Myeress v. Brissi Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Defendant: Brissi Group, LLC
Case Number: 9:2020mc80276
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Romy B Jurado on behalf of Brissi Group of Florida, Inc.. Attorney Romy B Jurado added to party Brissi Group of Florida, Inc.(pty:gar). (Jurado, Romy)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Brissi Group of Florida, Inc. re #10 Writ of Garnishment SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF (Jimenez, Julisse)
April 2, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by Brissi Group of Florida, Inc.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 4/22/2020. (Jimenez, Julisse)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julisse Jimenez on behalf of Brissi Group of Florida, Inc.. Attorney Julisse Jimenez added to party Brissi Group of Florida, Inc.(pty:gar). (Jimenez, Julisse)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed Date of Service 03/16/2020 as to Brissi Group of Florida, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee Brissi Group of Florida, Inc. in the amount of $ 44,738.34 re: #9 Motion for Writ filed by Joe Myeress. (ls)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Brissi Group of Florida, Inc. by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment - Brissi Group of Florida, Inc.)(Rothman, Joel) Modified Text on 3/4/2020 (ls).
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Non-Issuance of WRIT OF GARNISHMENT as to Garnishee Brissi Group of Florida, Inc.. Amount different than indicated on Judgment re: #7 Motion for Writ filed by Joe Myeress. (ls)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Brissi Group of Florida, Inc. by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Garnishment)(Rothman, Joel)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Non-Issuance of WRIT OF GARNISHMENT as to Garnishee Brissi Group of Florida, Inc.. Amount different than indicated on Judgment re: #5 Motion for Writ filed by Joe Myeress. (ls)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment on Brissi Group of Florida, Inc. by Joe Myeress. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Writ of Garnishment)(Rothman, Joel)
February 25, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (jua)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jua)
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect Party Role Selected. The Filer failed to select the correct party role. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jua)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon. (jua)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment . Filing fee $47.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12503176, filed by Joe Myeress.(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myeress v. Brissi Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brissi Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Myeress
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?