Makhsous et al v. Mastroianni et al
Plaintiff: Xuejun Makhsous, Ying Yu, Xuezheng Ding, Lili Zhang, Jiangman Chen, Lingfeng Duan, Xiaofei Liu, Jane Doe 1-99, Zhizhen Yin, Shiangquan Sun and Lixing Yan
Defendant: 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, Ronald Fieldstone, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC and 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv81141
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On December 22, 2020, Defendants filed a Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (DE 35). To date, no response appears in the court file, and the deadline to respond expired on January 5, 2021. Accordingly, Plaintiffs shall show cause, in writing, on or before January 11, 2021 as to: (1) why the motion should not be granted; and (2) why they failed to submit a response before the filing deadline. Failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause may result in granting the Motion to Strike by default. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/7/2021. (kal)
January 4, 2021 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline of Proposed Amended Complaint against Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit Motion to Consolidate)(Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni) Modified to correct link on 1/5/2021 (jua).
January 4, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint [Memorandum of Law] filed by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. Replies due by 1/11/2021. (Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
December 22, 2020 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #35 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #34 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law [Declaration of Richard G. Haddad] filed by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
December 22, 2020 Filing 35 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #34 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. Responses due by 1/5/2021 (Kastrenakes Howard, Eleni)
December 19, 2020 Filing 34 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jiangman Chen, Xuezheng Ding, Lingfeng Duan, Jane Doe 1-99, Xiaofei Liu, Xuejun Makhsous, Shiangquan Sun, Lixing Yan, Zhizhen Yin, Ying Yu, Lili Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Stewart, Michael)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #32 Amended Complaint. On November 30, 2020, Plaintiffs filed a Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File Amended Complaint (DE #28 ), which I denied without prejudice for failure to comply with Southern District of Florida 7.1(a)(3)'s conferral requirement. (DE 30). Plaintiffs never renewed their Motion. Instead, they filed the instant Amended Complaint. Said Amended Complaint was not accompanied by a motion for leave of court, and it was not filed as a matter of course under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a). Moreover, there is no indication that Defendants' gave their written consent. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2). The deadline to join additional parties and amend pleadings expired on September 21, 2020. (DE #6 at 5). Accordingly, the Amended Complaint (DE #32 ) is stricken. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/17/2020. (kal)
December 15, 2020 Filing 32 (STRICKEN per DE 33) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to 30 Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Jane Doe 1-99, Shiangquan Sun, Lixing Yan, Xuejun Makhsous, Ying Yu, Lingfeng Duan, Xuezheng Ding, Xiaofei Liu, Zhizhen Yin, Jiangman Chen, Lili Zhang.(Stewart, Michael) Text Modified on 12/16/2020 (amb). Modified text on 12/17/2020 (mc).
December 7, 2020 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Richard G. Haddad (A) in Further Support of Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(d) For an Award of Costs, Including Reasonable Attorneys Fees, Against Plaintiff Lixing Yan and for a Stay Until He Pays Those Costs, and (B) in Response to Plaintiff Lixing Yans Motion to Dismiss This Action signed by: Richard G. Haddad re #27 Motion to Dismiss, #15 Defendant's MOTION for Bill of Costs , Including Reasonable Attorneys' Fees, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(d) against Plaintiff Lixing YanDefendant's MOTION to Stay Until He Pays Those Costs, #17 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,,, #16 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kastrenakes, Eleni)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs filed their Motion in violation of Southern District of Florida Local Rule 7.1(a)(3), which requires counsel for the moving party to certify in the motion that it has "confer[red] (orally or in writing), or ma[de] reasonable effort to confer (orally or in writing), with all parties or non-parties who may be affected by the relief sought in the motion." Plaintiffs may renew their Motion but must include a certificate of conferral therein as required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/4/2020. (kal)
December 1, 2020 Filing 29 Clerks Notice to Filer re #27 Motion to Dismiss. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ail)
November 30, 2020 Filing 28 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #14 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, #12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration , #21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #13 Affidavit in Support of Motion,,,, by Jiangman Chen, Xuezheng Ding, Lingfeng Duan, Jane Doe 1-99, Xiaofei Liu, Xuejun Makhsous, Shiangquan Sun, Zhizhen Yin, Ying Yu, Lili Zhang. Responses due by 12/14/2020 (Stewart, Michael)
November 30, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION AND FOR ORDER DENYING COURT COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES re #15 Defendant's MOTION for Bill of Costs , Including Reasonable Attorneys' Fees, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(d) against Plaintiff Lixing YanDefendant's MOTION to Stay Until He Pays Those Costs filed by Lixing Yan. Replies due by 12/7/2020. (Stewart, Michael) Text and Event Modified on 12/1/2020 (ail).
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Andrew S. Halpern may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendants Nicholas A. Mastroianni II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, and 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Andrew S. Halpern at ahalpern@otterbourg.com. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/17/2020. (kal)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Richard G. Haddad may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendants Nicholas A. Mastroianni II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, and 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Richard G. Haddad at rhaddad@otterbourg.com. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/17/2020. (kal)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Richard G. Haddad and Andrew S. Halpern. The motion fails to comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, in that two attorneys seek admission pro hac vice via the same motion and filing fee. A separate motion and filing fee is required for each attorney seeking pro had vice admission. Accordingly, the Motion (DE #11 ) is denied without prejudice. Counsel may renew the motion(s) in accordance with CM/ECF procedures. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/17/2020. (kal)
November 17, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael D. Stewart on behalf of Jiangman Chen, Xuezheng Ding, Lingfeng Duan, Jane Doe 1-99, Xiaofei Liu, Xuejun Makhsous, Shiangquan Sun, Lixing Yan, Zhizhen Yin, Ying Yu, Lili Zhang. Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Jiangman Chen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Xuezheng Ding(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Lingfeng Duan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Jane Doe 1-99(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Xiaofei Liu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Xuejun Makhsous(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Shiangquan Sun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Lixing Yan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Zhizhen Yin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Ying Yu(pty:pla), Attorney Michael D. Stewart added to party Lili Zhang(pty:pla). (Stewart, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE - Local counsel, Eleni Kastrenakes Howard, must sign/file documents under the name listed on the SDFL Roll of Attorneys, Eleni Sevasti Kastrenakes. See #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/name-changes. It is not necessary to refile these motions. re #19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard G. Haddad. #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew S. Halpern. (pt)
November 14, 2020 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ronald Fieldstone. Attorney Lawrence Allan Kellogg added to party Ronald Fieldstone(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Kellogg, Lawrence)
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Andrew S. Halpern. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13864281 by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Andrew S. Halpern, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Halpern)(Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard G. Haddad. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-13860874. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Richard G. Haddad, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard Haddad)(Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard G. Haddad and Andrew S. Halpern. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13860874. CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED; - The Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice FOR EACH ATTORNEY SEEKING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION along with the applicable filing fee FOR EACH ATTORNEY as required in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. One motion cannot be filed for two attorneys. (cw)
November 13, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 Defendant's MOTION for Bill of Costs , Including Reasonable Attorneys' Fees, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(d) against Plaintiff Lixing YanDefendant's MOTION to Stay Until He Pays Those Costs - Declaration of Richard G. Haddad filed by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Haddad Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Haddad Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Haddad Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Haddad Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Haddad Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Haddad Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Haddad Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to Haddad Declaration, #9 Exhibit I to Haddad Declaration, #10 Exhibit J to Haddad Declaration, #11 Exhibit K to Haddad Declaration, #12 Exhibit L to Haddad Declaration, #13 Exhibit M to Haddad Declaration, #14 Exhibit N to Haddad Declaration, #15 Exhibit O to Haddad Declaration, #16 Exhibit P to Haddad Declaration, #17 Exhibit Q to Haddad Declaration, #18 Exhibit R to Haddad Declaration, #19 Exhibit S to Haddad Declaration, #20 Exhibit T to Haddad Declaration, #21 Exhibit U to Haddad Declaration, #22 Exhibit V to Haddad Declaration, #23 Exhibit W to Haddad Declaration)(Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 Defendant's MOTION for Bill of Costs , Including Reasonable Attorneys' Fees, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(d) against Plaintiff Lixing YanDefendant's MOTION to Stay Until He Pays Those Costs - Declaration of Nicholas A. Mastroianni II filed by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Mastroianni Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Mastroianni Declaration)(Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION for Bill of Costs , Including Reasonable Attorneys' Fees, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(d) against Plaintiff Lixing Yan ( Responses due by 11/30/2020), Defendant's MOTION to Stay Until He Pays Those Costs by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. (Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration Declaration of Nicholas A. Mastroianni II in Support of The USIF Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Mastroianni Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Mastroianni Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Mastroianni Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Mastroianni Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Mastroianni Declaration)(Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration Declaration of Richard G. Haddad in Support of The USIF Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration filed by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Haddad Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Haddad Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Haddad Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Haddad Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Haddad Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Haddad Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Haddad Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to Haddad Declaration, #9 Exhibit I to Haddad Declaration, #10 Exhibit J to Haddad Declaration, #11 Exhibit K to Haddad Declaration, #12 Exhibit L to Haddad Declaration, #13 Exhibit M to Haddad Declaration, #14 Exhibit N to Haddad Declaration, #15 Exhibit O to Haddad Declaration, #16 Exhibit P to Haddad Declaration, #17 Exhibit Q to Haddad Declaration)(Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, , Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Richard G. Haddad and Andrew S. Halpern. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13860874 by 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. Responses due by 11/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Richard G. Haddad, #2 Certification of Andrew S. Halpern, #3 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eleni Sevasti Kastrenakes on behalf of 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. Attorney Eleni Sevasti Kastrenakes added to party 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eleni Sevasti Kastrenakes added to party 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eleni Sevasti Kastrenakes added to party 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eleni Sevasti Kastrenakes added to party 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eleni Sevasti Kastrenakes added to party Nicholas Mastroianni, II(pty:dft), Attorney Eleni Sevasti Kastrenakes added to party U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC(pty:dft). (Kastrenakes, Eleni)
November 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Paul Ackerman on behalf of 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. Attorney David Paul Ackerman added to party 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Paul Ackerman added to party 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Paul Ackerman added to party 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Paul Ackerman added to party 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Paul Ackerman added to party Nicholas Mastroianni, II(pty:dft), Attorney David Paul Ackerman added to party U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC(pty:dft). (Ackerman, David)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ronald Fieldstone. Ronald Fieldstone waiver sent on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Kellogg, Lawrence)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2020., Discovery due by 1/11/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 9/21/2020., In Limine Motions due by 1/25/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 1/25/2021., Motions due by 1/25/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/1/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 3/29/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 3/24/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ronald Fieldstone, Nicholas Mastroianni, II. (amb)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/15/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006964 (pcs)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC, 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC, 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC, Ronald Fieldstone, Nicholas Mastroianni, II, U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Jane Doe 1-99, Shiangquan Sun, Lixing Yan, Xuejun Makhsous, Ying Yu, Lingfeng Duan, Xuezheng Ding, Xiaofei Liu, Zhizhen Yin, Jiangman Chen, Lili Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makhsous et al v. Mastroianni et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuejun Makhsous
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ying Yu
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuezheng Ding
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lili Zhang
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jiangman Chen
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lingfeng Duan
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaofei Liu
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1-99
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhizhen Yin
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shiangquan Sun
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lixing Yan
Represented By: Michael D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1568 Broadway Funding 100 GP, LLC
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes Howard
Represented By: Andrew S. Halpern
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Mastroianni, II
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes Howard
Represented By: Andrew S. Halpern
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Fieldstone
Represented By: Lawrence Allan Kellogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration Fund, LLC
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes Howard
Represented By: Andrew S. Halpern
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 701 TSQ 1000 Funding GP, LLC
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes Howard
Represented By: Andrew S. Halpern
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 701 TSQ 1000 Funding, LLC
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes Howard
Represented By: Andrew S. Halpern
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1568 Broadway Funding 100, LLC
Represented By: David Paul Ackerman
Represented By: Eleni S. Kastrenakes Howard
Represented By: Andrew S. Halpern
Represented By: Richard G. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?