conduct Mediation Virtually. The parties shall make very effort to mediate via video-conference, not telephone. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 11/17/20. (cbn)
November 17, 2020 Filing 56 Joint MOTION To Conduct Mediation Virtually re #42 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Murphy, Eugene)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying #51 Wyndham's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
October 16, 2020 Filing 54 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The Hearing was held by Zoom Video Teleconference. Motion Hearing by Zoom Video held on 10/16/2020 re #51 Wyndham Defendants' Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions. Argument held. The Court took the matter under advisement. Written order to be issued. Total time in court: 27 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eugene P. Murphy for Plaintiff, Christian Michael Leger for the Wyndham Defendants. (Digital 10:33:13) (kza)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER SETTING HEARING VIA ZOOM VIDEO TELECONFERENCE (VTC): Set Hearing as to #51 Wyndham Defendants' Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions. (Motion Hearing Via Zoom Video set for 10/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 9/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
September 9, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #51 MOTION for Sanctions Wyndham Defendants' Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Wyndham Defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Replies due by 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murphy, Eugene)
August 26, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Sanctions Wyndham Defendants' Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bennington, Alfred)
August 25, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Scheduling Mediation by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America re #43 Order Referring Case to Mediation Notice of Scheduling Mediation (Murphy, Eugene) Modified text on 8/26/2020 (kpe).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #48 Joint Motion to Conduct Mediation Virtually. The situation with Covid-19 is constantly changing. The parties have until February 1, 2021 to complete mediation. The parties shall schedule their mediation, in accordance with the Court's prior order, and may file a new motion to attend mediation virtually within one month of the scheduled mediation, at which time the Court will assess the Covid-19 situation and any related restrictions. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/21/2020. (cbn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 48 Joint MOTION to Conduct Mediation Virtually re #43 Order Referring Case to Mediation, #42 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Murphy, Eugene)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #46 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Scheduling Mediation. The parties shall file their Notice of Scheduling Mediation by August 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/18/20. (cbn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Scheduling Mediation re #43 Order Referring Case to Mediation by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 9/1/2020 (Murphy, Eugene)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Wyndham Defendants' #21 Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint For Lack Of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER of Referral to Mediation. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Setting Civil Trial Date, Pretrial Deadlines, And Referral To Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Rodney Smith., Calendar Call set for 7/27/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Smith., Amended Pleadings due by 8/14/2020., Expert Discovery due by 1/29/2021., Fact Discovery due by 12/15/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/14/2020., Mediation Deadline 2/1/2021., In Limine Motions due by 4/26/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 2/16/2021., Motions due by 4/26/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/25/2021.) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 22, 2020 Filing 41 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. (Bennington, Alfred)
May 22, 2020 Filing 40 Joint Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Murphy, Eugene)
May 22, 2020 Filing 39 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Eugene)
May 22, 2020 Filing 38 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Murphy, Eugene)
May 22, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Striking 36 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, #34 Notice (Other) filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Murphy, Eugene)
May 22, 2020 Filing 36 Clerks Notice to Filer re #34 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents are entered. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (kpe)
May 22, 2020 Filing 35 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Interval Broker Direct, LLC, Newton Group Exit, LLC, Newton Group Transfers, LLC, The Newton Group ESA LLC (Hubbard, Robert)
May 22, 2020 Filing 34 STRICKEN NOTICE by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America re #20 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificate of Interested Parties (Murphy, Eugene) Modified on 5/26/2020 per DE #37 Notice(kpe).
May 22, 2020 Filing 33 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Company, Inc, Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Casualty and Surety Company for The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Murphy, Eugene)
May 22, 2020 Filing 32 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Keown, Lindy)
May 19, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #17 Amended Complaint, filed by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Shell Vacations, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Wyndham Resort Development Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft). (Leger, Christian)
May 14, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Newton Group Exit, LLC. Attorney Robert C Hubbard added to party Newton Group Exit, LLC(pty:dft). (Hubbard, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Interval Broker Direct, LLC. Attorney Robert C Hubbard added to party Interval Broker Direct, LLC(pty:dft). (Hubbard, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Newton Group Transfers, LLC. Attorney Robert C Hubbard added to party Newton Group Transfers, LLC(pty:dft). (Hubbard, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #17 Amended Complaint, filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Replies due by 5/19/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 29, 2020 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Newton Group Transfers, LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 29, 2020 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. The Newton Group ESA LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 29, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Newton Group Exit, LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 29, 2020 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Interval Broker Direct, LLC waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by The Newton Group ESA LLC. Attorney Robert C Hubbard added to party The Newton Group ESA LLC(pty:dft). (Hubbard, Robert)
April 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #17 Amended Complaint, by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Responses due by 5/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bennington, Alfred)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates Of Interested Parties And Corporate Disclosure Statements. (Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates Of Interested Parties And Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 5/22/2020) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 22, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC. (Keown, Lindy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. (Keown, Lindy)
April 14, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants, filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Diamond Complaint, #2 Exhibit Wyndham complaint, #3 Exhibit Composite Denial Letters, #4 Exhibit Policy, #5 Exhibit Excess Policy)(Murphy, Eugene)
April 14, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company for Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC (Crossland, Brandon)
April 14, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diamond Resorts Developer and Sales Holding Company for Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC (Crossland, Brandon)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc. served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Wyndham Resort Development Corporation served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. Newton Group Exit, LLC served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Murphy, Eugene)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC. Attorney Lindy Kathryn Keown added to party Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC(pty:dft). (Keown, Lindy)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant, Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Develoopment, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC. Attorney Lindy Kathryn Keown added to party Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC(pty:dft). (Keown, Lindy)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., and Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc. shall file their response to the Complaint by April 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/7/2020. (cbn)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Shell Vacations, LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. Attorney Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr added to party Shell Vacations, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr added to party Wyndham Resort Development Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr added to party Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr added to party Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft). (Bennington, Alfred)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC, Interval Broker Direct, LLC, Newton Group Exit, LLC, Newton Group Transfers, LLC, Shell Vacations, LLC, The Newton Group ESA LLC, Wyndham Resort Development Corporation, Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.. (kpe)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s)) (Murphy, Eugene)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pcs)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12568611, filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit d, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America et al v. Newton Group Transfers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton Group Exit, LLC
Represented By: Robert C Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Christian Michael Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Newton Group ESA LLC
Represented By: Robert C Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Christian Michael Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interval Broker Direct, LLC
Represented By: Robert C Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Represented By: Brandon Thomas Crossland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Resort Development Corporation
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Christian Michael Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newton Group Transfers, LLC
Represented By: Robert C Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts U.S. Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Represented By: Brandon Thomas Crossland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Vacations, LLC
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Christian Michael Leger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Eugene P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Eugene P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?