Jackson et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Jackson and Karen Ellen Jackson
Defendant: Chattem Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Pfizer Inc and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv81349
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 20 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Nebraska. Case Number 8:20-cv-00308 with documents 1-17. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81349-RLR on 8/19/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from Nebraska; Case Number 8:20-cv-00308. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
August 19, 2020 Case transferred to USDC-Southern District of Florida. Original electronic file sent. (TCL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (TCL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (TCL)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' Agreed Motion to Stay (Filing No. #3 ) is granted and all proceedings in this action are hereby stayed pending its transfer to MDL 2924. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal #1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi US Services, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Pfizer Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Chattem, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joseph G. Petrosinelli has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert B. Friedman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Julia Zousmer has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew T. Bayman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Huffer, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Huffer, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Madison County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-0264 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4210092) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Huffer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Julia Zousmer
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Bayman
Represented By: Robert B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Jackson
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Ellen Jackson
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?