Teo v. United States Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Alfred S.K. Teo
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service and United States Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 9:2020cv81351
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Alfred S.K. Teo. (Stern, Samuel)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to excuse the parties from discovery and trial-related requirements of the pretrial scheduling order re #8 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Bishop, Kyle)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by United States Internal Revenue Service. Replies due by 10/16/2020. (Bishop, Kyle)
October 9, 2020 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Bishop, Kyle)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Alfred S.K. Teo (Stern, Samuel)
October 4, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to excuse the parties from discovery and trial-related requirements of the pretrial scheduling order re #8 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, filed by Alfred S.K. Teo. Replies due by 10/13/2020. (Stern, Samuel)
October 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Alfred S.K. Teo. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Samuel)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to excuse the parties from discovery and trial-related requirements of the pretrial scheduling order re #8 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, by United States Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Kyle)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle L. Bishop on behalf of United States Internal Revenue Service. Attorney Kyle L. Bishop added to party United States Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft). (Bishop, Kyle)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by United States Internal Revenue Service. Attorney Catriona M. Coppler added to party United States Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft). (Coppler, Catriona)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2020., Discovery due by 1/25/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/8/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 2/8/2021., Motions due by 2/8/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/15/2021., Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 9/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon to enter a Scheduling Order. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2021 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States Internal Revenue Service. (ail)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Alfred S.K. Teo Amended Proposed Summons (Stern, Samuel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summonses cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Multiple parties added to one summons. The filer is instructed to re-file a proposed summonses for each party. (ail)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Alfred S.K. Teo Proposed Summons (Stern, Samuel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13377569, filed by Alfred S.K. Teo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Stern, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teo v. United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Kyle L. Bishop
Represented By: Catriona M. Coppler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred S.K. Teo
Represented By: Samuel A Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?