Jones v. American Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mae Bertha Jones
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2020cv81355
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. Per ECF No. #7 Order Consolidating Cases. (gp)
August 27, 2020 Cases associated with 20-CIV-81353-RAR. (gp)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 20-CIV-81355-RAR for administrative purposes only. All future filings shall be made under Case No. 20-CIV-81353-RAR only. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (gp)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II, accepted and signed on 08/26/2020. Judge Rodney Smith no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (as03)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by American Security Insurance Company. (Lazaro, Daniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by American Security Insurance Company (Lazaro, Daniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Grant W. Krapf, mailing date 08/20/2020, (cco)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith (yha)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13378462, filed by American Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Composite Exh 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Lazaro, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mae Bertha Jones
Represented By: Grant W. Krapf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel R Lazaro
Represented By: Sara Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?