Wagner v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Arthur Wagner
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2020cv81176
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/23/2020. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company. Attorney Zachary David Sonenblum added to party Federal Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Sonenblum, Zachary)
July 22, 2020 Reset Answer Due Deadline: Federal Insurance Company response due 8/21/2020. (ls)(per DE #4)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the ECF No. #3 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall file their Response to the ECF No. #1 Complaint by August 21. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/22/2020. (kge) Corrected hyperlinked entries on 7/22/2020 (mf).
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Federal Insurance Company. (Farrant, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Declaratory Relief) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13202157, filed by Federal Insurance Company. (No Answer or Motion to Dismiss filed)(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhiit A - Complaint, Discovery etc., #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B - Bella Estimates)(Farrant, Laura) Text Modified on 7/20/2020. (scn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Wagner
Represented By: John Stat Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Farach Farrant
Represented By: Bradley Steven Fischer
Represented By: Zachary David Sonenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?