U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. NICE Systems Inc
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: NICE Systems Inc
Intervenor Plaintiff: Stacey Malo
Case Number: 9:2020cv81021
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #18 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant seeks a 30-day extension of time in which to respond to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request to Produce. Plaintiff states that it agrees to a one week extension of this deadline, but opposes any further extension. Upon review, I find that a two-week extension is appropriate. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/28/2020. (gts)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Replies due by 9/4/2020. (Manrara Cartaya, Carmen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery by NICE Systems Inc. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merwin, Kathleen)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by NICE Systems Inc re #16 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order filed by NICE Systems Inc (Merwin, Kathleen)
August 19, 2020 Set/Reset Deadline as to #12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint . Responses due by 9/2/2020. SEE DE 15 ORDER (ail)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 **WITHDRAWN** Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order by NICE Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Merwin, Kathleen) Text Modified on 8/20/2020 per DE #17 Notice of Withdrawal (ail).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER revising (DE 14 ). The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DE #12 ) is extended from August 26, 2020 until September 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/18/2020. (gts)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff seeks an extension of the deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DE #12 ) and states in support that counsel has a pre-planned family vacation the week of August 17, 2020. I find good cause to grant the requested relief. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before August 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/18/2020. (gts)
August 16, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Manrara Cartaya, Carmen)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by NICE Systems Inc. Responses due by 8/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Merwin, Kathleen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Format of Production)(Manrara Cartaya, Carmen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Laura Bonn as Mediator. (Merwin, Kathleen)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING STACEY MALOS MOTION TO INTERVENE. ORDER granting #8 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene as Intervenor Plaintiff by Stacey Malo. Attorney Jamie Blythe Dokovna added to party Stacey Malo(pty:intvp). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Complaint in Intervention and Jury Demand, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dokovna, Jamie)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Adam Postman on behalf of NICE Systems Inc. Attorney Barry Adam Postman added to party NICE Systems Inc(pty:dft). (Postman, Barry)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathleen Marie Merwin on behalf of NICE Systems Inc. Attorney Kathleen Marie Merwin added to party NICE Systems Inc(pty:dft). (Merwin, Kathleen)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2020., Discovery due by 12/14/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/24/2020., In Limine Motions due by 12/28/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 12/28/2020., Motions due by 12/28/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/1/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 7/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 2/24/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NICE Systems Inc. (amb)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NICE Systems Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Manrara Cartaya, Carmen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. NICE Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Carmen Maria Manrara Cartaya
Represented By: Kristen M. Foslid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICE Systems Inc
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Merwin
Represented By: Barry Adam Postman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Stacey Malo
Represented By: Jamie Blythe Dokovna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?