Watkins v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Phillis Watkins
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Chattem Inc., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81172
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 First MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Phillis Watkins.(Silverstein, Jarad)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case Number 2:20-cv-03063 with documents 1-2. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81172-RLR on 7/17/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03063. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order that Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Florida for the reasons stated in the order of February 6, 2020, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (jaa, )
June 25, 2020 Summons Issued as to BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/25/2020 (bw, )
June 24, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PHILLIS WATKINS. (tjd)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CHATTEM, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14375832.), filed by PHILLIS WATKINS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(MILLER, ROBERT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillis Watkins
Represented By: Robert S. Miller
Represented By: Jarad L. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?