JPJ Services LLC v. HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Plaintiff: JPJ Services LLC a/a/o Sandra Aiken and JPJ Services LLC
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Case Number: 9:2020cv81085
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court acknowledges that Plaintiff filed a Notice of Filing Objection to Defendant's Amended Notice of Production From Non-Party #22 and Defendant filed a response to Plaintiff's Notice #25 . The parties are notified that there is no pending motion related to the issues discussed in the notice and response before the Court. Should the parties require Court resolution on a discovery dispute, they must raise the issue in accordance with the procedures set forth in the Court's Order Setting Discovery Procedure #17 . Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/4/2020. (jb02)
September 4, 2020 Filing 25 Defendant's RESPONSE to #22 Notice (Other) of Filing Objection to Defendant's August 12, 2020 Amended Notice of Non-Party Production to Sandra Aiken by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Errata Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Harwood, Susan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 24 Plaintiff's REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by JPJ Services LLC. (Whisler, Joshua)
August 28, 2020 Filing 23 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Steven Koeppel as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 03/04/2021 at 9:30 a.m.. (Harwood, Susan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by JPJ Services LLC NOTICE OF FILING OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS AMENDED NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (Whisler, Joshua)
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 Initial Disclosure(s) Rule 26 - Amended by JPJ Services LLC (Whisler, Joshua)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 Initial Disclosure(s) Rule 26 by JPJ Services LLC (Whisler, Joshua)
August 11, 2020 Filing 19 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. (Harwood, Susan)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by JPJ Services LLC (Whisler, Joshua)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 8/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/6/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 6/29/2021 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Amended Pleadings due by 9/22/2020., Discovery due by 3/9/2021., Expert Discovery due by 3/9/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 9/22/2020., Mediation Deadline 3/23/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2021., Motions due by 3/31/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/21/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 3/23/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for Pretrial and Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (yha) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the #14 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiff shall file the Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by August 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/3/2020. (kge)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPJ Services LLC. Responses due by 8/14/2020 (Whisler, Joshua)
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A to Joint Scheduling Report)(Harwood, Susan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by JPJ Services LLC.(Whisler, Joshua)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST (Harwood, Susan)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the #8 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. The Plaintiff shall file its Amended Complaint separately on the docket by July 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/29/2020. (kge)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST (Harwood, Susan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint or in the Alternative Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint by JPJ Services LLC. Responses due by 8/11/2020 (Whisler, Joshua)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall file a Reply by July 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/15/2020. (kge)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. Responses due by 7/28/2020 (Harwood, Susan) Modified Relief on 7/15/2020 (ls).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES; Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 7/31/2020 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. ( Removal Status Report due by 7/31/2020.) In addition to the Removal Status Report, counsel for the removing party must file copies of all records and proceedings before the state court by July 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - JPJ Services LLC a/a/o Sandra Aiken v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13149708, filed by HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Comoposite Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Composite Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Composite Exhibit G)(Harwood, Susan) Modified on 7/9/2020 (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPJ Services LLC v. HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST
Represented By: Susan Banks Harwood
Represented By: James Miller Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPJ Services LLC a/a/o Sandra Aiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPJ Services LLC
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Whisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?