IN RE: ZANTAC (RANITIDINE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff: SHRIECE FRANKS, Angela Williams, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, SANDRA PAYNE, Judy S Brooks, GREGORY VAVRA, Michael Carroll, Thomas Wells, Robert Baker, Ivan Safra, MICHAEL KONN, Judy Brooks, Walter Jones, Doug Barnette, SHERRI PELLEGRENE, Danny McAnally, Kristian W Rasmussen, Randall D. Hollingsworth, Jr., EDWARD L BROWN and GLORIA WILSON
Defendant: Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA, Apotex Corp., Michael McCandless and Marlene Goldenberg
Consolidated Defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., GlaxoSmithkline, PLC, Glaxosmithkline LLC, Glaxosmithkline PLC, Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., Pfizer Inc., Walmart Inc., CVS Health Co., CVS Health Corp., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., The Kroger Co., Perrigo Research and Development Company, Strides Pharma Science Ltd., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, Does 1-100, Sanofi SA, Roberto Chapa, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Amneal Pharamaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Glenmark Generics, Inc., U.S.A., Amneal Pharamaceuticals, LLC, Perrigo Company PLC, DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES, LTD., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, SA, RITE-AID CORP., Perrigo Company, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Ltd, Sanofi-Aventis US Services, Does 1-20, Wal-Mart, Inc., DR. REDDY'S LABORATORIES CORP., Strides Pharma, Inc., Glenmark Generics Ltd. and Walmart, Inc.
In Re: Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation
Consolidated Plaintiff: Joseph Galimidi, Steven Kerzer, Nancy E. Lopez Flores, Carol Phillips, JASON BOEKHOLT, Isaac Musighi, Walter H. Hansen, DAVID GAWLICK, Michael Burke, DAVID W. EVERETT, DORIS BEAN, Julio C. Bernardo, MICHAEL COMBS, LISA PRISINZANO, WARNER PINKNEY, FRANCIS NEARY, DENNIS DIAMANTE, Joseph Bukowski, LAURIE SPRAY, VIRGIL KIGER, CHRISTOPHER ASH, ANGELA MICHELLE GREEN, HECTOR RODRIGUEZ LEYVA, Gary Hart, RONALD MARANTO, Richard Froehlich, JARQUISHA HARRIS, VENUS SYKES, MARY SANTORELLA, RICHARD FREEDMAN, DONALD BOLAND, Bobby Jordan, Suzanne Finer, TIMOTHY MCCANN, Paul Graffeo, Rafael Gomez, JAMES LEE MOORS, LAWRENCE W. JACQUET, Alfonso Pinales, Ned M. Thibodeaux, Corina Lingerfelt, DEBORAH COMBS, Gary C. Will, Carmen Colon, Bruce A Brooks, EDWARD JOSEPH SIMON, JAMES GERTZ, THE ESTATE OF CHRIS SYKES, Kerri L. Brest-Landry, Freddie Taylor, Brenda E. Thibodeaux, Tim Rosenauer, PAUL BURPULIS, Lazaro Farinas, SHERRI RICHMOND, Howard Hager, Joel Bofshever, STEPHANIE FRASIER, Christina Garza, George Cravens, OLGA RUTHERFORD, Edith Massiah, Mark Allan Blake, Jack Rhoda, Glorimar Rodriguez, Patrick A De Luca, THE ESTATE OF FLORY L. PERONE, SHERRY ARIAS, Pankaj Khetarpal, Richard Harris, SCOTT MOSER, Joseph John Balistreri, Dale Winther, Johnny C Tillman, julio c Bernardo, JUAN BAZAN, George Baker, William Molina, Jackie Wilson, ANTHONY K. MICLE, SR., Jonathan Dimesky, KASSIE BENSON, Amanda Swearingen, WILLIAM CASSIDY, KILEEN GROMELSKI, Keith Sobieszczyk, Joseph Lucero, Justin Rowe, Camilo So, Mohamed Haridi, Schawarner Marie Carron, CAROL PERONE, Thermon Whitley, LARRY CONQUEST, Sheridan Rhoda, MICHAEL DELUCCIA, DEBORAH HASKINS, Carla Zielinski, Lynn White, Amy Abdoo, Director Ronnie Lawrence, BETTY LUTZ, DAVID DOBY, Douglas Kidd, Pamela K. Wyatt, RICHARD BELITS, Arthur Cartee, Jennifer Bond, JOSEPH E. VOGELBERGER, MARGARET BUCHANAN, Carrie Lupien, Steven Babin, KENNETH MIKELL, SANDUGENE BRANTLEY, David Cadieux, William Barfield, Gregory Alan Wayland, Arlene McMurrain, Debi Matthews, Angela Kleinpeter, JOAN CHASE, Tenna Sparks, Sharon Winningham, MONICA LINSON, Brenda Johnson, Virgil Beck, Dana Viola, LORETTA WYNN, Sandra R. Weeks, Randy J. Wright, Shannon Cook, LINDA MACEACHERN, Edward Lee Heindl, Thomas John Harris, CHARLES MCCHORD CARRICO, JR., Ronald Johnson, LYNDIA TARVER, Thelma Myles, Dennis Williams, Scott P Schlesinger, Gary Campu, Fernando Zaragoza, Rayna Lynn Grimaldi, Douglas Edgar Barnette, Scott Fraser, Ryan Dahl, SUSAN CARBAGAL, Curtis Allen, PHILLIP MCDONALD, Lisa Penix, Anna Sansone, Nataliya Birman, Tabatha Lafferty, Robin Sharis McKinney, Terrance Cooke, Connie McCartney, Laura Tedford, TRULA B. DAVIS, Robert Zielinski, Johnny Duyn, Everett R. Wyatt, ALETHEA MCCORD, Christopher Wamble, JEFFREY BARAJAS, Sonia Rebollo, Brad Scarola, Breannon Hochberger, Joshua D. Clark, Kirk Faltersack, Angel Aponte, Tammy Harmon, Anthony Miliner, Sara Souza, Mr. Thomas A Wells, WAYNE UFFELMAN, JAMES MARTIN, APRIL MICHELLE BRYANT, Barbara J. Seidita, Lauren S. Miller, Bridgette Griffith, Lisa Proulx, Marishia Qualls, Douglas A. Dellaccio, Crystal Wilson, Michelle Coggins, TRACY CANERY, Mr. Michael C. Konn, Reva Hodges, Vicki Sherbet, ROBERT IANNUZZI, JR, Marilyn Williams, Eric Ragis, RONALD COLLUM, DAWN M. ALVIAR, Denise Guy, THE ESTATE OF DONALD BUCHANAN, LENA MARIE BELL, Jeffery Walker, JAMES TABOR, Renee Chatman, MARY SUE ROSE, ROXANNE ZACEK, Annie Day, MICHAEL E. BLAKE, Barry Fletcher, DANIEL DUNNE, Bobbie Serviss, James Sturgill, Vanessa Epting, Richard L Sparks, Victor Germano, VERDENIS P. KING, Johnny J. Bernstein, David McAnally, Antoine Dodson, BRET LEE ALLEN, HEATHER WASZAK, Ronald Ragan, Cynthia Bernstein, Darlene Maphis, Jim Penix, LYNDA LIEM, JOHN DOBY, Steven Abdoo, Chris Troyan, SHARON DAWSON, TAMMIE MAE MACKLEY, Michael Karpal, Nancy Sturgill, Ashley C Keller, Adam William Krause, Joletta Jordan, Mike A. Carroll, Lyndon Martin, Karl D. Stursberg, Christopher P Yuhl, Charles Glasscock, CHRISTINE ERFFT, ROBIN MARABLE, Luis Torres, Suzanne Drescher, Tom Roeser, JUANITA WILKERSON, TROY MORTON, Howell Franklin, Brad Hoag, MARISA ROESSLER, SHEILA R. BLEVINS, Herve I Trapani, Donald A. Britcher, Sammy Bryson, Michael Lane, Thomas Sansone, FELISHA SMITH, Ronald Ragis, Jason Cagle, STEVEN WAYNE BICE, JR., CRISTINA LOUBRIEL, LAWRENCE DICKERSON, EDNA MITCHELL, Lisa Ragis, Donald Leon, Walter Simmons, CHARLES WOMACK, John Scholl, Britt Wallace, SHEILA COFFEY, Je Yon Jung, SHANNON MULL, KEVIN SOARES, Francisco Maderal, CALVERT GARCIA, Herbert Souza, Kathy McMillian, Francisco Rebollo, Mark Holt, Charles Ellis, WILLIAM J. JOHNSON and Brenda Sjoden
Counter Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2020md02924
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1407
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 5065 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of New York. Case Number 1:21-cv-07068 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:22-cv-80047-RLR Kotcherov v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 1/10/2022. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5064 NOTICE by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation re 5058 Order,,, of Filing Specially Appearing Subpoena Respondents Jurisdictional Memorandum of Law on Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A to Emery Pharma Jurisdictional Brief, #3 Exhibit B to Emery Pharma Jurisdictional Brief) (Gilbert, Robert)
January 10, 2022 Filing 5063 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #4789 Notice of Appeal, filed by Barry Fletcher, Edward Lee Heindl, Rayna Lynn Grimaldi. Date received by USCA: 12/16/2021. USCA Case Number: 21-14325-J. (apz)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5062 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-83) MDL 2924 re: E.D. Texas, C.A. No. 5:21-00095 Patterson v. TEVA USA, et al. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-83" filed on November 15, 2021, is LIFTED. This action is transferred to the Southern District of Florida for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings under 28 U.S.C. 1407 being conducted by the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5061 ORDER MEMORIALIZING DISCOVERY RULINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 1/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (mc)
January 7, 2022 Filing 5060 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Tamryn Holley by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Sharpe, Paige)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5059 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-87) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (pes)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5058 PAPERLESS ORDER. At docket entry 5053 , the Court referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart the Defendants' Expedited Motion to Compel Deposition #5051 . The Court understands that the party to be compelled, Najafi Pharma, Inc. d/b/a Emery Pharma and Ron Najafi, Ph.D., has raised an argument about this Court's jurisdiction to compel its deposition. The Court withdraws the referral to Judge Reinhart to the extent that this Court will rule on that jurisdictional issue. The Motion remains referred to Judge Reinhart for the purpose of a ruling on whether to compel a deposition, should such a ruling be necessary following the Court's resolution of the jurisdictional issue. Najafi Pharma, Inc. shall file a response on the jurisdictional issue by noon on January 10, 2022. Defendants shall file any reply by noon on January 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/6/2022. (sk01)
January 6, 2022 Filing 5057 RESPONSE to Motion re #4924 MOTION to Remand Removing Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Replies due by 1/13/2022. (Agneshwar, Anand)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5056 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing re: miscellaneous matters held on 1/5/2022. Total time in court: 2 hours : 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hk02)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5055 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #4752 Notice of Appeal filed by Jerry Boggs, Patricia Devinsky, Jennifer Caldwell, Bobby R Boyd, Ronald Leach, Donna Sanders, Daniel Morris, Willie Davis, Suleiman Nawaey, Phillip Ceparano, Rhonda M Cocroft, Jon T King, Matthew P Winter, Daniel Gill, Christa Branderhorst, Richard Whetstone, Susan P Cordell, Cornelia Snyder, Juan G. Barajas, Douglas Moran, Beverly Gage, Terri H. Bickerstaff, Wilfried Wagner, Vicky Willison, Kathleen Poole, Kathy Welch, Deborah Assman, Jaqueline Fioribello, Walt McNeela, James Addison, Stephen Hamblin, Amber Burgess, Roberta Perez, Daniel Munt, Christie L. Pump, Jimmie P. Rich, Randy Hutchinson, Rita Chenois, Julia Aguilar, Chester Schwam, Henry Chapman, Thomas Boerboom, Mandy Cordray, Deborah Quartel. Date received by USCA: 12/15/2021. USCA Case Number: 21-14325-J. (apz)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5053 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING for appropriate disposition #5051 Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of Emory Pharma and Ron Najafi. Motion referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/4/2022. (sk01)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5054 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Michael P. Kenny, Esq. (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5052 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #4750 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Comerford, Thomas Sansone, David L. Burg, Cornell Fox, Rodney Walker, Carly Fields, Luz Elen Figueroa, Francis A. Schrotberger, Josephine Howard, Anne Burrell, Gary Tadd, Mary Gibson, Larry Brooks, Arlene McMurrain, Kevin Base, Damien Buchwald, Craig Kuhlmann, Phillis Watkins, Albert Elliot, Martha Garland, Lori L. McCullum, Vincent Ackerman, Clayton Aguillard, Richard Beach, Denise Carrell, Gohar A. Husain, The Estate of Linda Cephas, Jay Melkus, Joseph John Balistreri, Patrick McManus, Neal Menninger, Kim Davis, Felice Michetti, Raymond Keeler, Edward Nunley, Jeff Calkins, Edwin Quattlebaum, Billie Thacker, Albertha Jackson, Shawn L. Francis, Mark Badore, Lesley Higginbotham, Matthew O'Dor, Anthony Jones, Sandra Gardner, RONALD COLLUM, Kathy McMillian, Doris Moses, Matthew Connolly, William Higginbotham, Carol A Murphy, Rachel Calloway, William Love, Francis Light, Patricia G. Miller, Judith M LeDoux, Sharon Tuff, David Dooloukas, Johnny J. Bernstein, Stephen Mitchell, Willie Armstead, Rufus Wiley, James E. Jackson, Ronne Kay Johnstone, Steven Abdoo, Roderick Smith, Marlene Savoie, Kurt Howell, Kenneth R Portis, James Montgomery, Jerry Bowers, Irvin Stafford, Rebecca Quattlebaum, William Tsiros, Jeffrey Yuhasz, Gloria Ruth Fite, Golden Stockman, Sylvia Landry, Joseph E. Chille, Deidre Galvin, Darin Cohen, BRET LEE ALLEN, Michael W Napp, Sr., Clarence Bryant, Michael Moses, Annie Day, Darell Blanchard, Yvette Bloem, Brenda Jones, Mark Allan Blake, Christine Aguillard, Melvin Blount, Loraine Comerford, Brad Scarola, Larry D. Eaton, Telma Bellinger, Roxie Schrotberger, Beverly Carr, Gregory Grace, John R. Peyton, Jr., Halah Issa Al Sabbagh, Shawn Oakley, Miriam Talbert, Jill Felter, Charles C Williams, Sr., Steven J. Rusboldt, Jose Gregorio Penaloza Flores, Clarence Dimond, Catherine Smart, Sudie Rison, Bonita Keeler, Kimberly Wilharm, Geraldo W. Scatena, Ronald Seiler, Vicky R. O'Dor, Michael W. Allen, Judy Perry, SAMUEL LAW, Kimberly Wilson, Earnestine Timmons, Kathryn Anderson, Holly McWhorter-Doctherow, Orvey R Tanner, Lowell Hunt, Richard Bobbitt, Sr., Michael Scott, Andrea Cohen, Benita Bobbitt, George Edwards, Jr., Joann Herron, Gwendolyn Bibbs, Cecil C. Tucker, Luis Torres, Phyllis McNally, Ernest Lee, Judy S Brooks, Garrett Mullins, Patricia Ackerman, Lori Blamer, Brenda Sjoden, Mark Gibson, Michael Stockman, Donald A. Britcher, David Moloney, Beverly Jean Harper, Paula A. McCarty, The Estate of Betty J. Price, Jacqueline B. Jackson, Brenda Sprague, Debbie Kallhoff, SHERRI PELLEGRENE, Anna Sansone, Franklin Guzman, Pooran Ramkissoon, Ramin Rassouli, Rhonda F Meadows, Kevin McCullum, Pamela J Garwood, Barbara Hunt, Anna Spence, KENNETH MIKELL, Jacqueline Sayegh, Donna Fox, Eileen Lowery, Paula Kalatshoff, Kevin Coleman, Marina Spektor, Beverly Hunter, Melissa Winston-Brown, Robin Mizrahi, Jed Yocum, Michael Ballard, Elias Flores, Robert Kimbell, Beth Johnson, Thomas Adam, Hugh Larkin, David Cedric Wimberley, Keith Sobieszczyk, Walter Jones, Eddie Fowler, Shawn P Walker, Evens Clerveau, Marilyn Turner, Terrance Cooke, Sherman J Hayes, Benel Clerveau, Mary S. Wimberley, Hilda A Pickney, Robert Gene Carrell, II, Michael Edward Peebles, Elizabeth Gillies, Larry Johnson, Darlene Wheatley, Glen Donnelly, Phyllis Britcher, Barbara A Nore, Bryan Heveron, John Russell, Richard K McCollum, William Green, Oswald Anfossi, Anne Burrell (Substituted for Charles Burrell, Sr.), William Spence, Joseph Lambert, Dorothy Mitchell, Kelly M. Rusboldt, Melvin P. Wheatley, John R. Snyder, Irwin Silbernik, Joseph Ferenczi, Jack Myers, Jr., Kenda Tate, Jose Rivera-Pagan, Johnny Hicks, JAMES EARL, Travis D. Groves, Jonte Lee, Bruce VanHoorn, Marilyn Beach, Henderson Garland, Suzanne Donnelly, JAMES TABOR, Daniel Smart, Bartholomew Conneely, Michael Nunez, Lawrence Oberhauser, John Ogla, Sylvester Jones, Gerri Dunagan, Ivan Wollman, Carol Bailey, Roderick Christopher, Thomas F Carr, Valerie Warren, Raymond Hale, Judy L Shepherd-Harpold, Migdalia Rivera Flores, Askia El Amin, Robert E Thrower, Kaye M. Snyder, Sara Edwards, Victoria Butler-Sloss, Shelly DeVolder, Ronald Balser, Gary Mark Jones, Diane Thornbor, Tina Estes, Tom Roeser, Colin Gillies, Joseph Lott, Katherine Arreaga, Patricia M Bryant, Stanley Mitchell Harper, Melissa Taylor, Cynthia Bernstein, Charles Herron, Ishmel Burus, Cleo Jones, Rachel Rodriguez, Christopher Layton, Darlene Bowers, Kerri L. Brest-Landry, Carole Kaili Daly, Joshua Soares, Allen Wilson, Jessica Stacey, Cathy Johnson, Bequethal Hale, Phyllis Tucker, Melinda Theus Evans, Bruce A Brooks, Thomas Bibbs, Wanda Stafford, Pamela Wiley, Amelia B. Weatherspoon, Michael T Winters, Donna Faye Nunley, Bettie Thomas, Laura Ann David, Jerry Zikmund, Jay Poindexter, Janet C. McCauley, Alice Jones, Arnold Burnett, Robert Townsend, EDNA MITCHELL, Terry Lynn Evans, Osvaldo Guanche, Kerry Miller, Christopher Algero, Suzanne Finer, Daria Connolly, Meredith Morris, Jeannette Hallak-Oberhauser, Ethel Blount, James F. Cavacini, Sr., Richard Sprague, Thomas Bellinger, Christine Yuhasz, Amanda McLeod, Deborah Zeringue, Chet Bullitt, Sherion Winstead, Rodney Dailey, Horlis Clark, Jr., Elizabeth A. Russell, Wilbert Thomas, Della Coleman, Sarah Erickson, Brenda Hayes, Gerald Moore, Jesse E. Warren, Marion Fite. Date received by USCA: 12/15/2021. USCA Case Number: 21-14325-J. (apz)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5051 MOTION to Compel DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF EMORY PHARMA AND RON NAJAFI by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Responses due by 1/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Eva Canaan, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 2021.04.26 - 3rd Party Subpoena to Emery Pharma, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Subpoena - Emery Pharma, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Subpoena - Ron Najafi, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Email from M. McGlamry, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - 2021.12.14 Email from E. Canaan to Plaintiffs' Counsel, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Rosemarie Riddle Bodgan with Ex. A, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - 2021.12.22 Email from S. Senhagi opposing Motion to consolidate, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - 2020.11.11 Ltr. to Paige Sharpe, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - 2020.06.22 Subpoena to Emery Pharma, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - 2020.07.02-28 Letter from P. Sharpe to B. Egan, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - 2020.10.15 Letter from P. Sharpe to B. Egan - Emery, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - 2021.07.16 letter from Eva Canaan to Sami Sedghani, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - 2021.08.04 Email from Sami Sedghani to Eva Canaan, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - 2021.12.22 Email from S. Sedghani to E. Canaan, #16 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Emery Depos)(Bayman, Andrew)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5050 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82482-RLR Clifford v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5049 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82472-RLR Hertz v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5048 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82462-RLR Alderman v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5047 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82461-RLR Bradley v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5046 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82460-RLR Cooper v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5045 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82454-RLR Roberts v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5044 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82452-RLR Middleton v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5043 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82451-RLR Phillips v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5021 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Anthony Anderocci, Crystal Anderson, Eric Armstrong, Patrick Ballew, Warren W. Beasaw, Wesley Blanchard, MaryKay Bonney, Tana Bourgeois, Lorna Brock, Cora Brown, Ronald Brown, Shirley Browning, Patricia M. Burke, Ronald S Burnsworth, Garth A Bywater, Ladonna Cadena, Rhonda Campbell, Phyllis Carpenter, Basil Chandler, Brad Chandler, Christina Chapman, Montgomery Clarke, Robert Conners, Arthur Connor, Linda Cook, Barbara Davis, Cathy Deloche, Carolyn Denham, Marie Duffy, Daniel Edwards, Albert Elberhardt, Donald Elliott, Lee Evans, Edward Fairley, Ralph Flathau, Beverly Forrest, Melondey Friddle, Doris Gay, Enza Gering, Clifton Gibson, Mildred Givens, Kenneth Granger, William M. Gray, Cindy Gruelle, Robert E. Haan, Flora Hacker, Katherine Hale, Richard Halford, Clifton Hamilton, Theresa Harms, Steven Harris, Leslie Hinton, Roy Hoffman, Steve Hogan, Marvin Jones, Steven J. Jones, Kevin Krebsbach, Goldie Leblanc, Ronald Lightfoot, Gary Lindsly, Demetrio Lopez, Gary Loveday, Deborah Martin, Alexandria Martinez, David Matchette, Delbert McDonald, Michael Mcalexander, Audrey Mendenall, Donald Miller, George Miller, Paul Minnick, Donna Moore, Terrance Moreland, Marsha Morgan, Donald Murden, Michael Nash, Kay Novick, Michael Nunez, Jacqueline Osborne, Albert Pollack, Cheryl Pond, Dan Poole, Tina Rawlins, Clara Richards, Patricia Rife-Beavers, Brenda Riley, Timothy Rini, Linda Rush, Wanda Russell, Karen Santaniello, Melanie Sepulvado, Carolyn Sharp, Richard Shobert, Angela Smith, Calvin Smith, Tommy Smith, Donald Spain, James Spence, Delores Stephens, Wendy Stewart, Tommie Thomas, Karl E. Thomas, Sr., Lori Thompson, Walter Upshaw, Gary Van Valkenburgh, Leonardo Vega, Ruth Vestal, Paul Wade, Nella M. Walters, Charles Webb, Monitta Williams, Henry Young re #4786 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,. No Transcript Requested. (Daniel, Stephen)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5014 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Zoom Conference held on 12/23/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-49 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/20/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2022. (Stipes, Pauline)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5013 TRANSCRIPT of Bellwether Selection Plan Hearing held on 10/25/2021 before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, 1-94 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/20/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2022. (Stipes, Pauline)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5012 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Zoom Conference held on 10/21/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-40 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/20/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/30/2022. (Stipes, Pauline)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5011 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82413-RLR Hammer v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5010 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82411-RLR Sloss v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5009 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82410-RLR Caras et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5008 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82409-RLR Campbell v. GlaxoSmithKlein LLC with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5007 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82408-RLR Donowitz v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5006 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82407-RLR Austin v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5020 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5022 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5019 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5023 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5016 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5024 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5015 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5017 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5018 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5029 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5037 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5036 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5035 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5038 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5039 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5042 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5025 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5040 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5034 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5041 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5027 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5026 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5028 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5033 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5032 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5031 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 30, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5030 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5005 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82406-RLR Morris v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5004 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82405-RLR Gitlerv. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5003 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Barry Fletcher re #4789 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Roark, Emily)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5002 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by JOHN DANIEL HIGHTOWER re #4779 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Antunovich, Tomislav)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5001 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by James Bird re #4779 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Antunovich, Tomislav)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5000 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Karen Durapau, Estate of Herbert R. Walden, Estate of Richard M. Durapau, Jr by and through Karen Durapau, as personal representative, Estate of Teresa Tedesco, Estate of Wanda K. Woodham, Kirk Faltersack, Gary Hart, Ronald Johnson, Ivan Safra, Vicki Sherbet, John E. Woodham, Jr., Everett R. Wyatt, Pamela K. Wyatt re #4785 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Moore, Jennifer)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4999 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Catherine M. Drislane (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4995 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 21-cv-82399-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4994 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 21-cv-82397-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4993 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 21-cv-82395-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4992 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jeffrey R. Schaefer. Attorney Jeffrey R. Schaefer added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft). (Schaefer, Jeffrey)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4991 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Nathan A. Schachtman. Attorney Nathan A. Schachtman added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft). (Schachtman, Nathan)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4990 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Jerome E. Langenderfer, Mary E. Langenderfer re #4759 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (O'Brien, James)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4989 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Tharwat Hens re #4780 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Fritch, C.)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4988 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Robert Baker, Tate Cantrelle, Mike A. Carroll, Norma Johnson, Michael C. Konn, SANDRA PAYNE, Barbara J. Seidita, GREGORY VAVRA, Thomas A Wells, Gary C. Will, Randy J. Wright re #4760 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Herberth, Brian)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4987 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82394-RLR Rowe v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4986 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82393-RLR McCalvin v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4985 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Goldie Leblanc, Marsha Morgan, et al re #4786 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (hh)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4984 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82391-RLR Posey v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4983 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82390-RLR Steadman v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4982 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82389-RLR Flagler v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4981 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Kaeanna W. Dzialo. Attorney Kaeanna W. Dzialo added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft). (Dzialo, Kaeanna)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4980 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82388-RLR Mullis v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4979 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82387-RLR Henton v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4978 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82386-RLR Durham v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4977 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82385-RLR Widner v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 Filing 4976 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82384-RLR Cotton v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 29, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4998 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 29, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4997 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 29, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4996 restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4975 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82383-RLR Trimmer v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4974 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82382-RLR Massey v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4973 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82381-RLR McLeod v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4972 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82380-RLR Weiss v.GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4971 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82379-RLR Rodriguez v. GlaxoSmithKline Consumer Healthcare L.L.C. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4970 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82378-RLR Evans v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4969 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82377-RLR Wise v. GlaxoSmithKlein LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4968 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82376-RLR Luaces v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4967 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82375-RLR Johnson V. GlaxoSmithKline LLC, et al with documents 1-6. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4966 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82374-RLR Cancel v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4965 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82373-RLR Corey et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4964 NOTICE by Stephanie Vega NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM SERVICE LIST AND ECF EMAIL NOTIFICATION (Shahrokh, Koorosh)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4963 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82372-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4962 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Benjamin Connor Zavitz re #4793 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Hart, John)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4961 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney John R. Ipsaro re #4957 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney John R. Ipsaro has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4960 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Megan B. Gramke (Gramke, Megan)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4959 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82371-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4958 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82370-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (pes)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4957 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by John R. Ipsaro. Attorney John R. Ipsaro added to party Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft). (Ipsaro, John)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4956 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82369-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4955 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Zein E. Obagi, Jr. (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4954 NOTICE by ANN KABELE, JUSTIN KABELE Removal from Service List (Haag, Eric)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4953 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ANN KABELE, JUSTIN KABELE (Haag, Eric)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4952 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Becky Creel, Richard Creel re 4794 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Palmintier, Michael)
December 28, 2021 Filing 4951 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82368-RLR Iannone v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4950 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82367-RLR Schafer v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4949 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82366-RLR Ottaviano et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4948 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82365-RLR Schroer v.GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4947 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82364-RLR Stephens v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4946 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82363-RLR Hamilton v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4945 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82362-RLR Corsello et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4944 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82361-RLR Whelan v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4943 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-24374-RLR Stajkowski v. GlaxoSmith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4942 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Bany (sBoardman, James)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4941 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Brian David Nelson re #4767 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Wheeler, John)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4940 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sandra Miller (Rieders, Clifford)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4939 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82360-RLR Yontz v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4938 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82358-RLR Davis et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4937 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82351-RLR Taylor v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4936 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82350-RLR Chafin v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4935 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82349-RLR Lange v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4934 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82348-RLR Ferguson et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4933 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82345-RLR Yarbrough et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4932 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82341-RLR Polizzotto et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4931 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82340-RLR Filipietz v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4930 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82339-RLR Farino et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4929 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82338-RLR Naumann v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4928 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82336-RLR Gajewski et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4927 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82335-RLR Claud v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4926 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82333-RLR Moore v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4925 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82331-RLR Agosto Santana v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 23, 2021 (ENTERED IN ERROR) Cases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) Modified on 12/27/2021 (mc).
December 23, 2021 Filing 4924 MOTION to Remand by Elaine Harrell. (Keller, Ashley)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4923 ORDER memorializing discovery rulings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart See attached document for full details. (BER)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4922 PRETRIAL ORDER # 70: Order Relating to Deceased Claimants in the Initial Discovery Pool. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4921 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER # 18 - Production of Records for Initial Census for Deceased & Incapacitated Claimants. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (bkd)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4917 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82325-RLR Waddell et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4916 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82323-RLR Marucheau v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4915 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82322-RLR Lee et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-6. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4914 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82321-RLR Harvey et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4913 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82320-RLR Luper Sr. v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4912 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82319-RLR Rowell et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4911 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Central District of California. Case Number 2:21-cv-09378 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82533-RLR Marlene Boyadjian v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al on 12/22/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 86 (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4910 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82318-RLR Lombardi et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4909 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82315-RLR Bradley v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4908 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82313-RLR Jones v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4907 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82312-RLR Sanchez et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4906 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82311-RLR Dozier et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-6. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4905 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82310-RLR Tucker v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4904 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82309-RLR Jones v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4903 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82308-RLR Swafford v.GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4902 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82306-RLR Wise v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-6. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4901 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82305-RLR Reynolds v.GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4900 PAPERLESS Order. In light of the Court's Order at DE 4894, an ominbus Discovery Status Conference is set for 1/5/2022 at 04:00 PM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. For further instructions, please refer to DE 4894. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/22/2021. (jgy)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4899 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82303-RLR Langston v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4898 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82302-RLR Personette v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4897 PAPERLESS Order. In light of the Court's Order at DE 4892, a Zoom Discovery Status Conference on GSK depositions is set for 12/23/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. For further instructions, please refer to DE 4892. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 12/22/2021. (jgy)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4896 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82301-RLR Murphy v.GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4895 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82300-RLR Moynihan II v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4894 PAPERLESS Order setting an ominbus Discovery Status Conference for 1/5/2021 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. With the approaching discovery cutoff, the Court wants to address issues in sufficient time that any rulings can be implemented before the cutoff. So, it will hear all pending discovery disputes at this hearing. A party wishing to include an issue on the hearing agenda shall notify Special Master Dodge and the relevant opposing counsel in writing on or before 5:00 p.m. Eastern time on December 30, 2021. The status conference will be held in an open proceeding by Zoom teleconference. No counsel are permitted to appear in person. Any Plaintiffs' attorney seeking credentials to attend shall email their request to ZantacLiaison@colson.com. Any defense counsel seeking to attend shall contact Defense Liaison Joanne O'Connor. Counsel who have not yet made an appearance and do not want to identify their clients or potential clients to the Liaisons, and any individuals not affiliated with a party to the litigation, may instead contact Special Master Jaime Dodge, Director of the Emory Institute for Complex Litigation, to be added to the attendee list. The number of attendees may be limited by technology capacity. In advance of the hearing, the Liaisons and the Special Master will provide the log-in credentials and instructions to all attendees. Only those who register in advance will be permitted to attend, absent special exception of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (BER)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4893 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82299-RLR Kelley v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4892 PAPERLESS Order setting a Discovery Status Conference on GSK depositions for 12/23/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. The status conference will be held in an open proceeding by Zoom teleconference. No counsel are permitted to appear in person. Any Plaintiffs' attorney seeking credentials to attend shall email their request to ZantacLiaison@colson.com. Any defense counsel seeking to attend shall contact Defense Liaison Joanne O'Connor. Counsel who have not yet made an appearance and do not want to identify their clients or potential clients to the Liaisons, and any individuals not affiliated with a party to the litigation, may instead contact Special Master Jaime Dodge, Director of the Emory Institute for Complex Litigation, to be added to the attendee list. The number of attendees may be limited by technology capacity. In advance of the hearing, the Liaisons and the Special Master will provide the log-in credentials and instructions to all attendees. Only those who register in advance will be permitted to attend, absent special exception of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (BER)
December 22, 2021 Filing 4891 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82298-RLR Gable v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 22, 2021 Set Deadlines Per DE#4894 Status Conference Re:Ominbus Discovery Matters set for 1/5/2021 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (cqs)
December 22, 2021 Set Deadlines Per DE#4892. Status Conference Re: Discovery Matters set for 12/23/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. (cqs)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4890 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82295-RLR Coleman v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4889 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82294-RLR Webb v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4888 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82293-RLR Papia v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4887 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82292-RLR Sawart v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4886 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82291-RLR Vanderworken v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4885 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82290-RLR Sutton v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4884 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82289-RLR De Armas v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4883 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82288-RLR Allen v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-6. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4882 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82287-RLR Riggs v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4881 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82285-RLR Young v.GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-6. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4880 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82283-RLR Duffy v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4879 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82282-RLR Bahr et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4878 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82280-RLR Bryant v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4877 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82278-RLR McKendree et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4876 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82277-RLR Sitterly et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4875 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82272-RLR Bero v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4874 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82270-RLR Turner v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4873 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82269-RLR Gonzalez et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4872 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82268-RLR Staten v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4871 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stephanie Vega (Shahrokh, Koorosh)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4870 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82267-RLR Litvack v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4869 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82265-RLR Obrentz v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4868 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82262-RLR Carrier v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4867 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82261-RLR Huggins v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4866 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82260-RLR Hart v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4865 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82259-RLR Jackson v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4864 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82258-RLR Vallozzi v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4863 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82256-RLR Karen v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4862 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82255-RLR Williamson v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4861 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82254-RLR Bedecs et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4860 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82253-RLR Tobias et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4859 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82253-RLR Tobias et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4858 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4669 MDL Conditional Transfer Order, #4670 MDL Transmittal Letter, #4671 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,. US Mail returned for: LaShonda Wittingham. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4857 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4662 Order on Motion to Compel. US Mail returned for: Matthew Boggs, Tonya Vasquez. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4856 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82251-RLR Petro v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4855 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82250-RLR Sanders et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4854 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82249-RLR Jackson et al v. Pfizer Inc et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4853 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82248-RLR Pitchford v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4852 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82247-RLR Maddox v.GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4851 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82246-RLR Spearing v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4850 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82244-RLR Moses v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4849 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Cindy D. Salvo (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4848 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Johnathan Fitzgerald Austin (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4847 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82243-RLR Deemer v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4846 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82241-RLR Bezold et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4845 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82240-RLR Fuschetto et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4844 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82238-RLR Quigley et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et a with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4843 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82237-RLR Douglas v Glaxosmithkline LLC et al., with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4842 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82236-RLR Vaskie v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4841 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82234-RLR Jones v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4840 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82232-RLR Fox v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4839 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82231-RLR Harris v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4838 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82230-RLR Villada v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4837 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82227-RLR Strother v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4836 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82226-RLR Taylor v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4835 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82225-RLR Green v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4834 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82223-RLR Ciotti v. Sanofi et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4833 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82222-RLR Ross Jr. v GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4832 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82220-RLR Zuckerman v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4831 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82219-RLR Easton v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4830 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82218-RLR Ford v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4829 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82215-RLR Ramos v. Pfizer Inc et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4828 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82214-RLR Hanson v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4827 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82213-RLR Stuckey v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4826 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82212-RLR Bermudez v. GlaxoSmith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4825 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82211-RLR Seaton v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4824 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82210-RLR Reault v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4823 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82209-RLR Jankowski v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4822 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82208-RLR Smith v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4821 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Western District of New York. Case Number 1:21-cv-01251 with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82343-RLR Brege v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 12/16/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 86 (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4818 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Fletcher V. Trammell (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4817 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4816 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Patrick McAndrew (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4815 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4802 MDL Amended Complaint. ERROR: Short-Form Complaint Filed in the MDL Case. Filer must file the Short-Form Complaint only in the Member Cases. (See DE #1496 Amended Pretrial Order # 31) (mc)
December 17, 2021 Filing 4814 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Appeal Filing Fee received per docket entry #4794 on 12/17/2021 in the amount of $ 505.00, receipt number FLS100242033. (jcs)
December 17, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4819 restricted/sealed until further notice. (mg)
December 17, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4820 restricted/sealed until further notice. (mg)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4920 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82330-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4919 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82329-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4918 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82328-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (pes)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4813 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82207-RLR Spears v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4812 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82206-RLR Bouie v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4811 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82205-RLR Brown v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4810 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82204-RLR with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4809 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82203-RLR Daggett v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4808 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82202-RLR Vickers v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4807 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82201-RLR Newton v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4806 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82200-RLR Zimmerman v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4805 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82199-RLR Kaissar v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4804 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 0:21-cv-62487-RLR Siefert v. GlaxoSmith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4803 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4802 MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Londi Menendez.(Morrow, Nicholas)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4801 PAPERLESS ORDER. The parties have notified the Court through the Special Master that a number of plaintiffs and claimants who are required under Pretrial Order # 69 to file short form complaints by today, December 16, are now deceased. Plaintiffs request, and Defendants do not oppose, a suspension of today's deadline for such deceased plaintiffs and claimants. The Court grants that request. The December 16 filing deadline for deceased plaintiffs and claimants is hereby suspended pending further court order. The December 16 filing deadline for all other plaintiffs and claimants remains in place. By December 21, the parties shall file a joint motion proposing an alternative filing deadline and subsequent related deadlines for deceased plaintiffs and claimants. The parties shall meet and confer with the Special Master in advance of filing this motion. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/16/2021. (sk01)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4800 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4788 MDL Amended Complaint. ERROR: Short-Form Complaint Filed in the MDL Case. Filer must file the Short-Form Complaint only in the Member Cases. (See DE #1496 Amended Pretrial Order # 31) (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4799 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4761 Amended Complaint #4787 MDL Amended Complaint. ERROR: Short-Form Complaint Filed in the MDL Case Filer must file the Short-Form Complaint only in the Member Cases. (See DE #1496 Amended Pretrial Order # 31) (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4798 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fees $505.00, receipt number AFLSDC-15253857 - Notice of Appeal by Anna Deaton re 4795 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, (Bednarz, Joseph)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4797 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Thomas E. Ruzicka (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4796 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Grant L. Davis (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc) (Main Document 4796 replaced to reflect the correct filing date on 12/16/2021) (mc).
December 16, 2021 Filing 4792 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Vinita Gandhi (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 16, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4791 restricted/sealed until further notice. (1324861)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4782 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4778 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4784 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4779 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4780 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4781 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4793 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgment under the appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 4794 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4789 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4785 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 16, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4786 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4795 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #4783 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE 4794 . It is not necessary to refile this document. Notice of Appeal Requires a Fee; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED Appellate Filing Fee Not Paid. The Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee-Notice of Appeal and electronically pay the correct fee of $505.00 within 24 hrs of this notice. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4794 Notice of Appeal re #4665 Judgment by Becky Creel, Richard Creel. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (SEE DE #4783 FOR IMAGE.) (apz)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4793 Notice of Appeal as to Judgment #4664 and Judgment #4665 by Benjamin Connor Zavitz. Filing fee $ 505.00. receipt number AFLSDC-15250446. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Hart, John) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (apz).
December 15, 2021 Filing 4790 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Number 2:21-cv-02206 with documents 1-5. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82229-RLR Stribling v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 12/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer order 86 (mc)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4789 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment,, #3750 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, by Barry Fletcher, Rayna Lynn Grimaldi, Edward Lee Heindl. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15250745. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Roark, Emily)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4788 MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Nancy Dakuras against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, GlaxoSmithkline, PLC, Patheon Manufacturing Serivces, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, filed by NANCY DAKURAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tubbs, Jacob)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4787 MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline (America) Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Glaxosmithkline PLC, Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Pfizer, Inc., filed by Jeffrey Halpern.(Clark, Richard)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4786 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment,, by Goldie LeBlanc, Marsha Morgan, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Thomas Morgan, Richard Shobert, Tommie Thomas, Clifton Hamilton, Donald Spain, Katherine Hale, Melanie Sepulvado, Brad Chandler, Henry Young, Kenneth Granger, James Spence, Linda Cook, Barbara Davis, David Matchette, Calvin Smith, Alexandria Martinez, Monitta Williams, Donald W. Miller, Jr., Edward Fairley, Ralph Flathau, Albert Pollack, Charles Webb, Kevin Krebsbach, Eric Armstrong, Walter Upshaw, Karl E. Thomas, Sr., Tommy Smith, Ronald Brown, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Rose Brown, Delbert McDonald, Karen Santaniello; individually; and as Successor in Interest to the Estate of Vincent D. Santaniello, Shirley Browning, George Miller, Carolyn Sharp, Patrick Ballew, Crystal Anderson, Michael Nash, Gary Loveday, Linda Rush, Steven Harris, Michael Nunez, Christina Chapman, Melondey Friddle, Cheryl Pond, Ruth Vestal, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Thomas Vestal, Patricia Rife-Beavers, Cathy Deloche, Dan Poole, Delores Stephens, Cora Brown, Wendy Stewart, Wanda Russell, Leonardo Vega, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Tammy Flores, Ronald S. Burnsworth, Steven J. Jones, Kay Novick, Leslie Hinton, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Timothy I. Murdoch, Donald Elliott, Jacqueline Osborne, Warren W. Beasaw, Lee Evans, Terrance Moreland, Patricia M. Burke, Daniel Edwards, Robert E. Haan, Clara Richards, Donna Moore, Garth Bywater, Timothy Rini, Rhonda Campbell, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Nettie Hudson, Paul Minnick, Robert Conners, Angela Smith, Lori Thompson, Anthony Anderocci, Donald Murden, Michael McAlexander, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Michelle McAlexander, MaryKay Bonney, Paul J. Wade, Gary Lindsly, Beverly Forrest, Flora Hacker, Deborah Martin, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Michael Martin, Ronald Lightfoot, Mildred Givens, Tina Rawlins, Tana Bourgeois, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Beverly Bourgeois, Steve Hogan, Enza Gering, William M. Gray, Wesley Blanchard, Ladonna Cadena, Doris Gay, Basil Chandler, Arthur Connor, Carolyn Denham, Richard Halford, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Allen Halford, Demetrio Lopez, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of Virginia Lopez, Brenda Riley, Gary Van Valkenburgh, Nella M. Walters, Lorna Brock, Phyllis Carpenter, Montgomery Clarke, Marie Duffy, individually; and as Successor In Interest to the Estate of John Duffy, Albert Elberhardt, Clifton Gibson, Cindy Gruelle, Theresa Harms, Roy Hoffman, Marvin Jones, Audrey Mendenall. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15250288. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Daniel, Stephen)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4785 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment,, by Karen Durapau, Estate of Herbert R. Walden, Estate of Richard M. Durapau, Jr by and through Karen Durapau, as personal representative, Estate of Teresa Tedesco, Estate of Wanda K. Woodham, Kirk Faltersack, Gary Hart, Ronald Johnson, Ivan Safra, Vicki Sherbet, John E. Woodham, Jr., Everett R. Wyatt, Pamela K. Wyatt. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15250347. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Moore, Jennifer)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4784 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment,, by Theresa Barnes, Earl Gooden. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15250392. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (McCrary, Sean)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4783 NOTICE by Becky Creel, Richard Creel re #4750 Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Palmintier, Michael)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4782 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment,, by Tina Worley. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15250144. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Spencer, Ashley)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4781 Amended Notice of Appeal as to #4665 Judgment and #4664 Final Judgment by Pamela Neal. Filing fee $ 505.00. No Filing Fee Required. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Webster, Jason) (linked docket entry) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (apz).
December 15, 2021 Filing 4780 Notice of Appeal re DE #4664 Final Judgment and DE #4665 Final Judgment by Tharwat Hens. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15250043. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Fritch, C.) (linked docket entry) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (apz).
December 15, 2021 Filing 4779 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment,, by James Bird, JOHN DANIEL HIGHTOWER. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15249459. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Antunovich, Tomislav)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4778 Notice of Appeal re DE #4664 Final Judgment and DE #4665 Final Judgment by Thomas G. Skrivan. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15249453. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Butsch, David) (linked docket entry) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (apz).
December 15, 2021 Filing 4777 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Tannaz Horriyatkhah re #3949 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Shabani, Natali)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4776 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jacob Tubbs (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4775 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jonathan R. Mencel (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4774 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment,, by Dian Sharma. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15249024. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Butsch, David)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4773 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Joseph John Fantini (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4772 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Davis Schwartz (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4771 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Latoya Chambers (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4770 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Morris Dweck (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc) Modified on 12/20/2021 (No Email address on form)(mc).
December 15, 2021 Filing 4769 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #4763 Notice (Other). Notice of Appeal Requires a Fee; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED Appellate Filing Fee Not Paid. The Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee-Notice of Appeal and electronically pay the correct fee of $505.00 within 24 hrs of this notice.Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE 4768 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4768 Notice of Appeal re #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment by Anna Deaton, Mike Deaton. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (SEE DE #4763 FOR IMAGE.) (apz)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4767 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment by Brian David Nelson. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15248607. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Wheeler, John)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4766 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment,, #3750 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, by Ketty Portal, Britt Wallace. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15248372. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Martinez-Cid, Ricardo)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4765 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Andrew J. Cross (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4764 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Alyson M. Petrick (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4763 NOTICE by Anna Deaton (Bednarz, Joseph)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4762 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Melissa Nott Davis re #4749 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating her information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to her PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating her information. See the Court's website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (cw)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4761 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Jerry Hendrix.(Barfield, William)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4760 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Final Judgment and #4665 Judgment, by Robert Baker, Tate Cantrelle, Michael Carroll, Norma Johnson, Michael C. Konn, SANDRA PAYNE, Barbara J. Seidita, GREGORY VAVRA, Thomas Wells, Gary Will, Randy J. Wright. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15247203. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Herberth, Brian) (linked docket entry) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (apz).
December 15, 2021 Filing 4759 Notice of Appeal as to #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment,, by Jerome E. Langenderfer, Mary E. Langenderfer. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15247255. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (O'Brien, James)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4754 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82178-RLR Heveron v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 15, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Orders/Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4752 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4750 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 4757 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4759 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4774 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4767 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 4768 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4760 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 15, 2021 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Final Judgments under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4766 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4758 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #4753 Notice (Other).Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE 4757 . It is not necessary to refile this document. Notice of Appeal Requires a Fee; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED Appellate Filing Fee Not Paid. The Filer must file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee-Notice of Appeal and electronically pay the correct fee of $505.00 within 24 hrs of this notice. (apz)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4757 Notice of Appeal re #4664 Judgment, #4665 Judgment by Dennis Taylor. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (SEE DE #4753 FOR IMAGE.) (apz)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4756 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #4752 Notice of Appeal. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (apz)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4755 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #4750 Notice of Appeal. Document Not Linked; ERROR - The filed document was not linked to the related docket entry. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (apz)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4753 NOTICE by Dennis Taylor of Appeal (Rubenstein, Martin)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4752 Notice of Appeal re DE #2512 Order, DE #2513 Order, DE #2515 Order, DE #2516 Order, DE #2532 Order, DE 2840 Order, DE #3716 Order, DE #3719 Order, DE #3750 Order, DE #3751 Order, DE #4595 Order, DE #4664 Final Judgment and DE #4665 Final Judgment by James Addison, Julia Aguilar, Deborah Assman, Juan G. Barajas, Nicole C. Blankenship, Terri H. Bickerstaff, Thomas Boerboom, Jerry Boggs, Bobby R Boyd, Christa Branderhorst, Amber Burgess, Jennifer Caldwell, Phillip Ceparano, Henry Chapman, Rita Chenois, Ernest Clark, Rhonda M Cocroft, Susan P Cordell, Mandy Cordray, Willie Davis, Janice Defriese, Patricia Devinsky, Jaqueline Fioribello, Anne Fultz, Beverly Gage, Daniel Gill, Stephen Hamblin, Randy Hutchinson, Jon T King, Ronald Leach, John Mckenzie, Walt McNeela, Douglas Moran, Daniel Morris, Daniel Munt, Suleiman Nawaey, Roberta Perez, Kathleen Poole, Christie L. Pump, Deborah Quartel, Terrance A. Rice, Jimmie P. Rich, Fernando Rodriguez, Donna Sanders, Chester Schwam, Cornelia Snyder, James Taylor, Wilfried Wagner, Kathy Welch, Richard Whetstone, Vicky Willison, Matthew P Winter. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15244995. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Wichmann, Lawana) (linked docket entry) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (apz).
December 14, 2021 Filing 4751 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4748 MDL Amended Complaint. ERROR: Short-Form Complaint Filed in the MDL Case. Filer must file the Short-Form Complaint only in the Member Cases. (See DE #1496 Amended Pretrial Order # 31) (mc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4750 Notice of Appeal re DE #4664 Final Judgment and DE #4665 Final Judgment by BRET LEE ALLEN, Steven Abdoo, Patricia Ackerman, Vincent Ackerman, Thomas Adam, Christine Aguillard, Clayton Aguillard, Halah Issa Al Sabbagh, Christopher Algero, Kathryn Anderson, Oswald Anfossi, Willie Armstead, Katherine Arreaga, Mark Badore, Carol Bailey, Joseph John Balistreri, Michael Ballard, Ronald Balser, Kevin Base, Marilyn Beach, Richard Beach, Telma Bellinger, Thomas Bellinger, Cynthia Bernstein, Johnny J. Bernstein, Gwendolyn Bibbs, Thomas Bibbs, Mark Allan Blake, Lori Blamer, Darell Blanchard, Yvette Bloem, Melvin Blount, Ethel Blount, Darlene Bowers, Jerry Bowers, Kerri L. Brest-Landry, Phyllis Britcher, Donald A. Britcher, Bruce A Brooks, Judy S Brooks, Larry Brooks, Clarence Bryant, Patricia M Bryant, Damien Buchwald, Chet Bullitt, David L. Burg, Arnold Burnett, Anne Burrell, Anne Burrell (Substituted for Charles Burrell, Sr.), Ishmel Burus, Victoria Butler-Sloss, RONALD COLLUM, Jeff Calkins, Rachel Calloway, Beverly Carr, Thomas F Carr, Denise Carrell, Robert Gene Carrell, II, James F. Cavacini, Sr., Roderick Christopher, Horlis Clark, Jr, Benel Clerveau, Evens Clerveau, Andrea Cohen, Della Coleman, Kevin Coleman, Loraine Comerford, Robert Comerford, Bartholomew Conneely, Terrance Cooke, Rodney Dailey, Carole Kaili Daly, Laura Ann David, Kim Davis, Annie Day, Shelly DeVolder, Clarence Dimond, Glen Donnelly, Suzanne Donnelly, David Dooloukas, Gerri Dunagan, JAMES EARL, George Edwards, Jr, Sara Edwards, Askia El Amin, Albert Elliot, Tina Estes, Melinda Theus Evans, Terry Lynn Evans, Jill Felter, Joseph Ferenczi, Carly Fields, Luz Elen Figueroa, Suzanne Finer, Gloria Ruth Fite, Marion Fite, Elias Flores, Eddie Fowler, Cornell Fox, Donna Fox, Shawn L. Francis, Deidre Galvin, Sandra Gardner, Pamela J Garwood, Mark Gibson, Mary Gibson, Colin Gillies, Elizabeth Gillies, Gregory Grace, William Green, Travis D. Groves, Osvaldo Guanche, Franklin Guzman, Bequethal Hale, Raymond Hale, Jeannette Hallak-Oberhauser, Beverly Jean Harper, Stanley Mitchell Harper, Brenda Hayes, Sherman J Hayes, Charles Herron, Joann Herron, Johnny Hicks, Lesley Higginbotham, William Higginbotham, Josephine Howard, Kurt Howell, Barbara Hunt, Lowell Hunt, Beverly Hunter, Gohar A. Husain, Albertha Jackson, Jacqueline B. Jackson, James E. Jackson, Beth Johnson, Cathy Johnson, Larry Johnson, Ronne Kay Johnstone, Alice Jones, Anthony Jones, Brenda Jones, Cleo Jones, Gary Mark Jones, Sylvester Jones, Walter Jones, Paula Kalatshoff, Debbie Kallhoff, Bonita Keeler, Raymond Keeler, Robert Kimbell, Craig Kuhlmann, SAMUEL LAW, Joseph Lambert, Sylvia Landry, Hugh Larkin, Christopher Layton, Judith M LeDoux, Ernest Lee, Jonte Lee, Francis Light, Joseph Lott, William Love, KENNETH MIKELL, EDNA MITCHELL, Paula A. McCarty, Janet C. McCauley, Richard K McCollum, Kevin McCullum, Lori L. McCullum, Amanda McLeod, Patrick McManus, Kathy McMillian, Arlene McMurrain, Phyllis McNally, Holly McWhorter-Doctherow, Rhonda F Meadows, Jay Melkus, Neal Menninger, Felice Michetti, Kerry Miller, Patricia G. Miller, Dorothy Mitchell, Stephen Mitchell, Robin Mizrahi, David Moloney, James Montgomery, Gerald Moore, Meredith Morris, Doris Moses, Michael Moses, Garrett Mullins, Carol A Murphy, Jack Myers, Jr., Michael W Napp, Sr, Barbara A Nore, Michael Nunez, Donna Faye Nunley, Edward Nunley, Matthew O'Dor, Vicky R. O'Dor, Shawn Oakley, Lawrence Oberhauser, John Ogla, SHERRI PELLEGRENE, Michael Edward Peebles, Jose Gregorio Penaloza Flores, Judy Perry, John R. Peyton, Jr, Hilda A Pickney, Jay Poindexter, Kenneth R Portis, Edwin Quattlebaum, Rebecca Quattlebaum, Pooran Ramkissoon, Ramin Rassouli, Sudie Rison, Migdalia Rivera Flores, Jose Rivera-Pagan, Rachel Rodriguez, Tom Roeser, Kelly M. Rusboldt, Steven J. Rusboldt, Elizabeth A. Russell, John Russell, Thomas Sansone, Anna Sansone, Marlene Savoie, Jacqueline Sayegh, Brad Scarola, Geraldo W. Scatena, Francis A. Schrotberger, Roxie Schrotberger, Michael Scott, Ronald Seiler, Judy L Shepherd-Harpold, Irwin Silbernik, Brenda Sjoden, Catherine Smart, Daniel Smart, Roderick Smith, John R. Snyder, Kaye M. Snyder, Joshua Soares, Keith Sobieszczyk, Marina Spektor, Anna Spence, William Spence, Brenda Sprague, Richard Sprague, Jessica Stacey, Irvin Stafford, Wanda Stafford, Golden Stockman, Michael Stockman, JAMES TABOR, Gary Tadd, Orvey R Tanner, Kenda Tate, Melissa Taylor, Billie Thacker, The Estate of Betty J. Price, The Estate of Linda Cephas, Bettie Thomas, Wilbert Thomas, Robert E Thrower, Earnestine Timmons, Luis Torres, Robert Townsend, William Tsiros, Cecil C. Tucker, Phyllis Tucker, Sharon Tuff, Marilyn Turner, Bruce VanHoorn, Rodney Walker, Shawn P Walker, Jesse E. Warren, Valerie Warren, Phillis Watkins, Amelia B. Weatherspoon, Darlene Wheatley, Melvin P. Wheatley, Pamela Wiley, Rufus Wiley, Kimberly Wilharm, Charles C Williams, Sr, Allen Wilson, Kimberly Wilson, David Cedric Wimberley, Mary S. Wimberley, Sherion Winstead, Melissa Winston-Brown, Michael T Winters, Ivan Wollman, Jed Yocum, Christine Yuhasz, Jeffrey Yuhasz, Deborah Zeringue, Jerry Zikmund, Michael W. Allen, Benita Bobbitt, Richard Bobbitt, Sr., Joseph E. Chille, Darin Cohen, Darin Cohen, Daria Connolly, Matthew Connolly, Larry D. Eaton, Sarah Erickson, Henderson Garland, Martha Garland, Bryan Heveron, Eileen Lowery, Miriam Talbert, Diane Thornbor. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15244296. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Finken, Tracy) (linked docket entry) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (apz). Modified to add missing filers on 12/16/2021 (mc).
December 14, 2021 Filing 4749 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Melissa Nott Davis. Attorney Melissa Nott Davis added to party Glaxosmithkline LLC(pty:condft). (Davis, Melissa)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4748 MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Greg Ciotti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Scranton, Keith)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4747 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82127-RLR Retske et al v. GlaxoSmith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4746 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Western District of New York Case Number 1:21-01251 Brege v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #4743 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4745 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Louisiana Case Number 2:21-02206 Stribling v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #4743 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4744 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Central District of California Case Number 2:21-09378 Boyadjian v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #4743 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4743 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-86) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4742 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Seth S. Webb (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4741 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4739 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4740 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4700 MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFF BRIAN WORMLEY & PLAINTIFF ROBERTO JIMENEZ filed by Brian Wormley, Roberto Jimenez. (Keller, Ashley) Modified filers on 12/13/2021 (mc).
December 10, 2021 Filing 4739 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Remand by Elaine Harrell. (Keller, Ashley) Modified filer on 12/13/2021 (mc).
December 10, 2021 Filing 4738 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 4615 Order on Motion to Compel, #4640 MDL Transmittal Letter, 4649 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, 4692 Order on Motion for Leave to File. US Mail returned for: Shawn Williams, LaShonda Wittingham, Willie Wells. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4737 REPLY in Support re #4678 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Teresa Valdes. (Parafinczuk, Justin) Modified title text on 12/10/2021 (mc).
December 9, 2021 Filing 4736 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION RE DISCOVERY RELATED TO DEFENDANT, PATHEON MANUFACTURING SERVICES, LLC by Marlene J Goldenberg (Goldenberg, Marlene)
December 9, 2021 Filing 4735 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 1:21-mc-00698 with documents 1-30. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-mc-82184-RLR Michael Bretholz v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC on 12/9/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Transfer Order dated 12/3/2021. (mc)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4734 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4677 MOTION to Remand filed by Gary Swope, GERALD SUMMERVILLE. (Keller, Ashley) Modified filers on 12/13/2021 (mc).
December 8, 2021 Filing 4733 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Zoom Conference held on 11/10/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-75 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2022. (Stipes, Pauline)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4732 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4700 MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFF BRIAN WORMLEY & PLAINTIFF ROBERTO JIMENEZ Removing Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff Brian Wormley and Robert Jimenez's Combined Motion to Remand filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Replies due by 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Matt A. Lochstampfor)(Bayman, Andrew)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4731 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Missouri. Case Number 4:21-cv-01119 with documents 1-37. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82174-RLR Harrell v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 12/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Transfer Order dated 12/3/2021 (mc)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4730 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4722 MDL Amended Complaint. ERROR: Short-Form Complaint Filed in the MDL Case. Filer must file the Short-Form Complaint only in the Member Cases. (See DE #1496 Amended Pretrial Order # 31) (mc)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4729 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01542 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82171-RLR Rafael Jimenez de Leon et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 12/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 84 (mc)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4728 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Nina Trovato by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Yearick, Garth)
December 6, 2021 The Court will hold a Case Management Conference on March 31, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. EST. The proceeding will be held in person at the Paul G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 701 Clematis Street, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. All persons presenting shall appear in person. The proceeding will be simultaneously broadcast by Zoom teleconference. Any plaintiffs' counsel seeking to observe the proceeding through Zoom shall contact plaintiffs' liaison Frank Maderal. Any defense counsel seeking to observe the proceeding through Zoom shall contact defense liaison Joanne O'Connor. Counsel who have not yet made an appearance and do not want to identify their clients or potential clients, and any individuals not affiliated with a party to the litigation, may instead contact Special Master Jaime Dodge, Director of the Emory Institute for Complex Litigation, to be added to the watch list. In advance of the proceeding, liaison counsel and the Special Master will distribute the log-in credentials and instructions to those individuals who have given notice of their intent to observe the proceeding through Zoom. Only those who have given notice will be admitted through Zoom absent special circumstances. (sk01)
December 6, 2021 The Court will hold a Case Management Conference on January 26, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. EST. The proceeding will be held in person at the Paul G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 701 Clematis Street, West Palm Beach, FL 33401. All persons presenting shall appear in person. The proceeding will be simultaneously broadcast by Zoom teleconference. Any plaintiffs' counsel seeking to observe the proceeding through Zoom shall contact plaintiffs' liaison Frank Maderal. Any defense counsel seeking to observe the proceeding through Zoom shall contact defense liaison Joanne O'Connor. Counsel who have not yet made an appearance and do not want to identify their clients or potential clients, and any individuals not affiliated with a party to the litigation, may instead contact Special Master Jaime Dodge, Director of the Emory Institute for Complex Litigation, to be added to the watch list. In advance of the proceeding, liaison counsel and the Special Master will distribute the log-in credentials and instructions to those individuals who have given notice of their intent to observe the proceeding through Zoom. Only those who have given notice will be admitted through Zoom absent special circumstances. (sk01)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4727 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of New York Case Number 1:21-mc-00698 Michael Bretholz v. Glaxosmithkline LLC with enclosed copy of the #4725 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4726 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Missouri Case Number 4:21-01119 Harrell v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #4725 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4725 TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Dated 12/3/2021) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair). (mc)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4724 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Keith R. Scranton (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4723 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of California. Case Number 3:21-cv-01971 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82162-RLR Yuinawa v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al on 12/2/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 85 (mc)
December 3, 2021 Filing 4722 MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amended Short Form Complaint) against GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, GlaxoSmithkline, PLC, McKesson Wholesalers, Pharmaceutical Associates, Inc., filed by David Turner.(O'Brien, Dennis)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4721 RESPONSE to Motion re #4678 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Replies due by 12/9/2021. (Agneshwar, Anand)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4720 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4189 Order, 4501 Clerk's Notice (Other), #4578 Order. US Mail returned for: Katine Hatcher, Quinn Ngiendo. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4719 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4595 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), 4613 Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel, 4615 Order on Motion to Compel. US Mail returned for: Curtis Sellers, Ledford Harris, Lisa Hubbard, Timothy Rhodus. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4718 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82149-RLR Ianuario v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4717 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of California Case Number 3:21-01971 Yuinawa v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #4716 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4716 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-85) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4715 ORDER REINSTATING STAY OF #4698 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-83) MDL 2924 re: E.D. Texas, C.A. No. 5:21-00095 Patterson v. TEVA USA, et al. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the stay of the Panel's conditional transfer order designated as "CTO-83" filed on November 15, 2021, is REINSTATED. Plaintiffs' notice of opposition is deemed filed as of the date of this order. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
December 1, 2021 Filing 4714 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4677 MOTION to Remand filed by Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Apotex Corp., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Dr. Reddy's Laboratories LLC, Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Glenmark Pharmaceuticals, Inc. USA, Granules USA, Inc., L. Perrigo Co., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Perrigo Research and Development Company, Pfizer, Inc., Ranbaxy Inc, Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Strides Pharma, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Wockhardt USA LLC. Replies due by 12/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cheffo, Mark)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4713 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4706 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Sojin Yoon representing Wockhardt Ltd. (Consol Defendant) and Wockhardt USA LLC (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4712 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Number 2:21-cv-02109 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82146-RLR Thompson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 11/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 84 (mc)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4711 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Puerto Rico Case Number 3:21-01542 Rafael Jimenez de Leon et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #4709 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4710 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Louisiana Case Number 2:21-02109 Thompson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #4709 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4709 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-84) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4708 ORDER Allowing Electronic Equipment in Courtroom for Science Day. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4707 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Texas. Case Number 5:21-cv-00095 with documents 1-29. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82140-RLR Patterson v. TEVA USA et al on 11/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 83 (mc)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4706 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sojin Yoon for / by Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC, Wockhardt USA, Inc.. Responses due by 12/13/2021 (Yoon, Sojin)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4705 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4704 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82124-RLR Kounelis v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4703 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82103-RLR Cowden et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Incorporated et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4702 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82115-RLR Kern et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4701 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82104-RLR Rodriguez et al v. GlaxoSmithKline et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4700 MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFF BRIAN WORMLEY & PLAINTIFF ROBERTO JIMENEZ by Ashley C Keller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Bayer Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Garretson v. Dr. Reddys Labys Inc. et al_)(Keller, Ashley)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4699 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Texas Case Number 5:21-00095 Patterson v. TEVA USA et al with enclosed copy of the #4698 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4698 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-83) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4697 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Brandon Brown (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4696 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82100-RLR Ryan et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4695 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-24082-RLR Cohen v. Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corp. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4694 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4487 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #4506 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, #4507 Order on Motion to Seal, #4595 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). US Mail returned for: Brenda Motes, Carla Richard. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4693 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 4630 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es), 4572 Order on Motion to Substitute Party,. US Mail returned for: Emel Hall, Katine Hatcher. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4692 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4685 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4691 REPLY to #4573 MOTION for clarification #547 Order (DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CLARIFY PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15) by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Agneshwar, Anand)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4690 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Hawaii. Case Number 1:21-cv-00428 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82109-RLR Hartman v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 82 (mc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4689 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82091-RLR Veillion et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4688 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82087-RLR Reynolds et al v. GlaxoSmith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4687 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case Number 5:21-cv-04481 with documents 1-28. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82086-RLR Roberto Jimenez v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Order Lifting Stay CTO-79 (mc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4686 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case Number 2:21-cv-04475 with documents 1-25. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82085-RLR Wormley v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4685 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Remand by Ashley C Keller. (Keller, Ashley)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4684 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case Number 2:21-cv-04760 with documents 1-12. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82082-RLR Summerville v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 80 (mc)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4683 PRETRIAL ORDER # 69: Bellwether Selection. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4682 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82069-RLR Anthony v. Boehringer Ingelheim et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4681 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4680 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Case Number 2:21-cv-04688 with documents 1-17. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82081-RLR Swope v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutcals, Inc. et al. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 80 (mc)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4679 ORDER directing Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC to produce regulatory reserve samples. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/18/2021 (BER) Modified Text on 11/19/2021 (ls).
November 18, 2021 Filing 4678 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand by Teresa Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Parafinczuk, Justin)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4677 MOTION to Remand by GERALD SUMMERVILLE, Gary Swope. Attorney Ashley Conrad Keller added to party GERALD SUMMERVILLE(pty:pla), Attorney Ashley Conrad Keller added to party Gary Swope(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order)(Keller, Ashley)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4676 NOTICE by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation re #2533 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Amended Disclosure of Cancer Types (Gilbert, Robert)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4675 PAPERLESS ORDER re: Stipulation. This matter comes before the Court upon the parties Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs Request To Serve Additional Interrogatories. #4674 The Court approves the Stipulation, and grants leave to Plaintiffs to serve the Additional Interrogatories attached as Exhibit A to the Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (BER)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4674 STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES by Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Additional Interrogatories to be served)(Stanley, Bret)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4673 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01509 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82084-RLR Roman Padin et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 80 (mc)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4672 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01508 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82083-RLR Burgos Rivera v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 80 (mc)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4671 ORDER granting #4637 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing LaShonda Wittingham (Consol Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4670 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Hawaii Case Number 1:21-00428 Hartman v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #4669 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4669 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-82) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4668 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 4613 Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel, 4616 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, 4630 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es), 4632 Order on Motion for Leave to File. US Mail returned for: Kendall Woolridge. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4667 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Mike Saltaformaggio (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4666 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Donald D. Goldberg (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4665 FINAL JUDGMENT entered on behalf of all Retailer/Pharmacy and Distributor Defendants (as identified in Appendix A) against any Plaintiff who has entered a claim against any Retailer/Pharmacy or Distributor Defendant, as to Counts Ithrough VI and Counts VIII through XII of the Master Personal Injury Complaint, Dkt. No. #887 , all previously dismissed by the Court, see Dkt. No. #2513 , and as further identified in the MPIC. The Court does not enter judgment as to Count VII, General Negligence. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (mc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4664 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of the Generic Defendants. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B) (mc)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4663 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4658 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. The motion to remand must comply with the conferral requirement in Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4662 ORDER denying #4600 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4661 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Issacharoff on behalf of Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation (Issacharoff, Samuel)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4660 PRETRIAL ORDER # 65 - Second Amended Second Pretrial Order Establishing Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg See attached document for full details. (bkd)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4659 NOTICE of Striking #4652 Notice (Other) filed by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation (Gilbert, Robert)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4658 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff Gerald Summerville & Plaintiff Gary Swope's Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Remand by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation. (Keller, Ashley)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4657 ORDER granting #4610 Motion to Amend Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg See attached document for full details. (bkd)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4656 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania Case Number 2:21-04475 Wormley v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., 5:21-04481 Roberto Jimenez v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al. with enclosed copy of the #4655 order lifting stay of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4655 ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-79 Dated 11/10/2021) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 4654 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4652 Notice (Other). Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. Filer must refile the document using the event Notice of Attorney Appearance. (mc)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4653 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4573 MOTION for clarification #547 Order (DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CLARIFY PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15) filed by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PTO 15)(Gilbert, Robert)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4652 (STRICKEN per DE #4659 ) NOTICE by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation Notice of Appearance of Samuel Issacharoff (Gilbert, Robert) Modified text on 11/16/2021 (mc).
November 12, 2021 Filing 4651 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Samuel Issacharoff by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Gilbert, Robert)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4650 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #4610 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #4519 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #3619 Order Plaintiffs Motion to Amend PTO 65 Deadlines to Account for Defendants Failure to Timely Produce Product Samples as Ordered Plaintif Reply in Support of Amended Motion to Amend PTO 65 Deadlines to Account for Defendants Failure to Timely Produce Product Samples as Ordered (DE 4610) filed by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Daniel Nigh), #2 Exhibit 2 (Order))(Gilbert, Robert)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4649 PAPERLESS Order Cancelling the Discovery Status Conference previously scheduled for 11/15/21 based on counsel's representation that the dispute has been resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/10/2021. (hk02)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4648 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. for Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC (Carton, Christopher)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4647 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Discovery Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Compel (DE 4600) held on 11/10/2021. Total time in court: 1 hour: 15 minutes. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hk02)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4646 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Zoom Conference held on 10/06/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-31 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2022. (Stipes, Pauline)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4645 TRANSCRIPT of Motions to Dismiss held on 10/04/2021 before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, 1-111 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/1/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/13/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2022. (Stipes, Pauline)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4644 Pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 11-2 and 11th Cir. R. 11-3, the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #2667 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 21-10306-JJ and #2665 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 21-10305-JJ. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (apz) Modified text on 11/10/2021 (apz).
November 9, 2021 Filing 4643 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4601 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, 4482 Status Conference. US Mail returned for: Kendall Woolridge, Quinn Ngiendo. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4642 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82047-RLR Murphy v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4641 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Puerto Rico Case Number 3:21-01508 Burgos Rivera v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al, 3:21-01509 Roman Padin et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #4639 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4640 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Pennsylvania Case Number 2:21-04688 Swope v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceutcals, Inc. et al, 2:21-04760 Summerville v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #4639 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4639 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-80) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4638 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler Joseph Rauh on behalf of Ricardo Benedicto. Attorney Tyler Joseph Rauh added to party Ricardo Benedicto(pty:conpla). (Rauh, Tyler)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4637 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert C. Hilliard for / by LaShonda Wittingham. Responses due by 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hilliard, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4636 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert C. Hilliard for / by LaShonda Wittingham. Responses due by 11/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hilliard, Robert)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4635 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4634 Motion for Extension of Time. Patheon's time to answer the Second Amended Master Personal Injury Complaint is extended to September 3, 2021, and it is accepted nunc pro tunc; Patheon's time to answer the Amended Consolidated Economic Class Action and Amended Consolidated Medical Monitoring Class Action Complaints is extended to November 1, 2021, and they are accepted nunc pro tunc; and Patheon's time to file its Corporate Disclosure Statement is extended to November 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
November 8, 2021 Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing Wittingham, LaShonda (Consol Plaintiff) Activated. (Hilliard, Robert)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4634 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Nunc Pro Tunc by Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carton, Christopher)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4633 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4600 Defendant's MOTION to Compel CLASS PLAINTIFFS' PRODUCTIONS filed by Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joint Declaration of Layne Hilton and Daniel Tropin, #2 Exhibit Summary of Plaintiffs' Counsel Hours Worked on Consumer Class Rep Discovery, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Sarah Westcot, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Francisco Maderal, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth Fegan, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Conlee Whiteley, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Gilbert, #8 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Krause, #9 Affidavit Declaration of Je Yon Jung, #10 Affidavit Declaration of Ricardo Martinez-Cid, #11 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Dearman, #12 Affidavit Declaration of Nicola Larmond-Harvey, #13 Affidavit Declaration of Douglas Forrest of International Litigation Servicves, #14 Exhibit Oct. 28, 2021 Letter from Elizabeth Fegan to Patrick Oot)(Gilbert, Robert)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4632 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4629 Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Response, however, the Court notes that no response will be due until such time as the Court reinstates the motions to tax costs. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4631 PAPERLESS ORDER terminating all pending motions to tax costs [4538, 4541, 4542, 4546, 4548, 4549]. Although costs may properly be taxed at this time, cf. Rothenberg v. Sec. Mgmt. Co., 677 F.2d 64, 64 (11th Cir. 1982) ("[C]osts may be taxed after a notice of appeal has been filed."), the Court uses its discretion to stay this matter pending the outcome of the appeal, cf. Belize Telecom, Ltd. v. Gov't of Belize, 528 F.3d 1298, 1310 (11th Cir. 2008) ("[W]e leave for the district court to determine whether a stay or a hearing on costs and fees is appropriate, given the pending appeal...."). As a result of the termination of the motions, the Plaintiffs are not required to file responses to the motions. Once the pending appeals have concluded, any party may move for the Court to reinstate the motions to tax costs and, at that time, the Court will set a briefing schedule wherein the Plaintiffs will be allotted fourteen days to respond running from the date the Court reinstates the motions. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4630 Clerks Notice to Filer re: #4621 , #4622 , #4623 , #4624 , #4625 , #4626 , #4627 , #4628 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es). Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Summons(es) must be filed in the Member Cases. (mc)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4629 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Response to Generic Manufacturers Bills of Costs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilbert, Robert)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4628 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Martin Weiner (Gibbs, William)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4627 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Curtis Pearson (Gibbs, William)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4626 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Gary O'Connor (Gibbs, William)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4625 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Bart Mosele (Gibbs, William)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4624 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Amanda Casalina (Gibbs, William)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4623 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Robert Finkel (Gibbs, William)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4622 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Percy Mitchell (Gibbs, William)
November 5, 2021 Filing 4621 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by John Baertschi (Gibbs, William)
November 5, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4620 restricted/sealed until further notice. (bkd)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4619 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82030-RLR Tafoya v. GlaxoSmithKline et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4618 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82028-RLR Troupe et al v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4617 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82010-RLR Stewart v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4616 PAPERLESS Order setting a Discovery Status Conference for 11/15/2021 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.The status conference will be held in an open proceeding by Zoom teleconference. No counsel are permitted to appear in person. Any Plaintiffs' attorney seeking credentials to attend shall email their request to ZantacLiaison@colson.com. Any defense counsel seeking to attend shall contact Defense Liaison Joanne O'Connor. Counsel who have not yet made an appearance and do not want to identify their clients or potential clients to the Liaisons, and any individuals not affiliated with a party to the litigation, may instead contact Special Master Jaime Dodge, Director of the Emory Institute for Complex Litigation, to be added to the attendee list. The number of attendees may be limited by technology capacity. In advance of the hearing, the Liaisons and the Special Master will provide the log-in credentials and instructions to all attendees. Only those who register in advance will be permitted to attend, absent special exception of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/4/2021. (hk02)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4615 PAPERLESS ORDER taking under advisement #4600 Defendants' Motion to Compel and setting a Discovery Hearing for 11/10/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. The status conference will be held in an open proceeding by Zoom teleconference. No counsel are permitted to appear in person. Any Plaintiffs' attorney seeking credentials to attend shall email their request to ZantacLiaison@colson.com. Any defense counsel seeking to attend shall contact Defense Liaison Joanne O'Connor. Counsel who have not yet made an appearance and do not want to identify their clients or potential clients to the Liaisons, and any individuals not affiliated with a party to the litigation, may instead contact Special Master Jaime Dodge, Director of the Emory Institute for Complex Litigation, to be added to the attendee list. The number of attendees may be limited by technology capacity. In advance of the hearing, the Liaisons and the Special Master will provide the log-in credentials and instructions to all attendees. Only those who register in advance will be permitted to attend, absent special exception of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 11/4/2021. (hk02)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4614 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Lauren S. Miller (Miller, Lauren)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4613 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4484 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. The firm of Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group is designated as counsel for Plaintiff from this day forward. Joseph T. Waechter, Esquire of Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group is designated as the Trial/Lead counsel for Plaintiff in this matter. The firm of Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP is hereby relieved of further responsibility for representation of Plaintiff herein. The Clerk is directed to update the name of the Plaintiff's counsel on the docket for casenumber 9:20-cv-81839 pertaining to Loreajoy Williams. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4612 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4519 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #3619 Order Plaintiffs Motion to Amend PTO 65 Deadlines to Account for Defendants Failure to Timely Produce Product Samples as Ordered filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Replies due by 11/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U)(Cheffo, Mark)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4611 NOTICE by Marina Golden of Removal from Service List (Mouzari, Azar)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4610 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #4519 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #3619 Order Plaintiffs Motion to Amend PTO 65 Deadlines to Account for Defendants Failure to Timely Produce Product Samples as Ordered Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Amend PTO 65 Deadlines to Account for Defendants Failure to Timely Produce Product Samples as Ordered by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation. Responses due by 11/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Je Yon Jung, #2 Exhibit 1 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #3 Exhibit 2 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #4 Exhibit 3 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #5 Exhibit 4 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #6 Exhibit 5 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #7 Exhibit 6 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #8 Exhibit 7 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #9 Exhibit 8 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #10 Exhibit 9 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #11 Exhibit 10 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #12 Exhibit 11 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #13 Exhibit 12 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #14 Exhibit 13 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #15 Exhibit 14 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #16 Exhibit 15 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #17 Exhibit 16 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #18 Exhibit 17 to Decl of Je Yon Jung, #19 Exhibit 18 to Decl of Je Yon Jung)(Gilbert, Robert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4609 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Valisure, LLC re #4596 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William J. Egan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Fil filed by Valisure, LLC (Mercadante, Gabrielle)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4608 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for William J. Egan by Valisure, LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Mercadante, Gabrielle) Modified filer on 11/4/2021 (mc).
November 3, 2021 Filing 4607 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 4520 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, #4533 MDL Transmittal Letter, 4540 Miscellaneous Hearing,. US Mail returned for: Julie Deaton, Tiffany Elliot. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4606 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-82008-RLR Towner et al v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4605 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81992-RLR Silver et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4604 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81988-RLR Rudnik v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4603 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81983-RLR Rinderknecht et al v. Glaxo Smith Kline, LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4602 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81982-RLR Palmer v. Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4601 ORDER granting #4508 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing Kendall Woolridge (Consol Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4600 Defendant's MOTION to Compel CLASS PLAINTIFFS' PRODUCTIONS by GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. Responses due by 11/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Oot, Patrick)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4599 ORDER Issuing Letter Rogatory sent to Province of Quebec, Canada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4598 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4597 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4597 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File A Motion To Remand by Teresa Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Teresa Valdes, #2 Exhibit Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Reman, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Remand)(Parafinczuk, Justin)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4596 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William J. Egan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #4537 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Valisure, LLC. Responses due by 11/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certification Certificate of Understanding)(Mercadante, Gabrielle)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4595 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3933 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) and granting in part and denying in part #3934 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg See attached document for full details. (bkd)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4594 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81981-RLR Fisher v. Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4593 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81980-RLR Hannah v. Boehringer Ingelheim et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4592 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81976-RLR Gaulden v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4591 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81971-RLR Ortiz v. Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4590 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81970-RLR Stancil v. Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4589 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81968-RLR Benedict v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4588 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81952-RLR Biagini v. Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4587 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81947-RLR Still v. Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4586 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81939-RLR Bates v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4585 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81938-RLR Anderson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4584 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4581 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4583 Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC Defendant's Second Amended Consolidated Economic Loss Class Action Complaint ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC. (Carton, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4582 Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Consolidated Medical Monitoring Class Action Complaint ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC. (Carton, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4581 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File A Motion To Remand by Teresa Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Teresa Valdes)(Parafinczuk, Justin)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4580 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81928-RLR Estep et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4579 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81922-RLR Schouest v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4578 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4577 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81914-RLR Ambrester et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corp. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4576 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81911-RLR Hirschi et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4575 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-23804-RLR Michetti v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4574 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 4518 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, #4533 MDL Transmittal Letter,. US Mail returned for: Paula Brown, Tiffany Elliott. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4573 MOTION for clarification #547 Order (DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CLARIFY PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15) by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Agneshwar, Anand)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4572 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #4568 Motion to Substitute Party. Counsel shall file the Motion under the Plaintiff's individual case number, rather than on the master MDL docket. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/28/2021. (sk01)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4571 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Erica McCabe by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (Sharpe, Paige)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4570 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jon C. Conlin (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4569 MOTION for clarification #547 Order (DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CLARIFY PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 15) by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Agneshwar, Anand)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4568 MOTION to Substitute Party by Robert R. Pagniello. Responses due by 11/12/2021 (Bottner, Stav)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4567 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation re #3928 Notice of Appeal, #3983 Notice of Appeal,, #3949 Notice of Appeal, #3993 Notice of Appeal, #3921 Notice of Appeal,, #3990 Notice of Appeal, #3995 Notice of Appeal, #3992 Notice of Appeal, #3938 Notice of Appeal,, #3926 Notice of Appeal,, #3967 Notice of Appeal, #3964 Notice of Appeal, #3974 Notice of Appeal,, #3988 Notice of Appeal, #3971 Notice of Appeal, #3952 Notice of Appeal,, #3975 Notice of Appeal,, #3973 Notice of Appeal,, #3987 Notice of Appeal,, #3985 Notice of Appeal,, #3982 Notice of Appeal,, #3961 Notice of Appeal, #3927 Notice of Appeal,, #3978 Notice of Appeal,, #3923 Notice of Appeal,, #3972 Notice of Appeal,, #3977 Notice of Appeal, #3940 Notice of Appeal, #3948 Notice of Appeal,, #3917 Notice of Appeal,, #3932 Notice of Appeal, 3954 Notice of Appeal,, #3963 Notice of Appeal, #3998 Notice of Appeal, #3986 Notice of Appeal,,, #3984 Notice of Appeal,, #3922 Notice of Appeal,, #3997 Notice of Appeal, #3896 Notice of Appeal,, #3915 Notice of Appeal, #3960 Notice of Appeal, #3969 Notice of Appeal, #3897 Notice of Appeal,, 4009 Notice of Appeal, #3936 Notice of Appeal,, #3929 Notice of Appeal,,,, #3965 Notice of Appeal, #3991 Notice of Appeal, #3939 Notice of Appeal,, #3981 Notice of Appeal,,, #3994 Notice of Appeal,. No Transcript Requested. (Keller, Ashley)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4566 ORDER granting in part #4481 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Sanofi shall provide the Court, in Microsoft Word format, with revised Letters Rogatory that conform to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4565 Order Scheduling Science Day. Science Day is set for December 2, 2021, at 9:00 a.m. EST in West Palm Beach before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4564 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Arnold N. Kriss (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
October 27, 2021 Filing 4563 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Arkansas. Case Number 4:21-cv-00923 with documents 1-2. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81969-RLR Talbert v. Boehringer Ingeleim Pharmaceuticals Inc et al on 10/25/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 79. (mc)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4562 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #4537 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Movant shall follow the procedures specified for admission in Pretrial Order # 1 at docket entry #13 . Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/27/2021. (sk01)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4561 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand TO PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED ECONOMIC LOSS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Glaxosmithkline PLC. (Cheffo, Mark)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4560 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand [ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, AND CHATTEM, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED CONSOLIDATED MEDICAL MONITORING CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT] by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Agneshwar, Anand)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4559 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED MEDICAL MONITORING CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Glaxosmithkline PLC. (Cheffo, Mark)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4558 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand [ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, AND CHATTEM, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED ECONOMIC LOSS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT] by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Agneshwar, Anand)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4557 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand In Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Medical Monitoring Class Action Complaint by Pfizer, Inc.. (Shapiro, Jay)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4556 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand In Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Economic Loss Class Action Complaint by Pfizer, Inc.. (Shapiro, Jay)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4555 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4481 Defendant's MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Bretholz) filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi-Aventis US Services. Attorney Joanne M. O'Connor added to party Sanofi-Aventis US Services(pty:condft). (O'Connor, Joanne)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4554 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Boehringer Ingelheim Defendants' Answer to Second Amended Consolidated Economic Loss Class Action Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Bayman, Andrew)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4553 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand Boehringer Ingelheim Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Consolidated Medical Monitoring Class Action Complaint by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GMBH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Promeco, S.A. de C.V., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Bayman, Andrew)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4552 NOTICE by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation re #3934 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) By Distributor, Retailer, and Pharmacy Defendants, #3933 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in Mixed-Defendant cases Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order) (Gilbert, Robert)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4551 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Peter A. Sandberg (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4550 SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Laura Monger by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation (Gilbert, Robert)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4548 Joint MOTION for Bill of Costs for Certain Generic Manufacturer Defendants by Apotex Corp.. Responses due by 11/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Certain Generic Manufacturer Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summary of Costs, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Chart of Common Defense Fund Transcripts, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Ajanta Supporting Documentation, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - ANI Supporting Documentation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Apotex Supporting Documentation, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Granules Supporting Documentation, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Heritage Supporting Documentation, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Hikma Supporting Documentation, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Lannett Supporting Documentation, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J - Nostrum Supporting Documentation, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K - Novitium Supporting Documentation, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L - Par Supporting Documentation, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M - Sandoz Supporting Documentation, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N - Strides Supporting Documentation, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O - Teva Supporting Documentation, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P - Torrent Supporting Documentation, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q - Wockhardt Supporting Documentation)(Henry, Terry)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4546 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Pharmaceutical Associates, Inc.. Attorney Jennifer Snyder Heis added to party Pharmaceutical Associates, Inc.(pty:condft). Responses due by 11/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of PAI Holdings' Bill of Costs, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Snyder Heis, #3 Exhibit 1, Second Common Defense Fund Invoice, #4 Exhibit 2, Third Common Defense Fund Invoice, #5 Exhibit 3, Fourth Common Defense Fund Invoice, #6 Exhibit 4, Underlying Transcript Invoices, #7 Exhibit 5, ESI Invoice (redacted))(Heis, Jennifer)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4545 STIPULATION Concerning Certain Potential Deponents of GlaxoSmithKline LLC and GlaxoSmithKline PLC by Plaintiffs (McGlamry, Michael)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4542 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Auro Health LLC, Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.. Responses due by 11/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Aurobindo's Bill of Costs, #2 Affidavit Exhibit A - Declaration of Joshua A. Klarfeld, #3 Exhibit 1 - 4/19 Flight Receipt, #4 Exhibit 2 - 4/25-28 Rental Car Receipt, #5 Exhibit 3 - 4/25-27 Hotel Receipt, #6 Exhibit 4 - 4/25 Rideshare Receipt, #7 Exhibit 5 - 4/26 Rideshare Receipt, #8 Exhibit 6 - 4/27-28 Hotel Receipt, #9 Exhibit 7 - 4/27 Composite Receipts, #10 Exhibit 8 - 4/30 Parking Receipt, #11 Exhibit 9 - 4/28 Toll Charges Receipt, #12 Exhibit 10 - 6/7 Meal Receipt, #13 Exhibit 11 - 6/7 Flight Receipt, #14 Exhibit 12 - 6/7-6/9 Rental Car Receipt, #15 Exhibit 13 - 6/7-6/8 Westin Receipt, #16 Exhibit 14 - 6/7 Rideshare Receipt, #17 Exhibit 15 - 6/7 Meal Receipt, #18 Exhibit 16 - 6/7 Rideshare Receipt, #19 Exhibit 17 - 6/8 Dinner Receipt, #20 Exhibit 18 - 6/8-6/9 Rental Car Receipt, #21 Exhibit 19 - 6/9 Meal Receipt, #22 Exhibit 20 - 6/9 Meal Receipt, #23 Exhibit 21 - 6/9 Flight Receipt, #24 Exhibit 22 - 6/9 Parking Receipt, #25 Exhibit 23 - 6/9 Tolling Charges Receipts, #26 Exhibit 24 - 6/17 Parking Receipt, #27 Exhibit 25 - 6/17 Flight Receipt, #28 Exhibit 26 - 6/17 Rental Car Receipt, #29 Exhibit 27 - 6/17 Dinner Receipt, #30 Exhibit 28 - 6/18 Hotel Receipt, #31 Exhibit 29 - 6/18 Meal Receipt, #32 Exhibit 30 - 6/17 Toll Charges Receipt, #33 Exhibit 31 - Second Common Defense Fund Invoice, #34 Exhibit 32 - Third Common Defense Fund Invoice, #35 Exhibit 33 - Fourth Common Defense Fund Invoice, #36 Exhibit 34 - Invoice for John Adams Rough Transcript, #37 Exhibit 35 - Invoice for Steve Lucas Rough Transcript (Pharmacovigilance Topics), #38 Exhibit 36 - Invoice for Steve Lucas Deposition (Storage and Transport Topics), #39 Exhibit 37 - Composite Underlying Transcript Invoices, #40 Exhibit 38 - KLDiscovery Invoice (redacted), #41 Exhibit 39 - ESI Invoice (redacted), #42 Exhibit 40 - ESI Invoice (redacted), #43 Exhibit B - List of cases naming Aurobindo entities)(Klarfeld, Joshua)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4541 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Responses due by 11/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Paul J. Cosgrove, #3 Exhibit 1 - PJ Travel Invoice, #4 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 3 - US Legal Curticapean INV130189478, #6 Exhibit 4 - Jones Foster $200 8-14-20 AP1293291, #7 Exhibit 5 - Jones Foster $500 Generics Common Defense Costs, #8 Exhibit 6 - Jones Foster -$7,285.71 Q2 2021 Generics Common Defense Costs, #9 Exhibit 7 - Jones Foster $2842.59, #10 Exhibit 8 - U.S. Legal invoices, #11 Exhibit B - SFCs in Zantac MDL 2924)(Cosgrove, Paul)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4540 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 10/25/2021. Total time in court: 2 hour(s). Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mg)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4538 MOTION for Bill of Costs by Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 11/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Bill of Costs, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey R. Schaefer in Support of Dr. Reddy's Laboratories, Inc.'s Bill of Costs, #3 Exhibit Itemization of "Other Costs", #4 Exhibit Itemization of Transcript Costs, #5 Exhibit Itemization of Copy Costs (redacted))(Schaefer, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4537 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for William J. Egan. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15120532 by Valisure, LLC. Attorney Gabrielle R Mercadante added to party Valisure, LLC(pty:obj). Responses due by 11/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mercadante, Gabrielle)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4536 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81896-RLR Dumestre v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4535 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81892-RLR Andrews v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4534 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81891-RLR Andrews v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4533 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Arkansas Case Number 4:21-00923 Talbert v. Boehringer Ingeleim Pharmaceuticals Inc et al with enclosed copy of the #4532 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
October 25, 2021 Filing 4532 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-79) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
October 25, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4539 restricted/sealed until further notice. (1954545)
October 25, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4549 restricted/sealed until further notice. (1473388)
October 25, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4544 restricted/sealed until further notice. (915789)
October 25, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4547 restricted/sealed until further notice. (1860112)
October 25, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4543 restricted/sealed until further notice. (1455658)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4531 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81960-RLR Bellamy v. Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4530 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81958-RLR McNeely v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4529 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81955-RLR Sapiane v. Pfizer et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4528 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81886-RLR Poindexter v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4527 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81882-RLR Schneider v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4526 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 1:21-cv-23653-RLR Hopkins et al v. Boehringer Ingelheim (BI) et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 21, 2021 Set Deadlines: Defendants' Motion to Compel due by 12:00 p.m. on 11/2/2021. Plaintiffs' Response due by 5:00 p.m. on 11/5/2021, per DE 4523 Order. (mc)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4525 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Habib Nasrullah (Nasrullah, Habib)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4524 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4485 Order. US Mail returned for: Brenda Motes. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4523 PAPERLESS ORDER. In accordance with deadlines set forth during the Zoom conference today, Plaintiffs shall advise Defendants by 5:00 p.m. EST on 10/28/21 whether any responsive documents have been withheld and identify the location where responsive documents might be found, but that have not been searched. Defendants' motion to compel shall be filed by 12:00 p.m. EST on 11/2/21 and Plaintiffs' response is due by 5:00 p.m. EST on 11/5/21. The Court will schedule a hearing on the motion by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/21/2021. (hk02)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4522 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Status Conference re: setting briefing schedule on social media discovery held on 10/21/2021. Total time in court: 40 minutes. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hk02)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4521 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-23711-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4520 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4499 MDL Amended Complaint. ERROR: Short-Form Complaint Filed in the MDL Case. Filer must file the Short-Form Complaint only in the Member Cases. (See DE #1496 Amended Pretrial Order # 31) (mc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4519 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct #3619 Order Plaintiffs Motion to Amend PTO 65 Deadlines to Account for Defendants Failure to Timely Produce Product Samples as Ordered by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation. Responses due by 11/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion to Amend PTO 65 Deadlines to Account for Defendants Failure to Timely Produce Product Samples as Ordered, #2 Exh. 1 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #3 Exh. 2 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #4 Exh. 3 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #5 Exh. 4 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #6 Exh. 5 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #7 Exh. 6 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #8 Exh. 7 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #9 Exh. 8 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #10 Exh. 9 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #11 Exh. 10 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #12 Exh. 11 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #13 Exh. 12 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #14 Exh. 13 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #15 Exh. 14 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #16 Exh. 15 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #17 Exh. 16 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #18 Exh. 17 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion, #19 Exh. 18 to Declaration of Je Yon Jung ISO Plaintiffs Motion)(Gilbert, Robert)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4518 PAPERLESS Order setting Status Conference Re: social media discovery for 10/21/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.The status conference will be held in an open proceeding by Zoom teleconference. No counsel are permitted to appear in person. Any Plaintiffs' attorney seeking credentials to attend shall email their request to ZantacLiaison@colson.com. Any defense counsel seeking to attend shall contact Defense Liaison Joanne O'Connor. Counsel who have not yet made an appearance and do not want to identify their clients or potential clients to the Liaisons, and any individuals not affiliated with a party to the litigation, may instead contact Special Master Jaime Dodge, Director of the Emory Institute for Complex Litigation, to be added to the attendee list. The number of attendees may be limited by technology capacity. In advance of the hearing, the Liaisons and the Special Master will provide the log-in credentials and instructions to all attendees. Only those who register in advance will be permitted to attend, absent special exception of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/20/2021. (hk02)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4517 RESPONSE to Motion re #4481 Defendant's MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Bretholz) Plaintiffs Response to Defendant Sanofis Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request (Letters Rogatory) filed by Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation. Replies due by 10/26/2021. (Gilbert, Robert)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4516 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4481 Defendant's MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Bretholz) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Valisure LLC. Attorney Eugene P. Murphy added to party Valisure LLC(pty:obj). Replies due by 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration/Exhibit, #2 Affidavit Declaration/Exhibit)(Murphy, Eugene)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4515 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4245 MDL Transmittal Letter, 4283 MDL Case Receipt, 4286 MDL Case Receipt. US Mail returned for: Roxane Deroche. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4514 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 4119 MDL Case Receip, 4225 MDL Case Receipt, #4434 MDL Transmittal Letter. US Mail returned for: Carla Richard, Keith Lampkin, Sherry Warren. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4513 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Zoom Conference held on 10/06/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-31 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2022. (Stipes, Pauline)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4512 TRANSCRIPT of Motions to Dismiss held on 10/04/2021 before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, 1-111 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2022. (Stipes, Pauline)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4511 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Zoom Conference held on 09/23/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-63 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2022. (Stipes, Pauline)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4510 NOTICE of Demand for Settlement by JAMES MARTIN (mc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4509 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for George G. Argionis (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4508 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert C. Hilliard for / by Kendall Woolridge. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hilliard, Robert)
October 19, 2021 Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing Woolridge, Kendall (Consol Plaintiff) Activated. (Hilliard, Robert)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4507 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4175 Generic Manufacturers' Motion to File Under Seal Submissions in Support of Taxing Costs. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4506 Order Setting Conference on Bellwether Selection Plan. Conference set for October 25, 2021, at 02:00 p.m. EST before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4505 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida with documents 1-2. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81921-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4504 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Ruben Honik. Attorney Ruben Honik added to party Jennifer Bond(pty:pla), Attorney Ruben Honik added to party Renee Chatman(pty:pla), Attorney Ruben Honik added to party Eric Ragis(pty:pla), Attorney Ruben Honik added to party Lisa Ragis(pty:pla), Attorney Ruben Honik added to party Ronald Ragis(pty:pla). (Honik, Ruben)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4503 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida with documents 1-3. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81900-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4502 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ron Kalish on behalf of Sabina B Sobolewski (Kalish, Ron)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4501 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4499 MDL Amended Complaint. ERROR: Short-Form Complaint Filed in the MDL Case. Filer must file the Short-Form Complaint only in its Member Case. (See DE #1496 Amended Pretrial Order #31) (pes)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4500 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene P. Murphy on behalf of Valisure, LLC. Attorney Eugene P. Murphy added to party Valisure, LLC(pty:obj). (Murphy, Eugene)
October 11, 2021 Filing 4499 MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sabina B Sobolewski.(Kalish, Ron)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4498 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fatima Abuzerr on behalf of Terry Brennan. Attorney Fatima Abuzerr added to party Terry Brennan(pty:conpla). (Abuzerr, Fatima)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4497 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fatima Abuzerr on behalf of Joshua Bodey. Attorney Fatima Abuzerr added to party Joshua Bodey(pty:conpla). (Abuzerr, Fatima)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4496 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fatima Abuzerr on behalf of Randolfo Arza. Attorney Fatima Abuzerr added to party Randolfo Arza(pty:conpla). (Abuzerr, Fatima)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4495 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fatima Abuzerr on behalf of Steven Betts. Attorney Fatima Abuzerr added to party Steven Betts(pty:conpla). (Abuzerr, Fatima)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4494 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Ron Kalish (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4493 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Joseph Auddino (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4492 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Steven F. Marino (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4491 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81858-RLR Stehr v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4489 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4490 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81881-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR (pes)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4488 ORDER denying #4106 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Medical Monitoring Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (cgs)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4487 ORDER denying #4107 Brand OTC Defendants' Rule 12 Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Economic Loss Class Complaint as Preempted by Federal Law. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4486 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01406 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81877-RLR Perez Febus v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 10/6/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 78. (mc)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4485 ORDER regarding Defendants BI and Sanofi's production of regulatory-retained samples to Plaintiffs' designee in California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 10/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (hk02)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4484 MOTION/STIPULATION of Substitution of Counsel by Joseph Tapp Waechter on behalf of Loreajoy Williams instead of prior counsel of record Robert C. Hilliard and Matthew Palmer Lambert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Waechter, Joseph) Modified to convert document to a motion on 10/20/2021 (mc).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4483 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING for appropriate disposition #4481 Defendant's MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Bretholz) filed by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Motion referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
October 6, 2021 Filing 4482 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Status Conference re: production by Defendants BI and Sanofi of their regulatory-retained products held on 10/6/2021. Total time in court: 30 minutes. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hk02)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4481 Defendant's MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Bretholz) by Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Letters Rogatory (Bretholz))(O'Connor, Joanne)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4480 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81847-RLR Edwards v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4479 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81843-RLR Brown v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4478 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81838-RLR Etsell v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4477 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81837-RLR Bourgeois v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4476 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81836-RLR Deckert v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4475 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81835-RLR Wilcox v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-2. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4474 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81822-RLR Maldonado v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4473 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81812-RLR Belcher v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4472 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81810-RLR Caudill v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4471 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81809-RLR Chrisman v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4470 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81807-RLR Crowder v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4469 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81805-RLR Davis v. Sanofi, S.A. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4468 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81804-RLR Easley v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4467 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81803-RLR Felix v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4466 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81802-RLR Rhodes v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4465 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81801-RLR Diaz v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4464 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4456 Joint Motion to extend to October 5, 2021, the Pretrial Order # 65 deadline to complete a bellwether selection plan. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/4/2021. (sk01)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4463 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81799-RLR Gooding v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4462 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81798-RLR Jackson v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4461 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81797-RLR Kaufman v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4460 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81796-RLR Kelly v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4459 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81795-RLR Plumlee v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4458 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81793-RLR Reed v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4457 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81793-RLR Reed v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4456 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Pretrial Order 65 Deadline by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 10/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bayman, Andrew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4455 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81783-RLR Galvin v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4454 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81780-RLR England v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4453 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81758-RLR Johnson Jr. v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4452 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81754-RLR Turner v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4451 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81752-RLR King v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4450 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81748-RLR Molyn v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4449 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81747-RLR Ortiz v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4448 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81746-RLR Marti v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4447 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81745-RLR Leonard v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4446 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Brandon S. Finz (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4445 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jack A. Kramer (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4444 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Tennessee. Case Number 1:21-cv-00215 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81846-RLR Tart v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 9/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77 (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4443 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Tennessee. Case Number 1:21-cv-00214 with documents 1-5. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81844-RLR Necessary v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 9/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77 (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4442 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Tennessee. Case Number 1:21-cv-00213 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81842-RLR McIntyre v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 9/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77 (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4441 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Tennessee. Case Number 1:21-cv-00212 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81839-RLR Greer v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 9/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77 (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4440 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Tennessee. Case Number 1:21-cv-00211 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81834-RLR Gray v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 9/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77 (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4439 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81744-RLR Salazar v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4438 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81743-RLR Schwartz v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4437 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81735-RLR Morant v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4436 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Kenneth Moll (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4435 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida with documents 1-2. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81841-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (pes)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4434 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Puerto Rico Case Number 3:21-01406 Perez Febus v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #4433 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4433 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-78) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4432 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4133 MDL Transmittal Letter, 4214 MDL Case Receipt, 4225 MDL Case Receipt, 4233 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, #4263 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #4264 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #4265 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, etc. US Mail returned for: Glen Hayes, Joseph Greenwell, Michael Leverette. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4431 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 4129 MDL Case Receipt, 4132 MDL Case Receipt, 4134 MDL Case Receipt, 4292 MDL Case Receipt,. US Mail returned for: Angela Redmond, Debra Moore, Misty Hadley, Tom Hartsinck. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4430 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Tennessee. Case Number 1:21-cv-00210 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81833-RLR Davidson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 9/29/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77 (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4429 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Tennessee. Case Number 1:21-cv-00209 with documents 1-4. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81832-RLR Cook v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 9/29/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77 (mc)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4428 PAPERLESS Order setting a Status Conference on 10/6/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart regarding the production by Defendants BI and Sanofi of their FDA-retained products.The status conference will be held in an open proceeding by Zoom teleconference. No counsel are permitted to appear in person. Any Plaintiffs' attorney seeking credentials to attend shall email their request to ZantacLiaison@colson.com. Any defense counsel seeking to attend shall contact Defense Liaison Joanne O'Connor. Counsel who have not yet made an appearance and do not want to identify their clients or potential clients to the Liaisons, and any individuals not affiliated with a party to the litigation, may instead contact Special Master Jaime Dodge, Director of the Emory Institute for Complex Litigation, to be added to the attendee list. The number of attendees may be limited by technology capacity. In advance of the hearing, the Liaisons and the Special Master will provide the log-in credentials and instructions to all attendees. Only those who register in advance will be permitted to attend, absent special exception of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 9/29/2021. (hk02)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4427 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Nebraska. Case Number 8:21-cv-00349 with documents 1-10. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81831-RLR Hornig et al v. Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC et al on 9/29/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77 (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4426 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81730-RLR Fowler v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4425 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81728-RLR Logan v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-6. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4424 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81722-RLR McCarty v. Zantac (Ranitidine) Products Liability Litigation with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4423 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by LAFAYETTE WOODS, GWENDOLYN WOODS.(Kearney, Julius)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4422 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND AGREEMENT to be Bound by HIPAA Qualified Protective Order by Ivy Kimble re #4189 Protective Order #68 (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4421 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4420 MDL Amended Complaint. ERROR: Short-Form Complaint Filed in the MDL Case. Filer must file the Short-Form Complaint only in the Member Cases. (See DE #1496 Amended Pretrial Order # 31) (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4420 MDL AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by LAFAYETTE WOODS, GWENDOLYN WOODS.(Kearney, Julius)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4419 ORDER granting #4368 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorneys Kimberly Beck and Robert C. Hilliard representing Judy Morse (Consol Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4418 ORDER granting #4374 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing Danna Cammon, (Consol Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4417 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4416 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND AGREEMENT to be Bound by HIPAA Qualified Protective Order by Paula Brown re #4189 Protective Order #68 (mc)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4415 NOTICE of Inquiry by James Dow Vandivere (Docket Sheet mailed from DE 4060) (mc)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4414 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Missouri. Case Number 4:21-cv-01118 with documents 1-25. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81820-RLR Stonebraker v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 9/27/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77 (mc)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4413 ORDER MEMORIALIZING RULINGS Re: Discovery Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 9/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4412 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #4367 Motion for Substitution of Counsel for the movant to provide a proposed order in connection with any renewed motion. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4411 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Seth Thompson (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4410 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Michael Saltaformaggio (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4409 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81821-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (pes)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4408 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Tennessee Case Number 1:21-00209 Cook v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 1:21-00210 Davidson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al, 1:21-00211 Gray v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al, 1:21-00212 Greer v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 1:21-00213 McIntyre v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al, 1:21-00214 Necessary v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al, 1:21-00215 Tart v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #4405 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4407 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the District of Nebraska Case Number 8:21-00349 Hornig et al v. Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #4405 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4406 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Eastern District of Missouri Case Number 4:21-01118 Stonebraker v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with enclosed copy of the #4405 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4405 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-77) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4404 NOTICE of Removal from Receiving Mail by Diana Rios (mc)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4403 Order Regarding October 4, 2021 Hearing on Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (sk01)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4402 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Azar Mouzari on behalf of Marina Golden (Mouzari, Azar)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4401 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida. with documents 1-2. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81811-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (pes)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4400 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #3716 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #3717 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #3718 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #3760 Order on Motion to Compel, 4085 MDL Case Receipt, 4088 MDL Case Receipt, 4093 MDL Case Receipt, 4135 MDL Case Receipt, 4188 MDL Case Receipt, #4189 Order, 4191 MDL Case Receipt, 4194 MDL Case Receipt, 4216 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail, etc. US Mail returned for: Armand Lewis, Carolyn White, Cathy Adkins, Cherie Aucoin, Joan Lacky. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4399 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81727-RLR Roman v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4398 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81725-RLR Westbrook v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4397 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81721-RLR Jackson et al v. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4396 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81721-RLR Jackson et al v. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4395 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81717-RLR Degrazia v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4394 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81714-RLR Williams v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4393 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Status Conference held on 9/23/2021. Total time in court: 1 hour : 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (hk02)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4392 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81713-RLR Villareal v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4391 TRANSCRIPT of Status Video Conference held on 9/15/2021 before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, 1-68 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2021. (Stipes, Pauline)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4390 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Zoom Conference held on 9/13/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-82 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2021. (Stipes, Pauline)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4389 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Zoom Conference held on 8/26/2021 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-47 pages, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2021. (Stipes, Pauline)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4388 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81712-RLR Wilkinson v. Pfizer, Inc et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4387 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81711-RLR Thompson v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4386 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81710-RLR Nations v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4385 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81709-RLR Steve v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4384 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81708-RLR Stinson v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4383 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81707-RLR Sosebee v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4382 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81706-RLR Sweetin v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4381 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81705-RLR Wachal v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4380 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81704-RLR Callihan v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4379 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Iowa. Case Number 4:21-cv-00253 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81770-RLR Frederick et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 76 (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4378 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81703-RLR Sevilla v. Pfizer, Inc et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4377 NOTICE by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CHATTEM, INC., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC of Filing of Motions to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with PTO #'s 15, 23, and 38 (Petrosinelli, Joseph)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4376 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 4113 Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions. US Mail returned for: Janet Nickell. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4375 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #4046 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #4047 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #4048 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, 4081 MDL Case Receipt, #4133 MDL Transmittal Letter, 4135 MDL Case Receipt, 4136 MDL Case Receipt, 4138 MDL Case Receipt, etc. US Mail returned for: Billy Robinson, Dana O'Bryan, Jodi Benson. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mc)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4374 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert C. Hilliard for / by Danna Cammon. Responses due by 10/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hilliard, Robert)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4373 PAPERLESS Order setting a Status Conference re: Defendants' production of product samples and API on 9/23/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart.The hearing will be held in an open proceeding by Zoom teleconference. No counsel are permitted to appear in person. Any Plaintiffs' attorney seeking credentials to attend shall email their request to ZantacLiaison@colson.com. Any defense counsel seeking to attend shall contact Defense Liaison Joanne O'Connor. Counsel who have not yet made an appearance and do not want to identify their clients or potential clients to the Liaisons, and any individuals not affiliated with a party to the litigation, may instead contact Special Master Jaime Dodge, Director of the Emory Institute for Complex Litigation, to be added to the attendee list. The number of attendees may be limited by technology capacity. In advance of the hearing, the Liaisons and the Special Master will provide the log-in credentials and instructions to all attendees. Only those who register in advance will be permitted to attend, absent special exception of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 9/22/2021. (hk02)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4372 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND AGREEMENT to be Bound by HIPAA Qualified Protective Order by Ronald Cook re #4189 Protective Order #68 (mc)
September 22, 2021 Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing Cammon, Danna (Consol Plaintiff) Activated. (Hilliard, Robert)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4371 NOTICE of Filing Pro-Se Injury Form by JAMES MARTIN (Attachments: #1 Initial Census Form) (mc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4370 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Sarah Sterling Aldridge (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (pes)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4369 RESPONSE in Support re #4175 MOTION to Seal Generic Manufacturers' Submissions in Support of Taxing Costs per Local Rule 5.4 filed by Apotex Corp.. (Henry, Terry)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4368 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert C. Hilliard for / by Judy Morse. Attorney Robert C. Hilliard added to party Judy Morse(pty:conpla). Responses due by 10/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hilliard, Robert)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4367 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Joseph T. Waechter for Robert C. Hilliard, Matthew Palmer Lambert by Loreajoy Williams. Attorney Joseph Tapp Waechter added to party Loreajoy Williams(pty:conpla). Responses due by 10/4/2021 (Waechter, Joseph)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4366 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81702-RLR Ramirez v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4365 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81701-RLR Dwight v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4364 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81700-RLR Perez, Jr. v. Pfizer, Inc et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4363 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81699-RLR Hernandez v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4362 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81698-RLR Nasseri v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4361 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81697-RLR Jones v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4360 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81696-RLR Mitzel v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4359 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81695-RLR Desjardins v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4358 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81694-RLR Millette v. Pfizer, Inc et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4357 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81693-RLR Allison v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4356 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81693-RLR Allison v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4355 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81692-RLR Leach v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4354 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81691-RLR Manno v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4353 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81689-RLR Kunau v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4352 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81688-RLR Rino v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4351 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81687-RLR Kirby v. Sanofi US Services, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4350 ORDER granting #4274 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing Cera Richard-Straub (Consol Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4349 ORDER granting #4268 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney Robert C. Hilliard representing Brenda Motes (Consol Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4348 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81686-RLR Garcia v. Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4347 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81685-RLR Hurley v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4346 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81684-RLR Bee v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4345 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81683-RLR Hartman v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4344 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81682-RLR Bogan v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4343 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Azar Mouzari (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4342 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #4323 Motion for Leave to File as amended short form complaints must be filed in individual cases, not the MDL docket. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4341 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81681-RLR Weiner v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4340 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81680-RLR Green v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4339 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 7:21-cv-05573 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81764-RLR Seekircher v. Glaxosmithkline Biologicals, S.A. et al on 9/17/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 76 (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4338 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81679-RLR Harrison v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4337 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81677-RLR Mitchell v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4336 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81678-RLR Baertschi v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4335 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81676-RLR Gray v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4334 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81675-RLR Eddie v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4333 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81674-RLR Dison v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4332 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81673-RLR Casalina v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4330 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81672-RLR Gibson v. Pfizer,Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4329 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of New York Case Number 7:21-05573 Seekircher v. Glaxosmithkline Biologicals, S.A. et al with enclosed copy of the #4327 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4328 MDL Transmittal Letter Requesting Case from the Southern District of Iowa Case Number 4:21-00253 Frederick et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al with enclosed copy of the #4327 order of transfer from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4327 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-76) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida re: MDL 2924 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robin L. Rosenberg. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4322 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81671-RLR O'Connor v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4321 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81670-RLR Forester v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4331 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81751-RLR Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (pes)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4320 REPLY in Support re #3116 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #2832 MOTION for Leave to File TO FILE CONSOLIDATED MEDICAL MONITORING CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT, #2835 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,,,, DEFENDANTS OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR STRIKE filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Cheffo, Mark) Modified title text on 9/17/2021 (mc).
September 16, 2021 Filing 4319 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4107 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #3883 MDL Amended Complaint,, The Brand OTC Defendants' Rule 12 Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Economic Loss Class Complaint as Preempted by Federal Law and Incorporated Memorand filed by CHATTEM, INC., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Agneshwar, Anand)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4318 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81669-RLR Ward v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4317 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81668-RLR Pearson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4316 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81667-RLR Fischgrabe v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4315 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81666-RLR Dougherty v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4314 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81665-RLR Mosele v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4313 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81664-RLR De Leon v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4312 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81663-RLR Ferguson v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4311 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81662-RLR Copeland v. Pfizeer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4310 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81661-RLR Finkel v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4309 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81659-RLR Callegri v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4308 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81644-RLR Davis v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-5. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4307 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81658-RLR Burd v. Sanofi US Services, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4306 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81657-RLR Gallina v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4305 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81656-RLR Cianci et al v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4304 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81655-RLR Bornstein v. Pfizer, inc. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4303 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81654-RLR O'Neal v. Pfizer Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4302 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81652-RLR Armstrong v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4301 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81649-RLR Abukhdeir v. Pfizer, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4300 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81648-RLR Hayes v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4299 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81645-RLR Ibbetson v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4298 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81643-RLR Mann Jr. v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4297 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81639-RLR Mclean v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4296 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81638-RLR Pina v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4295 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81637-RLR Rouhani v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4294 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81635-RLR Miller v. Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4293 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81634-RLR Saiza v. Sanofi S.A. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4292 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81632-RLR Stefanski Jr. v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4291 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81630-RLR Collazo Rosario v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4290 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81629-RLR Lambert v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4289 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81628-RLR Smith v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4288 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81627-RLR Womack v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4287 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81626-RLR Doucet v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4286 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81625-RLR Cobarrubias et al v. GlaxoSmithKline, LLC. et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4285 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81624-RLR Worley v. GlaxoSmithKline et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4284 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81620-RLR Tochelli v. Sanofi SA et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4283 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81618-RLR Moreno-Rivera, Jr. v. Boehringer Ingelheim with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4282 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81615-RLR Galloway v. Sanofi S.A. et a with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4281 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01388 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81742-RLR Roman Mateo v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 9/16/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 75 (mc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4326 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Julius Donald Kearney, Sr. (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4325 CERTIFICATE of Understanding re Electronic Filing in The Southern District of Florida for Jesse L. Kearney (NEF sent to Attorney Admissions (ATTYADM)) (mc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4324 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND AGREEMENT to be Bound by HIPAA Qualified Protective Order by Robert Griffith re #4189 Protective Order #68 (mc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4323 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by JAMES MARTIN. (mc)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4280 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court has set aside December 2 and 3, 2021, to hold a Science Day and a Case Management Conference. The Court intends for these proceedings to be held in person. If possible, the Court will simultaneously broadcast the proceedings by Zoom and distribute Zoom information prior to the proceedings. An Order providing more detailed information for these proceedings will follow, including the time scheduled for the proceedings. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/15/2021. (sk01)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4279 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81614-RLR Wester et al v. Sanofi et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4278 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81613-RLR Tally et al v. Sanofi et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4277 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01396 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81737-RLR Martinez-Iera et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 9/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 75. (mc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4276 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Puerto Rico. Case Number 3:21-cv-01395 with documents 1-6. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81736-RLR Rodriguez-Otero et al v. GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al on 9/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 75. (mc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4275 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81612-RLR Spartaro v. Sanofi et al with documents 1-4. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR (mc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4274 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Robert C. Hilliard for / by Cera Richard-Straub. Responses due by 9/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hilliard, Robert)
September 15, 2021 Filing 4273 MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:21-cv-81610-RLR S