Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd. v. Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc. and Mordo Danyali
Case Number: 9:2020cv82029
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 20 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Discovery Plan by Mordo Danyali, Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc.. Responses due by 1/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frazer, Kent)
December 30, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kent Boyd Frazer on behalf of Mordo Danyali, Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc.. Attorney Kent Boyd Frazer added to party Mordo Danyali(pty:dft), Attorney Kent Boyd Frazer added to party Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc.(pty:dft). (Frazer, Kent)
December 27, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I of the First Amended Complaint by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 1/11/2021 (Liu, Jianyin)
December 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Striking Motion to Strike by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd. (Liu, Jianyin)
December 25, 2020 Filing 16 STRICKEN per DE #17 . MOTION to Strike #15 Answer to Amended Complaint by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd.. Responses due by 1/8/2021 (Liu, Jianyin) Modified on 12/28/2020 (pcs).
December 21, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Mordo Danyali, Joseph Danyali on Behalf of Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc.. (cds)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 12/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2021., Discovery due by 5/3/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 1/11/2021., In Limine Motions due by 5/17/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 5/17/2021., Motions due by 5/17/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/21/2021.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 12/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 7/14/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave L. Brannon for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #7 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd.. Mordo Danyali served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Liu, Jianyin)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Mordo Danyali. (cds)
November 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd. re #7 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Liu, Jianyin)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Danyali on behalf of Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc.. (cds)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Summon for Mordo Danyali, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Main contract, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Liu, Jianyin)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Striking #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd. by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd. (Liu, Jianyin)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 (STRICKEN PER DE#6 ) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Liu, Jianyin) Text Modified on 11/24/2020 (cds).
November 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd.. Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc. served on 11/6/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Liu, Jianyin)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc.. (cds)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13815580, filed by Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Unexecuted Summon, #3 Exhibit A - Sep. 27, 2017 Contract, #4 Exhibit B -Commercial Invoices, #5 Exhibit C - Bills of Lading, #6 Exhibit D - Email, #7 Exhibit E - Agreement to Pay Interest, #8 Exhibit F - Cost and Debt Break Down, #9 Exhibit G - Cost and Debt Break Down 2)(Liu, Jianyin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd. v. Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flamingo Food & Beverage, Inc.
Represented By: Kent Boyd Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mordo Danyali
Represented By: Kent Boyd Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandong Tyfull Industrial Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jianyin Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?