OLLIS v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: LISA OLLIS
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 9:2020cv81174
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP re #5 Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, Status Report Order of Filing of Copies of State Court Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A") (Russomanno, Suzette)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Russomanno, Suzette)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Status Conference: The parties shall, by September 18, 2020, engage in an informal settlement conference with one another. In addition, by September 18, 2020, the parties shall file a Joint Notice of Compliance with this Order and briefly indicate the result of the settlement conference. Status Conference set for 9/21/2020 03:30 PM before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES( Status Report due by 9/14/2020.) Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Russomanno, Suzette)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Russomanno, Suzette)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13200012, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Russomanno, Suzette) Modified on 7/20/2020 (drz). ( Answer and Affirmative Defenses-Exhibit 5 pages 28 thru 32)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OLLIS v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Suzette Luisa Russomanno
Represented By: William Edwards
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA OLLIS
Represented By: Jason Drew Weisser
Represented By: Michael D Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?