Withers v. Bradshaw et al
Plaintiff: Brett Nicholas Withers
Defendant: Unknown P.B.S.O, Ric Bradshaw, Tac Team Members, Agent Halloran and Woodspring Suites Hotel
Case Number: 9:2020cv81336
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #7 Notice of Appeal. Notice has been electronically mailed. (hh)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appeal by Brett Nicholas Withers as to #5 Order Dismissing Case. Filing fee $ 505.00. Receipt#: FEE NOT PAID. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (hh)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/ Case Closed by District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/10/2020. (daa)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff's Complaint [ECF No. 1] is DISMISSED with prejudice. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brett Nicholas Withers. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (co)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (br)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Brett Nicholas Withers. (mee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (mee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Agent Halloran, Ric Bradshaw, Tac Team Members, Unknown P.B.S.O, Woodspring Suites Hotel. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Brett Nicholas Withers.(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Withers v. Bradshaw et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown P.B.S.O
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ric Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tac Team Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent Halloran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodspring Suites Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Nicholas Withers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?