Jones v. American Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mae Bertha Jones
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2020cv81353
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Scheduling Mediation. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
October 12, 2020 Filing 23 Proposed NOTICE of Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 2/5/2021 at 9:00 a.m.. (Hall, Charles)
October 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Mae Bertha Jones, Peter E. Abraham as Mediator. (Hall, Charles)
October 12, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Philip Hall on behalf of Mae Bertha Jones. Attorney Charles Philip Hall added to party Mae Bertha Jones(pty:pla). (Hall, Charles)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #17 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 10/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Setting Discovery Status Conference: Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 3/17/2021 03:00 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Phil Hall for Ashley Ward-Singleton by Mae Bertha Jones. Responses due by 10/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ward-Singleton, Ashley)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Jury Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 8/16/2021 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Calendar Call set for 8/10/2021 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II., Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020., Discovery due by 4/20/2021., Expert Discovery due by 4/20/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 11/2/2020., Mediation Deadline 4/27/2021., In Limine Motions due by 6/1/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 5/4/2021., Motions due by 5/4/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/1/2021.), ( Mediation Deadline 4/27/2021.) Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 9/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Interfinancial, Inc., Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Five Star Claim Adjusting, Other Affiliate PHH Mortgage Services f/k/a Ocwen Loan Servicing for American Security Insurance Company (Lazaro, Daniel)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by American Security Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lazaro, Daniel)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address information for attorney Ashley Nicole Ward-Singleton re #12 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their contact information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their contact information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (cw)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Nicole Ward-Singleton on behalf of Mae Bertha Jones. Attorney Ashley Nicole Ward-Singleton added to party Mae Bertha Jones(pty:pla). (Ward-Singleton, Ashley)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by American Security Insurance Company (Lazaro, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 20-CIV-81355-RAR for administrative purposes only. All future filings shall be made under Case No. 20-CIV-81353-RAR only. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (gp)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by American Security Insurance Company. Associated Cases: 9:20-cv-81353-RAR, 9:20-cv-81354-RAR(Lazaro, Daniel)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by American Security Insurance Company. Associated Cases: 9:20-cv-81353-RAR, 9:20-cv-81354-RAR(Lazaro, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 20-CIV-81354-RAR for administrative purposes only. All future filings shall be made under Case No. 20-CIV-81353-RAR only. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (gp)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by American Security Insurance Company (Lazaro, Daniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Grant W. Krapf, mailing date 08/20/2020, (cco)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13378142, filed by American Security Insurance Company. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite Exh 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Lazaro, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Bertha Jones
Represented By: Grant W. Krapf
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Ward-Singleton
Represented By: Charles Philip Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel R Lazaro
Represented By: Sara Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?