Fedorov et al v. Bank of America N.A., et al
Plaintiff: Remington Edward Howell, Damon Reed Fedorov-Howell-Karriem and Alexandre Fedorov
Defendant: Bank of America N.A., et al
Case Number: 9:2020cv80409
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America N.A., et al filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Alexandre Fedorov, Remington Edward Howell, Damon Reed Fedorov-Howell-Karriem.(cds)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Denying #3 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program ( Amended Complaint due by 4/15/2020.). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 3/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexandre Fedorov. (jbs)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Alexandre Fedorov to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: Alexandre.Fedorov@ProtonMail.com (jbs)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Remington Edward Howell to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: Remington.Howell@ProtonMail.com (jbs)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Damon Reed Fedorov-Howell-Karriem to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: Damon.Fedorov.Howell.Karriemi@ProtonMail.com (jbs)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Alexandre Fedorov. (jbs)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 (DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PER DE#8 ) COMPLAINT against Bank of America N.A., et al. IFP Filed, filed by Alexandre Fedorov, Remington Edward Howell, Damon Reed Fedorov-Howell-Karriem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(jbs) Text Modified on 3/27/2020 (cds).
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fedorov et al v. Bank of America N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remington Edward Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Reed Fedorov-Howell-Karriem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandre Fedorov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?