Pure Pools, Inc. v. Oxygen Pools, LLC
Plaintiff: Pure Pools, Inc.
Defendant: David Stuart
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Oxygen Pools, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv80426
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 Third Party Summons Issued as to David Stuart. (ls)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) directed to Third Party Defendant, David Stuart, by Oxygen Pools, LLC re #12 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Oxygen Pools, LLC (Moreno Kostencki, Euyelit)
April 29, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against David Stuart, COUNTERCLAIM against Pure Pools, Inc. by Oxygen Pools, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Moreno Kostencki, Euyelit)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Clerk's Default. The Clerk's Entry of Default DE #9 is VACATED. Defendant shall separately electronically file its answer, affirmative defenses, and counterclaim in the record. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION to Set Aside Default [DE9] by Oxygen Pools, LLC. Attorney Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki added to party Oxygen Pools, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Moreno Kostencki, Euyelit)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 (VACATED per DE #11 ) Clerks Entry of Default as to Oxygen Pools, LLC, - Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/13/2020. (ls) Modified text on 4/29/2020 (mc).
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Oxygen Pools, LLC by Pure Pools, Inc.. (Gilchrist, Brian)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Pure Pools, Inc.. Oxygen Pools, LLC served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (Gilchrist, Brian)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pure Pools, Inc. (Gilchrist, Brian)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Supplement Complaint) (jao)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Oxygen Pools, LLC. (jao)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oxygen Pools, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12599763, filed by Pure Pools, Inc., d/b/a API. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gilchrist, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Pools, Inc. v. Oxygen Pools, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Pools, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T. Santurri
Represented By: Brian Roy Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Oxygen Pools, LLC
Represented By: Euyelit Adriana Moreno Kostencki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stuart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?