Lissauer et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lissauer and Joanne Lissauer
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Case Number: 9:2020cv81352
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file the appropriate dismissal documents on or before October 20, 2020. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/7/2020. (mkz)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file dismissal documents re #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time TO ENLARGE DISMISSAL DEADLINES re 7 Order to Show Cause,,, 9 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by AIG Property Casualty Company. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Medeiros, Crystalin)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file the appropriate dismissal documents on or before October 6, 2020. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/21/2020. (mkz)
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time TO ENLARGE DISMISSAL DEADLINES re 7 Order to Show Cause,, by AIG Property Casualty Company. Responses due by 10/5/2020 (Medeiros, Crystalin)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On August 19, 2020, this Court entered its initial Order, which required the parties to submit appropriate dismissal papers within ten (10) calendar days of notifying the Court that the case has settled. See [DE 3]. On September 2, 2020, Defendant filed a Notice of Settlement. See [DE 6]. However, as of the date of this Order, a stipulation, notice, or motion for dismissal has not been filed with the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that no later than September 22, 2020, the parties shall either file the appropriate dismissal documents or show cause why they have not been filed. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/15/2020. (mkz)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by AIG Property Casualty Company (Medeiros, Crystalin)
August 27, 2020 Set Answer Due Deadline per DE 5 Order: AIG Property Casualty Company response due 9/10/2020. (kpe)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 10, 2020. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/27/2020. (mkz)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by AIG Property Casualty Company. Responses due by 9/9/2020 (Medeiros, Crystalin)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13377828, filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Medeiros, Crystalin) No answer/motion to dismiss filed. Modified on 8/20/2020 (kpe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lissauer et al v. AIG Property Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lissauer
Represented By: Aaron Seth Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Lissauer
Represented By: Aaron Seth Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: Crystalin C Medeiros
Represented By: Steven Charles Teebagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?