Shetron et al v. SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC
Plaintiff: PAMELA SHETRON and BRIAN SHETRON
Defendant: SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020cv82242
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Rodney A. Max. Mediation Hearing set for 8/11/2021 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) Modified text to correct mediation date on 2/2/2021 (mno).
February 1, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Rodney A. Max as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 8/11/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burkhalter, Lawrence)
January 26, 2021 Filing 28 Defendant's REPLY to #27 Response/Reply (Other), Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to its Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC. (Burkhalter, Lawrence)
January 20, 2021 Filing 27 Plaintiff's RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT, SCI FUNERAL SERVICES OF FLORIDA, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT by BRIAN SHETRON, PAMELA SHETRON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Lewenz, Michael)
January 20, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiffs' Notice of Partial Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Count II as to Pamela Shetron with Count I Remaining as to Both Defendants and Count II Remaining as to Brian Shetron by BRIAN SHETRON, PAMELA SHETRON (Ludens, Zachary)
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 Clerks Notice to Filer re #24 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the case. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. (nc)
January 19, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jose O. De La Cruz on behalf of SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC (De La Cruz, Jose)
January 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiffs shall file their Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss no later than January 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/18/2021. (ahz)
January 18, 2021 Filing 22 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,,,,, #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #11 Notice of Attorney Appearance Renewed Unopposed Motion for Extension to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (D.E. 1-9) through January 20, 2021 by BRIAN SHETRON, PAMELA SHETRON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Lewenz in Support of Motion)(Ludens, Zachary)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Discovery Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 1/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Trial And Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge:: ( Jury Trial set for 1/18/2022 before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Calendar Call set for 1/11/2022 01:45 PM before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2021., Discovery due by 8/23/2021., Expert Discovery due by 8/23/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2021., Mediation Deadline 9/10/2021., In Limine Motions due by 12/17/2022., Motions due by 10/11/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/17/2022.) ( Mediation Deadline 9/10/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 11, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Dean Ludens on behalf of BRIAN SHETRON, PAMELA SHETRON. Attorney Zachary Dean Ludens added to party BRIAN SHETRON(pty:pla), Attorney Zachary Dean Ludens added to party PAMELA SHETRON(pty:pla). (Ludens, Zachary)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE [ECF No. 16] Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2, if a party opposes a briefed motion pending on removal, the opposing party must file and serve an opposing memorandum "within (14) days after the filing of the notice of removal or the entry of the order of transfer." Defendant filed its Motion to Dismiss in State Court on November 20, 2020 [ECF No. 1-9]. Defendant then filed its Notice of Removal in this Court with the attached Motion to Dismiss on December 9, 2020 [ECF No. 1]. Accordingly, under Local Rule 7.2, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss was due no later than December 23, 2020. On January 7, 2021, Plaintiffs filed an untimely Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, but they made no showing of excusable neglect as required under Rule 6(b)(1)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs shall make the requisite showing of excusable neglect no later than January 18, 2021, or risk the grant by default of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Local Rule 7.1(c). Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/11/2021. (AMC)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by BRIAN SHETRON, PAMELA SHETRON. Responses due by 1/21/2021 (Lewenz, Michael) Modified Relief on 1/7/2021 (ls).
January 4, 2021 Filing 15 Statement of: Certificate of Interested Persons by SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC (Burkhalter, Lawrence)
January 4, 2021 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burkhalter, Lawrence)
December 24, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates and Interested Persons by BRIAN SHETRON, PAMELA SHETRON (Lewenz, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steffani Michelle Russo on behalf of BRIAN SHETRON, PAMELA SHETRON (Russo, Steffani)
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Trent Lewenz on behalf of BRIAN SHETRON, PAMELA SHETRON (Lewenz, Michael)
December 21, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Janet Key re #6 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC (Burkhalter, Lawrence)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Lawrence E. Burkhalter, Esq. re #6 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Burkhalter, Lawrence)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Burkhalter, Lawrence)
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Eldridge Burkhalter on behalf of SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC (Burkhalter, Lawrence)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, ( Defendant shall file a declaration or submit evidence to attempt to prove by a preponderance of the evidence that it meets the amount in controversy requirement due on or before 12/21/2020). Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (mno)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Counsel for the removing party is directed to file and serve a Removal Status Report no later than December 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (mno)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/4/2021 Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (mno)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC identifying Corporate Parent SCI Funeral Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Alderwoods (Minnesota), LLC, Corporate Parent Alderwoods Group LLC, Corporate Parent Service Corporation International for SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC (Burkhalter, Lawrence)
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14007406, filed by SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heydemann, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shetron et al v. SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA SHETRON
Represented By: Zachary Dean Ludens
Represented By: Michael Trent Lewenz
Represented By: Steffani Michelle Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN SHETRON
Represented By: Zachary Dean Ludens
Represented By: Michael Trent Lewenz
Represented By: Steffani Michelle Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Funeral Services of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Heydemann
Represented By: Lawrence Eldridge Burkhalter
Represented By: Jose O. De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?