Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80813
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CLOSING CASE. The above-styled action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE and DENY all pending motions AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Dismissal without Prejudice by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Ries, Heather)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, N.A., Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. (Davis, Catherine)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Ries, Heather)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jas)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. (Davis, Catherine)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION (Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2020., Discovery due by 11/2/2020., Fact Discovery due by 11/2/2020., Expert Discovery due by 11/2/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 7/27/2020., In Limine Motions due by 11/23/2020., Motions due by 11/23/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/4/2021., Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/27/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 6/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents, (BAC North America Holding Company (BACNAH).). Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jas)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 First Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. (Davis, Catherine)
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance by Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 6/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law)(Davis, Catherine)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Logan Davis on behalf of Bank of America, N.A.. Attorney Catherine Logan Davis added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft). (Davis, Catherine)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Bank of America, N.A. served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Ries, Heather)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE (Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/27/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A.. (ebz)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12902090, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Ries, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Heather Lena Ries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?