Maharaj v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Natalie Maharaj
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80868
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 First NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Meah Tell as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 9/24/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (Chaplin, James)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Meah Rothman Tell Mediation Hearing set for 9/24/2020 10:00 AM Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Meah Tell as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 9/24/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pena, Kelly)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 6/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 6/21/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 6/18/2021 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pena, Kelly)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Pena, Kelly)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - State Court Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12955925, filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Pena, Kelly) State Court Answer & Affirmative Defenses filed. Modified on 5/29/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maharaj v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Hammon
Represented By: Kelly Marie Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Maharaj
Represented By: Isidro Manuel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?