Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd. v. Twin-Star International,Inc.
Plaintiff: Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd. f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited, Glen Dimplex Americas LTD. and Dimplex North America Limited
Defendant: Twin-Star International,Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020cv81340
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Glen Dimplex Americas LTD.. Twin-Star International,Inc. waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Corbett, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Glen Dimplex Americas LTD. re #1 Complaint, Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Corbett, Ryan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Twin-Star International,Inc.. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Twin-Star International,Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13370187, filed by Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd. f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Corbett, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd. v. Twin-Star International,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin-Star International,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Dimplex Americas Ltd. f/k/a Dimplex North America Limited
Represented By: Ryan Mark Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Dimplex Americas LTD.
Represented By: Ryan Mark Corbett
Represented By: Laurence Stephan Litow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimplex North America Limited
Represented By: Ryan Mark Corbett
Represented By: Laurence Stephan Litow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?