John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Friedman et al
Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Defendant: Sheryl Katz, Globalvest Trust and Joann Friedman
Case Number: 9:2020cv82164
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.), Jeffrey E. Streitfeld as Mediator. (Massing, Steffie)
January 20, 2021 Filing 22 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) (Massing, Steffie)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Mark E. Shure. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/19/2021. (kal)
January 18, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark E. Shure. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14232710 by Globalvest Trust. Responses due by 2/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frazer, Kent)
January 18, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kent Boyd Frazer on behalf of Globalvest Trust. Attorney Kent Boyd Frazer added to party Globalvest Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Kent Boyd Frazer added to party Globalvest Trust(pty:crd). (Frazer, Kent)
January 8, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Globalvest Trust. (drz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Joann Friedman. (drz)
January 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Sheryl Katz re #14 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Sheryl Katz (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Dyson, Peter)
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #4 Summons Issued for Joann Friedman filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (Massing, Steffie)
January 6, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against Joann Friedman, Globalvest Trust by Sheryl Katz. (Dyson, Peter)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #12 Defendant Sheryl Katz's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant Sheryl Katz to respond to the Interpleader Complaint (DE #1 ) is December 23, 2020. (DE #9 ). Defendant Sheryl Katz seeks an extension until January 15, 2021, citing that "it is holiday time" and counsel is "still investigating the case, and [] anticipate[s] that [Defendant] Sheryl Katz will need to file cross-claims with the Answer to the Interpleader." (DE #12 at 1). Motions to extend litigation deadlines must set forth good cause supported by specific facts. The present Motion is supported by conclusory and speculative assertions which do not provide the Court with any basis upon which to evaluate whether good cause exists to grant the requested relief. Nevertheless, I note that the extension is unopposed, and therefore I will grant the Motion in part. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Sheryl Katz to respond to the Interpleader Complaint (DE #1 ) is extended from December 23, 2020, to January 6, 2021. No other litigation deadlines are modified or amended as a result of this Order. Future requests for extensions will be denied unless the moving party can establish that a particular deadline cannot be met despite diligent efforts. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/23/2020. (kal)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint re #9 Acknowledgment of Service by Sheryl Katz. Attorney Peter Alan Dyson added to party Sheryl Katz(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Dyson, Peter)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/25/2021., Discovery due by 5/17/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 1/25/2021., In Limine Motions due by 6/1/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2021., Motions due by 6/1/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/5/2021., Jury Trial set for 8/2/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 7/28/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.) and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 12/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/2/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 7/28/2021 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.). Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 12/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 16, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #3 Summons Issued filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (Massing, Steffie)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). Globalvest Trust waiver sent on 12/1/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Massing, Steffie)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Globalvest Trust. (drz)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) re #1 Interpleader Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) to be Issued to Globalvest Trust) (Massing, Steffie)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons for Globalvest Trust cannot be issued. Attorney or Pro Se party's return address is not listed on summons. (drz)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joann Friedman. (drz)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sheryl Katz. (drz)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 Interpleader Complaint Filing fees $400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13922617, filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to be Issued to Joann Friedman, #3 Summon(s) to be Issued to Sheryl Katz, #4 Summon(s) to be Issued to Globalvest Trust, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K)(Massing, Steffie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.) v. Friedman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Katz
Represented By: Peter Alan Dyson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globalvest Trust
Represented By: Mark E. Shure
Represented By: Kent Boyd Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joann Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.)
Represented By: Steffie Kathleen Massing
Represented By: Russell Scott Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?