Fernandez v. Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Nelson Fernandez
Defendant: Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv80894
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 15 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Interbond Corporation d/b/a BrandsMart USA, Other Affiliate Bruce Perlman, Other Affiliate Michael Perlman for Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc. (Murphy, Hannesson)
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.. (Murphy, Hannesson)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nelson Fernandez (Hannah, Roderick)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/12/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/17/2020. (eca)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with Court's Order of June 8, 2020 re #5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.. Responses due by 7/31/2020 (Murphy, Hannesson)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Response/Answer due 7/29/2020. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/26/2020. (eca)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murphy, Hannesson)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc. (Murphy, Hannesson)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hannesson Ignatius Murphy on behalf of Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Hannesson Ignatius Murphy added to party Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Murphy, Hannesson)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nelson Fernandez. Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc. served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Hannah, Roderick)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/8/2020. (eca)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.. (cds)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12981813, filed by Nelson Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(Hannah, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brands Mart U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Hannesson Ignatius Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Fernandez
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?