The 2100 Condominium Association, Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The 2100 Condominium Association, Inc.
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2020cv81080
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: William Matthewman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#13]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added John W. Salmon as Mediator. See image at DE #12 (lk)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Lexington Insurance Company Selection of Mediator (Kevlin, Anne)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The 2100 Condominium Association, Inc. (Marker, Shaun)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by The 2100 Condominium Association, Inc. (Marker, Shaun)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 8/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (kza)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Amended Order Setting Trial Date and Discovery Deadlines, Referring Case to Mediation, and Referring Discovery Motions to United States Magistrate Judge (Jury Trial set for 3/14/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 3/11/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for Discovery Matters. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow no longer assigned as presider/referral judge(s) in case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Trial Date and Discovery Deadlines, Referring Case to Mediation, and Referring Discovery Motions to United States Magistrate Judge (Jury Trial set for 3/14/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 3/11/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lexington Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Lexington Insurance Company (Kevlin, Anne)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Lexington Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kevlin, Anne)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lexington Insurance Company. (Kevlin, Anne)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Breach of Contract and Petition to Compel Appraisal) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13147258, filed by Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kevlin, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The 2100 Condominium Association, Inc. v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The 2100 Condominium Association, Inc.
Represented By: Shaun James Marker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Kevlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?