JEAN BAPTISTE v. GASPETROL ENERGY 3 LLC et al
Plaintiff: ANGELINE JEAN BAPTISTE
Defendant: Samuel Gonzalez and GASPETROL ENERGY 3 LLC a Florida Limited Liability Company doing business as Sunoco Gas Station
Case Number: 9:2020cv81337
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Approving #11 Settlement And Dismissing Case With Prejudice. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE this case and DENY AS MOOT any pending motions. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Settlement Approval and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by ANGELINE JEAN BAPTISTE. Responses due by 10/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eiss, Charles)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE On August 24, 2020, this Court entered its Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report, and Joint Discovery Report, which required the parties to submit appropriate dismissal papers within ten (10) calendar days of notifying the Court that the case has settled. See [DE 5]. On September 4, 2020, a notice of settlement was filed. See [DE 9]. However, as of the date of this Order, a stipulation, notice, or motion for dismissal has not been filed with the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that no later than September 22, 2020, the parties shall either file the appropriate dismissal documents or show cause why they have not been filed. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/15/2020. (mp00)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by ANGELINE JEAN BAPTISTE (Eiss, Charles)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ANGELINE JEAN BAPTISTE. GASPETROL ENERGY 3 LLC served on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. (Eiss, Charles)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ANGELINE JEAN BAPTISTE. Samuel Gonzalez served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. (Eiss, Charles)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES IN FLSA CASES. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Samuel Gonzalez. (mee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GASPETROL ENERGY 3 LLC. (mee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13369934, filed by ANGELINE JEAN BAPTISTE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Eiss, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEAN BAPTISTE v. GASPETROL ENERGY 3 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GASPETROL ENERGY 3 LLC a Florida Limited Liability Company doing business as Sunoco Gas Station
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELINE JEAN BAPTISTE
Represented By: Charles Merrill Eiss
Represented By: Tiexin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?