ORTIZ v. BENS AUTO REPAIR SHOP INC.
Plaintiff: JOSE D. ORTIZ
Defendant: BENS AUTO REPAIR SHOP INC. and BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC.
Case Number: 9:2021cv80122
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Dave Lee Brannon
Referring Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #6 Statement of Claim by BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC.. (Goerke, Steven)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Discovery Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon on 3/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Trial, Setting Pre-Trial Deadlines, Requiring Mediation, And Referring Certain Matters To Magistrate Judge: ( Jury Trial set for 1/31/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Calendar Call set for 1/25/2022 01:45 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Aileen M. Cannon., Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2021., Discovery due by 8/31/2021., Expert Discovery due by 8/31/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 4/30/2021., Mediation Deadline 9/10/2021., In Limine Motions due by 1/3/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 10/4/2021., Motions due by 10/4/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/3/2022.)( Mediation Deadline 9/10/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 4, 2021 Filing 13 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by JOSE D. ORTIZ (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norell, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC. (Goerke, Steven)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC.. (Goerke, Steven)
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by JOSE D. ORTIZ. BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC. served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Norell, Robert)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Requiring Joint Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties due by 3/5/2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
February 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mitchell Thomas McRae on behalf of BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC.. Attorney Mitchell Thomas McRae added to party BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC.(pty:dft). (McRae, Mitchell)
February 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Gerard Goerke on behalf of BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC.. Attorney Steven Gerard Goerke added to party BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC.(pty:dft). (Goerke, Steven)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 Statement of: Claim by JOSE D. ORTIZ re #4 Order of Requirements,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, (Norell, Robert)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against BENS AUTO REPAIR SHOP INC., filed by JOSE D. ORTIZ.(Norell, Robert)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon for purposes of a Settlement Conference. (Statement of Claim due by 2/8/2021). Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
January 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BENS AUTO REPAIR SHOP INC. (bb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BENS AUTO REPAIR SHOP INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14257540, filed by JOSE D. ORTIZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Norell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ORTIZ v. BENS AUTO REPAIR SHOP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENS AUTO REPAIR SHOP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEN'S AUTO REPAIR SHOP, INC.
Represented By: Mitchell Thomas McRae
Represented By: Steven Gerard Goerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE D. ORTIZ
Represented By: Robert Scott Norell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?