United States v. Beckwith
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Jacqueline C Beckwith
Case Number: 9:2020cv81827
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 31:5313
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Jeffrey S. Freeman may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendant Jacqueline C. Beckwith. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Jeffrey S. Freeman at Jeff@Freemantaxlaw.com. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/25/2020. (kal)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORRECTED PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Christopher B. Best may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendant Jacqueline C. Beckwith. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Christopher B. Best at ChrisB@Freemantaxlaw.com. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/18/2020. (kal)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING 9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/25/2020. (kal)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Christopher B. Best may participate in this matter on behalf of Defendant Jacqueline C. Beckwith. The Clerk of Court shall provide all electronic filings to Christopher B. Best at ChrisB@Freemantaxlaw.com. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/18/2020. (kal)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jeffrey S. Freeman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13921132 by Jacqueline C Beckwith. Responses due by 12/8/2020 (Stonick, Anthony)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher B. Best. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-13920411. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by Jacqueline C Beckwith. Attorney Anthony John Stonick added to party Jacqueline C Beckwith(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/8/2020 (Stonick, Anthony)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States. Jacqueline C Beckwith waiver sent on 10/5/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Swietlik, Amanda)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2020., Discovery due by 3/22/2021., Fact Discovery due by 3/22/2021., Expert Discovery due by 3/22/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2020., In Limine Motions due by 4/5/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2021., Motions due by 4/5/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/10/2021., Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/2/2021 at 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon See attached document for full details. (mee)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/2/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave L. Brannon for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jacqueline C Beckwith. (mee)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacqueline C Beckwith. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Swietlik, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline C Beckwith
Represented By: Christopher B. Best
Represented By: Anthony John Stonick
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Amanda J. Swietlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?