Gustin v. Suntrust Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Robin Gustin
Defendant: Suntrust Bank N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Capital One, N.A., Truist Bank, Wells Fargo, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., SunTrust Bank, Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Bank of America and Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 9:2020cv80756
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #10 and #14 Motions to Dismiss. The above-styled action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
June 16, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Bideau, Mark)
June 15, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bank of America, Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., SunTrust Bank, Wells Fargo Bank. (McKeever, Kristen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristen Lee McKeever on behalf of Bank of America, Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Wells Fargo Bank. Attorney Kristen Lee McKeever added to party Bank of America(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Lee McKeever added to party Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Lee McKeever added to party Wells Fargo Bank(pty:dft). (McKeever, Kristen)
June 10, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank (Segal, Tracy)
June 10, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA) N.A. (Segal, Tracy)
June 10, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America (Segal, Tracy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by Robin Gustin. Replies due by 6/16/2020. (scn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Robin Gustin. Replies due by 6/16/2020. (scn)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
June 1, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation for SunTrust Bank (Kaufman, Dora)
June 1, 2020 Filing 18 Clerks Notice to Filer re #17 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
June 1, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank (Kaufman, Dora)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Rose Cordero Prey. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/1/2020. (jdr)
May 29, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Bideau, Mark)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 6/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Bideau, Mark)
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Bideau, Mark)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rose Cordero Prey. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12955962 by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 6/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bideau, Mark)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bank of America, Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., SunTrust Bank, Wells Fargo Bank. Responses due by 6/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Fifth Am. Compl. [ECF No. 82], Case No. 9:19-cv-80291 (S.D. Fla.), #3 Exhibit C: Opinion and Order [ECF No. 133], Case 1:14-cv-01516 (N.D. Ga.), #4 Exhibit D: Order [ECF No. 243], Case No. 1:14-cv-01516 (N.D. Ga.), #5 Exhibit E: Order and Amended Judgment [ECF No. 1:14-cv-01516 (N.D. Ga.), #6 Exhibit F: Opinion [ECF No. 44-2], Case No. 17-2368 (Fed. Cir.), #7 Exhibit G: Opinion [ECF No. 64-2], Case No. 17-1396 (Fed. Cir.), #8 Exhibit H: Parascript Declaration, #9 Exhibit I: Order on Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 99], Case No. 9:19-cv-80291 (S.D. Fla.))(Segal, Tracy)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION Request for Judicial Notice by Bank of America, Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., SunTrust Bank, Wells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D.E. 29, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #2 Exhibit D.E. 30, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #3 Exhibit D.E. 133, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #4 Exhibit D.E. 145, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #5 Exhibit D.E. 192, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #6 Exhibit D.E. 193, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #7 Exhibit D.E. 242, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #8 Exhibit D.E. 243, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #9 Exhibit D.E. 244, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #10 Exhibit D.E. 248, N.D. Ga., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #11 Exhibit D.E. 44-2, Fed. Cir., Case No. 17-2368, #12 Exhibit D.E. 64-2, Fed. Cir., Case No. 17-1396, #13 Exhibit D.E. 82, S.D. Fla., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #14 Exhibit D.E. 99, S.D. Fla., Case No. 19-cv-80291, #15 Exhibit D.E. 1, E.D. Tx., Case No. 12-cv-00604, #16 Exhibit D.E. 125, E.D. Tx., Case No. 12-cv-00604, #17 Exhibit D.E. 127, E.D. Tx., Case No. 12-cv-00604)(Segal, Tracy) Modified Text on 5/28/2020 (ls).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. (DE #4 ; DE #7 ). This case was was removed on May 7, 2020. (DE #1 ). Prior to removal, Defendants Truist and JPMorgan received extensions of time to respond to the Complaint. Those Defendants' responses are currently due by May 28 and 29, 2020, respectively. (See DE #4 at 1). In the present Motion, the remaining Defendants seek to extend their deadline to respond to the Complaint until May 28, 2020. (Id.) They make this request because they intend to coordinate with Truist and JPMorgan when preparing their responses. Under these circumstances, I find good cause to grant the requested extensions. Defendants Capital One's, Wells Fargo's, and Bank of America's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended until May 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/15/2020. (jdr)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 UNOPPOSITION to #4 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint)filed by Robin Gustin. Replies due by 5/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(scn)
May 12, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, . Responses due by 5/15/2020 (ls)(per DE #6)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED BRIEFING. Certain Defendants have filed a Motion in which they seek an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. (DE #14 ). The Court ORDERS expedited briefing on the Motion. Plaintiff must file any response to the Motion by May 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/12/2020. (jdr)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of Law Supporting Opposition and Oppose Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Robin Gustin. (scn)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, by Bank of America, Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Wells Fargo Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Agreed Order Granting Truist Bank's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Agreed Order Granting JP Morgan Chase Bank's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint, #3 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time)(Segal, Tracy)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Bank of America, Capital One Bank (USA) N.A., Wells Fargo Bank (Ackerman, David)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Robin Gustin v. Suntrust Bank, et al.) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12856207, filed by Capital One, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo, N.A. (No answer or mtn to dismiss filed) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Complaint in the State Court Action, #2 Exhibit 2, Civil Cover Sheet filed in State Court Action, #3 Exhibit 3, Declaration of Joel P. Howle, #4 Exhibit 4, Declaration of Robson D. Bassett, #5 Exhibit 5, Declaration of Van Beck, #6 Exhibit 6, JP Morgan Joinder and Consent, #7 Exhibit 7, Declaration of Christine Costamagna, #8 Exhibit 8. Returns of Service filed in the State Court Action, #9 Exhibit 9, State Court Action filings and docket., #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ackerman, David) Text Modified on 5/8/2020. (scn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gustin v. Suntrust Bank N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Rose Cordero Prey
Represented By: Mark Frederick Bideau
Represented By: Lindsay Laura Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N.A.
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Represented By: Jana Montiel
Represented By: Juan Aedo Gonzalez
Represented By: Dora Faye Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Jana Montiel
Represented By: Juan Aedo Gonzalez
Represented By: Dora Faye Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA) N.A.
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Represented By: Kristen Lee McKeever
Represented By: Tracy Tatnall Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Represented By: Kristen Lee McKeever
Represented By: Tracy Tatnall Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Represented By: Kristen Lee McKeever
Represented By: Tracy Tatnall Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Gustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?