Thomas et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Christelle Thomas and Michel Pierre Louis
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli and Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Case Number: 9:2020cv81341
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CLOSING CASE. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE THIS CASE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michel Pierre Louis, Christelle Thomas (Stoller, David)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to United States Attorney General and Office of the United States Attorney by Michel Pierre Louis, Christelle Thomas. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Stoller, David) Text Modified on 9/24/2020 (ail).
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Striking 8 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA filed by Michel Pierre Louis, Christelle Thomas by Michel Pierre Louis, Christelle Thomas (Stoller, David)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2021 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Proof of Service not attached; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must file a Notice of Striking, then refile complete document. (ail)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 *STRICKEN* SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Michel Pierre Louis, Christelle Thomas. All Defendants. (Stoller, David)Text Modified on 9/24/2020 per DE #10 Notice of Striking (ail).
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Michel Pierre Louis, Christelle Thomas. Chad Wolf served on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Acting Secretary Summons Executed)(Stoller, David)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Michel Pierre Louis, Christelle Thomas. Kenneth T Cuccinelli served on 8/24/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Acting Director Summons Executed)(Stoller, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rosaline Chan on behalf of Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf. Attorney Rosaline Chan added to party Kenneth T Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Rosaline Chan added to party Chad Wolf(pty:dft). (Chan, Rosaline)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf. (amb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13370206, filed by Michel Pierre Louis, Christelle Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Signed Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit I-485 Receipt, #5 Exhibit USCIS Web Portal information relating to Form I-130, #6 Exhibit USCIS Web Portal information relating to Form I-485, #7 Exhibit Published Processing Report, #8 Exhibit How to Read Published Processing Report)(Stoller, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christelle Thomas
Represented By: David Howard Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Pierre Louis
Represented By: David Howard Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Rosaline Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Rosaline Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?