JACOBS et al v. HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY JACOBS and HEATHER KOCH
Defendant: ANDREW GREENBAUM, HUDSON REAL ESTATE ADVISORS, LLC, MGM DELRAY, LLC, HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,, HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC,, HUDSON SUNDY HOUSE, LLC and STEVEN MICHAEL
Case Number: 9:2020cv80911
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 8/11/2020 Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 29, 2020 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Andrew Kamensky re #34 Notice of Change of Address. Attorney Andrew Kamensky is instructed to go to his PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating his information. https://www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (cw)
July 29, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew Kamensky (Kamensky, Andrew)
July 24, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: ANDREW GREENBAUM response due 8/4/2020; HUDSON REAL ESTATE ADVISORS, LLC response due 8/4/2020; HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC, response due 8/4/2020; HUDSON SUNDY HOUSE, LLC response due 8/4/2020; STEVEN MICHAEL response due 8/4/2020. SEE DE 33 ORDER (ail)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a single combined response or separate Answers in response to the Complaint #1 by August 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/23/2020. (btr)
July 21, 2020 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by ANDREW GREENBAUM, HUDSON REAL ESTATE ADVISORS, LLC, HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC,, HUDSON SUNDY HOUSE, LLC, STEVEN MICHAEL. Attorney John Spencer Jenkins added to party ANDREW GREENBAUM(pty:dft), Attorney John Spencer Jenkins added to party HUDSON REAL ESTATE ADVISORS, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Spencer Jenkins added to party HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC,(pty:dft), Attorney John Spencer Jenkins added to party HUDSON SUNDY HOUSE, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Spencer Jenkins added to party STEVEN MICHAEL(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jenkins, John)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC. Order Dismissing Party HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,, Motions terminated: DENIED as moot re #26 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint Count I filed by HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,, #25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and III of Complaint filed by HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,. Motions terminated: #25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and III of Complaint filed by HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,, #26 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint Count I filed by HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT MGM DELRAY, LLC. Defendant MGM Delray, LLC is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Defendant MGM Delray, LLC without prejudice by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH (Silver, James)
July 20, 2020 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC, by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH (Silver, James)
July 7, 2020 Filing 27 Clerks Notice to Filer re #26 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Count I of Complaint re #1 Complaint,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 7, 2020 Filing 26 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint Count I by HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,. Responses due by 7/21/2020 (Rubinstein, Craig) Modified Relief on 7/7/2020 (ls).
July 7, 2020 Filing 25 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Counts II and III of Complaint by HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,. Responses due by 7/21/2020 (Rubinstein, Craig)
June 23, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH. HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Silver, James)Text Modified on 6/24/2020 (ail).
June 23, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Striking #18 Summons Returned Executed, filed by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH (Silver, James)
June 23, 2020 Filing 22 Clerks Notice to Filer re #18 Summons Returned Executed. Document Does Not Match Served Party Selected; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the correct document for HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC. (ail)
June 22, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH. STEVEN MICHAEL served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Silver, James)
June 22, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH. HUDSON SUNDY HOUSE, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Silver, James)
June 22, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH. HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC, served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Silver, James)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 **DUPLICATE** SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH. HUDSON REAL ESTATE ADVISORS, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Duplicate of DE #17 ) (Silver, James)Text Modified on 6/23/2020 (ail).
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH. HUDSON REAL ESTATE ADVISORS, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (Wank, Jeffrey)
June 19, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Alan Rubinstein on behalf of HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,. Attorney Craig Alan Rubinstein added to party HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,(pty:dft). (Rubinstein, Craig)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #13 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see 14 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ail)
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH. ANDREW GREENBAUM served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. SEE DE #13 SUMMONS RETURNED (ail)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH. ANDREW GREENBAUM served on 6/11/2020, answer due 7/2/2020. (Silver, James)Deadlines Modified on 6/18/2020 (ail).
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Filer Entered two summonses for the Party, MGM Delray, LLC. (drz)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #10 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - Chambers and Clerks,. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (drz)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #5 Summons Issued, #7 Summons Issued, #6 Summons Issued, #8 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued, #4 Summons Issued, #9 Summons Issued. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (Wrong Case Number originally on summonses) (drz) Modified on 6/8/2020 (drz).(two summonses issued for one party) Modified on 6/8/2020 (asl).
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,. (drz) Modified on 6/8/2020 (asl).
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to STEVEN MICHAEL. (drz) Modified on 6/8/2020 (asl).
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to MGM DELRAY, LLC. (drz) Modified on 6/8/2020 (asl).
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC,. (drz) Modified on 6/8/2020 (asl).
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HUDSON SUNDY HOUSE, LLC. (drz) Modified on 6/8/2020 (asl).
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANDREW GREENBAUM. (drz) Modified on 6/8/2020 (asl).
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HUDSON REAL ESTATE ADVISORS, LLC. (drz) Modified on 6/8/2020 (asl).
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12990430, filed by TIMOTHY JACOBS, HEATHER KOCH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Exhibit)(Silver, James) Modified on 6/8/2020 (drz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACOBS et al v. HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY JACOBS
Represented By: James David Silver
Represented By: Andrew Kamensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER KOCH
Represented By: James David Silver
Represented By: Andrew Kamensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW GREENBAUM
Represented By: John Spencer Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON REAL ESTATE ADVISORS, LLC
Represented By: John Spencer Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM DELRAY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON REAL ESTATE MANAGER, LLC,
Represented By: Craig Alan Rubinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS, LLC,
Represented By: John Spencer Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDSON SUNDY HOUSE, LLC
Represented By: John Spencer Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN MICHAEL
Represented By: John Spencer Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?