Davis v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carl Davis
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81037
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of Iowa. Case Number 6:20-cv-02043 with documents 1-10. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81037-RLR on 7/2/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
July 2, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
July 2, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from Iowa Northern; Case Number 6:20-cv-02043. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-23) MDL No. 2924. This action is transferred to USDC Southern District of Florida and assigned to the Honorable Robin L Rosenberg. Signed by John W Nichols, Clerk of the Panel, on 7/01/2020 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Case electronically transferred to Western District of Missouri) (des)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc, Sanofi-Aventis US LLC Notice of Finalization of Transfer Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Notice of Finalization of Transfer Order) (Haas, Frances)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Stay filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc., Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and staying case: This case shall be stayed pending transfer to the MDL or, if objections to transfer are filed, pending the MDL's ruling on the transfer motion. If objections to transfer are filed, the parties should notify the court by filing a status report by July 15, 2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 6/26/2020. (kms)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's removed petition (Doc. 3) is extended for all Defendants to 07/27/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 06/25/2020. (KEM)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 UNRESISTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, Defendants' Unresisted Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Respond to Removed Petition by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc., Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Haas, Frances)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 UNRESISTED Motion for stay pending transfer to multidistrict litigation proceeding by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc., Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A to Motion) (Haas, Frances)
June 23, 2020 Set Deadlines: Defendants LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2020. (ksy)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKET Annotation: Attached is the New Removal Case Packet. (ksy)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 STATE Court Petition With Jury Demand by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc., Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (ksy)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 7/22/2020. (ksy)
June 22, 2020 Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. (No conflicts identified) (ksy)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court Black Hawk County, case number LACV140362. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AIANDC-3227567), filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutical Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 8/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Original Notice, #3 Exhibit Return of Service, #4 Exhibit Return of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Local Rule 81(a) Statement) (Haas, Frances)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Richard J. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Richard J. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Richard J. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Frances M. Haas
Represented By: Richard J. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Davis
Represented By: Steven D. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?