Mattingly et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elise Siegel, Julie Deaton, Delphia Lunsford, Sherry Fields, Stephanie Bentley, James Miles, Angela Grider, Mark Collins, Tammy Boyd, Jerry Crabbs, Sheila Mollette, Debbie Banks, Melanie Alsip, Betty Wise, Charlotte Beatty, Amie Longworth, Barry Fisher, Sandra Connors, Linda Bradford, Julie Bittner, Percy Black, Jr., Tonya Vasquez, Stephanie Overfield, Larry Daniels, Ronald Woosley, Emel Hall, Steve Long, David Scarboro, Clarence Reed, Yvonne Rowe, Marcia Pinter, Marissa Mattingly, Gary Fultz, Kylie Granet, Brittany Bowling, Tammy Napier, Joseph Greenwell, Dan Vaden, Phyllis Duncan, Joel Pike, Rita Brock, Carol Underwood, Odell Young, Debra Smith, Marisa Mattingly, Ashley Richie, Michael Nelson, Michael Napier, Margie Martin, Kathy Waid, Evelyn Lambert, William Leadingham, Christina Wilson, David Gray, Priscilla Potter, Leslie Calvin Kellems, Delphia Clark, James Daniels, Charles Smith, Johnny Huguely, Alessandra Benitez, Tiffany Elliott, Fanny Johnson, James Baugess, Penny Pitcock, Robert Griffith, Jerry Tyree, Jerry Beltley, Deanna Little, Pearl Newman, Elmer Dials, Elizabeth Frye, Belisah Brasher, Brittney Muncie, Jeff Carpenter, Debra Moore, Jerry Robinson, Harry Greer, Richard Cornthwaite, Beverly Hollingsworth, Terry McKinney, Donald Caudill, Mahmoud Mehrizi, Roger Anderson, Opal Hobbs, Donald Waddle, David Henderson, Sharon Dietrich, James Gray, Gay Gayhart, Janet Nickell, William Graham, Judy Drakopulos, John Dale, Kim Meek Cooper, Leesha Howell, Mary Middleton, Roger Sullins, Steve Kane, Diana Rios, Bernadine Heeger, Donald Boice, Pamela Russell, Beve Tuttle, Jr., Estate of Gary Lynn Russell, Timothy Rhodus, Kathy Jones, James Warner, Chere Hallahan, Susan Anthony, Charles Elam, Sandra Wilson, Jackie Bryant, Cathy Adkins, Jennifer Sands, Deputy Sheriff Samuel Thomas, Dana Glover, Nicole Alvey, LeRoy Harrison, Joseph Damron, Dana O'Bryan, Verna Lewis, Lisa Hubbard, Larry Kidwell, Gloria Sanders, Gary Brown, Melissa Hall, Marsha Rideout, Claudine McQueen, Sam Jowdy, Michael Oney, Annette Estes, Joy Freeman, George Hines, Shally Miller, Geraldine Phillips, Matthew Boggs, Maria DeVazier, Hargis White, Glen Hayes, Phillip Partin, Antonio Davila, Bonnie Herron, Rhonda Savley, Ross Daugherty, Rufus Reed, Johnny Maynard, Carl Fletcher, Wilma Lainhart, Debra Williams, Debra Robbins, Jeanette Hebert, Becky Boyd, Robert Daniels, Ledford Harris, Morris Johnson, Patricia Davis, Denzil Finley, Glenn Neil Guess, Wallace Wilkinson, Alicia Summers, Nancy Sharpe, Anna McGrath, Howard Gregory, Matthew Williams, Terry Gabhart, Melisa Ratliff, Brenda Jenkins, Judy Morse, James Hubble, Tammy Morris, Reta Lindsey, Gregory Smith, Kimberly Powell, Debbie Proctor, Holly Brezeale, Coulter Sidney and Carter Hughes
Defendant: Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Sanofi S.A., GlaskoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi US Services Inc., GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH and GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv81832
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Cathy Adkins (Hilliard, Robert)
July 30, 2021 Filing 79 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants, filed by Pearl Newman.(Hilliard, Robert)
July 22, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Kimberly Powell (Hilliard, Robert)
July 19, 2021 Filing 77 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #67 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,. US Mail returned for: lmer Dials. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
July 15, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Alicia Summers (Hilliard, Robert)
July 12, 2021 Filing 75 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #66 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,. US Mail returned for: Tammy Morris. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
July 9, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Donald Caudill (Hilliard, Robert)
July 8, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Mahmoud Mehrizi (Hilliard, Robert)
July 8, 2021 Filing 72 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #66 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,. US Mail returned for: Gay Gayhart. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
June 24, 2021 Filing 71 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Denzil Finley (Hilliard, Robert)
June 23, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Sandra Wilson (Hilliard, Robert)
June 18, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Judy Drakopulos (Hilliard, Robert)
June 18, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Marsha Rideout (Hilliard, Robert)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs. Attorneys Robert C. Hilliard and Kimberly L. Beck are terminated from representation of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Kimberly Beck is withdrawn as counsel of record for the plaintiffs listed on her motion. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
June 15, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Percy Black, Jr, Donald Boice, Patricia Davis, Gary Fultz, William Leadingham, Reta Lindsey, Tammy Napier, Priscilla Potter(individually and on behalf of B (twin 2) P., a minor), Priscilla Potter(individually and on behalf of B (twin 1) P., a minor), Jerry Robinson, Yvonne Rowe, Debra Williams (Hilliard, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert C. Hilliard for / by Alessandra Benitez. Responses due by 6/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hilliard, Robert)
June 9, 2021 Filing 63 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kimberly Beck for / by Roger Anderson, Susan Anthony, Debbie Banks, James Baugess, Charlotte Beatty, Jerry Beltley, Alessandra Benitez, Julie Bittner, Brittany Bowling, Becky Boyd, Belisah Brasher, Holly Brezeale, Gary Brown, Jackie Bryant, Jeff Carpenter, Donald Caudill, Delphia Clark, Mark Collins, Sandra Connors, Richard Cornthwaite, Jerry Crabbs, Joseph Damron, James Daniels, Larry Daniels, Robert Daniels, Ross Daugherty, Antonio Davila, Elmer Dials, Sharon Dietrich, Tiffany Elliott, Annette Estes, Sherry Fields, Denzil Finley, Barry Fisher, Carl Fletcher, Joy Freeman, Elizabeth Frye, Terry Gabhart, Gay Gayhart, Dana Glover, William Graham, Kylie Granet, James Gray, Harry Greer, Howard Gregory, Angela Grider, Robert Griffith, Emel Hall, Chere Hallahan, Ledford Harris, Glen Hayes, Jeanette Hebert, Bernadine Heeger, David Henderson, Bonnie Herron, George Hines, Opal Hobbs, Beverly Hollingsworth, Leesha Howell, James Hubble, Carter Hughes, Johnny Huguely, Brenda Jenkins, Fanny Johnson, Morris Johnson, Kathy Jones, Sam Jowdy, Steve Kane, Wilma Lainhart, Evelyn Lambert, Verna Lewis, Reta Lindsey, Deanna Little, Amie Longworth, Delphia Lunsford, Margie Martin, Marisa Mattingly(individually and on behalf of B.M., a minor), Anna McGrath, Terry McKinney, Claudine McQueen, Mary Middleton, James Miles, Tammy Morris, Judy Morse, Brittney Muncie, Janet Nickell, Michael Oney, Geraldine Phillips, Joel Pike, Marcia Pinter, Priscilla Potter(individually and on behalf of B (twin 2) P., a minor), Debbie Proctor, Melisa Ratliff, Clarence Reed, Rufus Reed, Ashley Richie, Diana Rios, Pamela Russell(as Executor of the Estate of Gary Lynn Russell deceased), Gloria Sanders, Jennifer Sands, Rhonda Savley, David Scarboro, Coulter Sidney, Elise Siegel, Charles Smith, Debra Smith, Gregory Smith, Roger Sullins, Samuel Thomas, Beve Tuttle, Jr, Carol Underwood, Dan Vaden, Donald Waddle, Kathy Waid, James Warner, Hargis White, Debra Williams, Christina Wilson, Sandra Wilson, Betty Wise, Ronald Woosley, Odell Young. Responses due by 6/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Beck, Kimberly)
May 7, 2021 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against GlaskoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C., Pfizer Inc, Apotex Corp., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ranbaxy Inc, Roxane (Hikma Pharmaceuticals International, Ltd.), Sandoz Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., WalMart Stores, Inc, filed by Susan Anthony.(Hilliard, Robert)
February 23, 2021 Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Roger Sullins.(Hilliard, Robert)
February 23, 2021 Filing 60 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Margie Martin.(Hilliard, Robert)
February 18, 2021 Filing 59 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gregory Smith.(Hilliard, Robert)
January 20, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Cathy Adkins, Melanie Alsip, Nicole Alvey, Roger Anderson, Susan Anthony, Debbie Banks, James Baugess, Charlotte Beatty, Jerry Beltley, Alessandra Benitez, Stephanie Bentley, Stephanie Bentley(individually and on behalf of A.B., a minor), Julie Bittner, Percy Black, Jr, Matthew Boggs, Donald Boice, Brittany Bowling, Becky Boyd, Tammy Boyd, Linda Bradford, Belisah Brasher, Holly Brezeale, Holly Brezeale(individually and on behalf of A.B., a minor), Rita Brock, Gary Brown, Jackie Bryant, Jeff Carpenter, Donald Caudill, Delphia Clark, Mark Collins, Sandra Connors, Kim Meek Cooper, Richard Cornthwaite, Jerry Crabbs, John Dale, Joseph Damron, James Daniels, Larry Daniels, Robert Daniels, Ross Daugherty, Antonio Davila, Patricia Davis, Maria DeVazier, Julie Deaton, Elmer Dials, Sharon Dietrich, Judy Drakopulos, Phyllis Duncan, Charles Elam, Tiffany Elliott, Estate of Gary Lynn Russell, Annette Estes, Sherry Fields, Denzil Finley, Barry Fisher, Carl Fletcher, Joy Freeman, Elizabeth Frye, Gary Fultz, Terry Gabhart, Gay Gayhart, Dana Glover, William Graham, Kylie Granet, David Gray, James Gray, Joseph Greenwell, Harry Greer, Howard Gregory, Angela Grider, Robert Griffith, Glenn Neil Guess, Emel Hall, Melissa Hall, Chere Hallahan, Chere Hallahan(individually and on behalf of Hallahan deceased), Ledford Harris, LeRoy Harrison, Glen Hayes, Jeanette Hebert, Bernadine Heeger, David Henderson, Bonnie Herron, George Hines, Opal Hobbs, Beverly Hollingsworth, Leesha Howell, Lisa Hubbard, James Hubble, Carter Hughes, Johnny Huguely, Brenda Jenkins, Fanny Johnson, Morris Johnson, Kathy Jones, Sam Jowdy, Steve Kane, Leslie Calvin Kellems, Larry Kidwell, Wilma Lainhart, Evelyn Lambert, William Leadingham, Verna Lewis, Reta Lindsey, Deanna Little, Steve Long, Amie Longworth, Delphia Lunsford, Margie Martin, Marisa Mattingly(individually and on behalf of B.M., a minor), Marisa Mattingly(individually and on behalf of A.M., a minor), Marissa Mattingly, Johnny Maynard, Anna McGrath, Terry McKinney, Claudine McQueen, Mahmoud Mehrizi, Mary Middleton, James Miles, James Miles(individually and on behalf of Brenda Miles, deceased), Shally Miller(individually and on behalf of M.W., a minor), Shally Miller(individually and on behalf of M.G.W., deceased), Shally Miller(individually and on behalf of D.M., a minor), Sheila Mollette, Debra Moore, Tammy Morris, Judy Morse, Brittney Muncie, Michael Napier, Tammy Napier, Michael Nelson, Pearl Newman, Pearl Newman(individually and on behalf of K.B., a minor), Janet Nickell, Dana O'Bryan, Michael Oney, Stephanie Overfield, Phillip Partin, Geraldine Phillips, Joel Pike, Marcia Pinter, Penny Pitcock, Priscilla Potter(individually and on behalf of B (twin 2) P., a minor), Priscilla Potter(individually and on behalf of B (twin 1) P., a minor), Kimberly Powell, Debbie Proctor, Melisa Ratliff, Clarence Reed, Rufus Reed, Timothy Rhodus, Ashley Richie, Marsha Rideout, Diana Rios, Debra Robbins, Jerry Robinson, Yvonne Rowe, Pamela Russell(as Executor of the Estate of Gary Lynn Russell deceased), Pamela Russell(individually and on behalf of Gary Russell deceased), Gloria Sanders, Jennifer Sands, Rhonda Savley, David Scarboro, Nancy Sharpe, Coulter Sidney, Elise Siegel, Charles Smith, Debra Smith, Gregory Smith, Roger Sullins, Alicia Summers, Samuel Thomas, Beve Tuttle, Jr, Jerry Tyree, Carol Underwood, Dan Vaden, Tonya Vasquez, Donald Waddle, Kathy Waid, James Warner, Hargis White, Wallace Wilkinson, Debra Williams, Matthew Williams, Christina Wilson, Sandra Wilson, Betty Wise, Ronald Woosley, Odell Young (Hilliard, Robert)
January 20, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Hilliard on behalf of Cathy Adkins, Melanie Alsip, Nicole Alvey, Roger Anderson, Susan Anthony, Debbie Banks, James Baugess, Charlotte Beatty, Jerry Beltley, Alessandra Benitez, Stephanie Bentley, Stephanie Bentley(individually and on behalf of A.B., a minor), Julie Bittner, Percy Black, Jr, Matthew Boggs, Donald Boice, Brittany Bowling, Becky Boyd, Tammy Boyd, Linda Bradford, Belisah Brasher, Holly Brezeale, Holly Brezeale(individually and on behalf of A.B., a minor), Rita Brock, Gary Brown, Jackie Bryant, Jeff Carpenter, Donald Caudill, Delphia Clark, Mark Collins, Sandra Connors, Kim Meek Cooper, Richard Cornthwaite, Jerry Crabbs, John Dale, Joseph Damron, James Daniels, Larry Daniels, Robert Daniels, Ross Daugherty, Antonio Davila, Patricia Davis, Maria DeVazier, Julie Deaton, Elmer Dials, Sharon Dietrich, Judy Drakopulos, Phyllis Duncan, Charles Elam, Tiffany Elliott, Estate of Gary Lynn Russell, Annette Estes, Sherry Fields, Denzil Finley, Barry Fisher, Carl Fletcher, Joy Freeman, Elizabeth Frye, Gary Fultz, Terry Gabhart, Gay Gayhart, Dana Glover, William Graham, Kylie Granet, David Gray, James Gray, Joseph Greenwell, Harry Greer, Howard Gregory, Angela Grider, Robert Griffith, Glenn Neil Guess, Emel Hall, Melissa Hall, Chere Hallahan, Chere Hallahan(individually and on behalf of Hallahan deceased), Ledford Harris, LeRoy Harrison, Glen Hayes, Jeanette Hebert, Bernadine Heeger, David Henderson, Bonnie Herron, George Hines, Opal Hobbs, Beverly Hollingsworth, Leesha Howell, Lisa Hubbard, James Hubble, Carter Hughes, Johnny Huguely, Brenda Jenkins, Fanny Johnson, Morris Johnson, Kathy Jones, Sam Jowdy, Steve Kane, Leslie Calvin Kellems, Larry Kidwell, Wilma Lainhart, Evelyn Lambert, William Leadingham, Verna Lewis, Reta Lindsey, Deanna Little, Steve Long, Amie Longworth, Delphia Lunsford, Margie Martin, Marisa Mattingly(individually and on behalf of B.M., a minor), Marisa Mattingly(individually and on behalf of A.M., a minor), Marissa Mattingly, Johnny Maynard, Anna McGrath, Terry McKinney, Claudine McQueen, Mahmoud Mehrizi, Mary Middleton, James Miles, James Miles(individually and on behalf of Brenda Miles, deceased), Shally Miller(individually and on behalf of M.W., a minor), Shally Miller(individually and on behalf of M.G.W., deceased), Shally Miller(individually and on behalf of D.M., a minor), Sheila Mollette, Debra Moore, Tammy Morris, Judy Morse, Brittney Muncie, Michael Napier, Tammy Napier, Michael Nelson, Pearl Newman, Pearl Newman(individually and on behalf of K.B., a minor), Janet Nickell, Dana O'Bryan, Michael Oney, Stephanie Overfield, Phillip Partin, Geraldine Phillips, Joel Pike, Marcia Pinter, Penny Pitcock, Priscilla Potter(individually and on behalf of B (twin 2) P., a minor), Priscilla Potter(individually and on behalf of B (twin 1) P., a minor), Kimberly Powell, Debbie Proctor, Melisa Ratliff, Clarence Reed, Rufus Reed, Timothy Rhodus, Ashley Richie, Marsha Rideout, Diana Rios, Debra Robbins, Jerry Robinson, Yvonne Rowe, Pamela Russell(as Executor of the Estate of Gary Lynn Russell deceased), Pamela Russell(individually and on behalf of Gary Russell deceased), Gloria Sanders, Jennifer Sands, Rhonda Savley, David Scarboro, Nancy Sharpe, Coulter Sidney, Elise Siegel, Charles Smith, Debra Smith, Gregory Smith, Roger Sullins, Alicia Summers, Samuel Thomas, Beve Tuttle, Jr, Jerry Tyree, Carol Underwood, Dan Vaden, Tonya Vasquez, Donald Waddle, Kathy Waid, James Warner, Hargis White, Wallace Wilkinson, Debra Williams, Matthew Williams, Christina Wilson, Sandra Wilson, Betty Wise, Ronald Woosley, Odell Young. Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Cathy Adkins(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Melanie Alsip(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Nicole Alvey(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Roger Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Susan Anthony(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party James Baugess(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Charlotte Beatty(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Alessandra Benitez(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Stephanie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Stephanie Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Julie Bittner(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Percy Black, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Matthew Boggs(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Donald Boice(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Becky Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Tammy Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Linda Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Belisah Brasher(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Holly Brezeale(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Holly Brezeale(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Rita Brock(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Donald Caudill(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Delphia Clark(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Sandra Connors(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Kim Meek Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Richard Cornthwaite(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party John Dale(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Joseph Damron(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Robert Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Antonio Davila(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Patricia Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Julie Deaton(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Elmer Dials(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Sharon Dietrich(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Judy Drakopulos(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Phyllis Duncan(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Charles Elam(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Tiffany Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Estate of Gary Lynn Russell(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Annette Estes(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Denzil Finley(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Barry Fisher(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Carl Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Joy Freeman(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Gary Fultz(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Gay Gayhart(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Dana Glover(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party David Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party James Gray(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Joseph Greenwell(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Harry Greer(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Howard Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Robert Griffith(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Glenn Neil Guess(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Emel Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Melissa Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Chere Hallahan(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Chere Hallahan(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Ledford Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party LeRoy Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Glen Hayes(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Jeanette Hebert(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Bernadine Heeger(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party David Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party George Hines(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Opal Hobbs(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Lisa Hubbard(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Fanny Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Morris Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Kathy Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Sam Jowdy(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Steve Kane(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Larry Kidwell(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party William Leadingham(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Reta Lindsey(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Deanna Little(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Steve Long(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Delphia Lunsford(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Margie Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Marisa Mattingly(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Marisa Mattingly(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Marissa Mattingly(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Johnny Maynard(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Anna McGrath(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Claudine McQueen(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Mahmoud Mehrizi(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Mary Middleton(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party James Miles(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party James Miles(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Shally Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Shally Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Shally Miller(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Sheila Mollette(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Debra Moore(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Tammy Morris(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Judy Morse(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Brittney Muncie(pty:pla), Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Michael Napier(pty:pla), Attor
December 4, 2020 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Odell Young.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants, filed by Ross Daugherty.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Filing 54 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Beverly Hollingsworth.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Angela Grider.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Debra Smith.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Filing 51 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants, filed by Jerry Beltley.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hargis White.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 49 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kathy Waid.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elise Siegel.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Evelyn Lambert.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wilma Lainhart.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kylie Granet.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Terry Gabhart.(Hilliard, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brenda Jenkins.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 25, 2020 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants, filed by Terry McKinney.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 25, 2020 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Coulter Sidney.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 25, 2020 Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form against All Defendants, filed by Donald Waddle.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 24, 2020 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Marcia Pinter.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 24, 2020 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Debbie Banks.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 24, 2020 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pearl Newman.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 24, 2020 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Samuel Thomas.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Collins.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maria DeVazier.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Johnny Huguely.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Larry Daniels.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 23, 2020 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Debra Robbins.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Leslie Calvin Kellems.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Leesha Howell.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sherry Fields.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jerry Crabbs.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 20, 2020 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Hubble.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 19, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeff Carpenter.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeff Carpenter.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Daniels.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jackie Bryant.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Daniels.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jackie Bryant.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gary Brown.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 18, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Amie Longworth.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Frye.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Clarence Reed.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 15, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carter Hughes.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 15, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brittany Bowling.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 15, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bonnie Herron.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 15, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Verna Lewis.(Hilliard, Robert)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Graham.(Hilliard, Robert)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Western District of Kentucky. Case Number 1:20-cv-00160 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:20-cv-81832-RLR on 10/5/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. (mc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from Kentucky Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-00160. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. CTO-36 from SD/FL re MDL 2924. (KJA)
September 25, 2020 Response to #5 Notice of Deficiency, Ms. Beck is admitted with our court as of 10/21/2009, nothing else needs to be done further in complying with def ntc. (KJA)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Kimberly L. Beck re #1 ComplaintReason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 10/8/2020. (KJA)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 9/22/2020. Pursuant to 28 USC 455, the Court concludes that recusal in this case is required. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings and disposition, pursuant to General Order 2020-17. Counsel is instructed to change the civil action number to reflect the initials (DJH) in place and instead of the initials (GNS) on all further pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; Natalie Thompson (TJD)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (SRH)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (SRH)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Marisa Mattingly (individually and on behalf of A.M., a minor), et al., against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaskoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline plc, Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services, Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3183600. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (SRH) Modified on 9/15/2020 to show all plaintiffs as filers (SRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattingly et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Siegel
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Deaton
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delphia Lunsford
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Fields
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bentley
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Miles
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Grider
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Collins
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Boyd
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Crabbs
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Mollette
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Banks
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Alsip
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Wise
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Beatty
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amie Longworth
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Fisher
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Connors
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bradford
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Bittner
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Black, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Vasquez
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Overfield
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Daniels
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Woosley
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emel Hall
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Long
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scarboro
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Reed
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Rowe
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Pinter
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa Mattingly
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Fultz
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie Granet
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Bowling
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Napier
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Greenwell
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Vaden
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Duncan
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Pike
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Brock
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Underwood
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odell Young
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Mattingly
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Richie
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nelson
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Napier
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margie Martin
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Waid
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Lambert
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Leadingham
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Wilson
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gray
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Potter
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Calvin Kellems
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delphia Clark
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daniels
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Huguely
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alessandra Benitez
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Elliott
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fanny Johnson
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Baugess
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Pitcock
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Griffith
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Tyree
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Beltley
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Little
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearl Newman
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Dials
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Frye
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belisah Brasher
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Muncie
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Carpenter
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Moore
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Robinson
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Greer
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cornthwaite
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Hollingsworth
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry McKinney
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Caudill
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahmoud Mehrizi
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Anderson
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Opal Hobbs
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Waddle
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Henderson
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Dietrich
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gray
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gay Gayhart
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Nickell
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Graham
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Drakopulos
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dale
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Meek Cooper
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leesha Howell
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Middleton
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Sullins
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Kane
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Rios
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine Heeger
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Boice
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Russell
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beve Tuttle, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Gary Lynn Russell
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Rhodus
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Jones
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Warner
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chere Hallahan
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Anthony
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Elam
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Wilson
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Bryant
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Adkins
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sands
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deputy Sheriff Samuel Thomas
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Glover
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Alvey
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeRoy Harrison
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Damron
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana O'Bryan
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Lewis
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hubbard
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kidwell
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Sanders
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Brown
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hall
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Rideout
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudine McQueen
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Jowdy
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Oney
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Estes
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Freeman
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hines
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shally Miller
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Phillips
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Boggs
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria DeVazier
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hargis White
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Hayes
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Partin
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Davila
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Herron
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Savley
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Daugherty
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus Reed
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Maynard
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Fletcher
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Lainhart
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Williams
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Robbins
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Hebert
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Boyd
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Daniels
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledford Harris
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Johnson
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Davis
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denzil Finley
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Neil Guess
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Wilkinson
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Summers
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Sharpe
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna McGrath
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Gregory
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Williams
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Gabhart
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melisa Ratliff
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Jenkins
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Morse
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hubble
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Morris
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reta Lindsey
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Smith
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Powell
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Proctor
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Brezeale
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coulter Sidney
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Hughes
Represented By: Kimberly Beck
Represented By: Robert C. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaskoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?