Doty v. ADT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Randy Doty
Defendant: ADT, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as ADT Security Services and Telesforo Aviles
Case Number: 9:2021cv80645
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Raag Singhal
2 Judge: Alicia O Valle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #56 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Motion for Summary Judgment is denied as to Plaintiffs claim for negligence. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (ail)
March 22, 2022 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of Zoom Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2022 before Judge Raag Singhal, 1-51 pages, Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/21/2022. (Shires, Karl)
January 21, 2022 Filing 76 Defendant's RESPONSE to #72 Statement PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
January 21, 2022 Filing 75 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #56 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
January 7, 2022 Filing 74 Exhibit List Index of Exhibits to Plaintiff Randy Doty's Response to Defendant ADT's Motion for Summary Judgment by Randy Doty.. (Raggio, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 72 Statement of: Material Facts and Additional Facts in Support of His Response to Defendant ADT's Motion for Summary Judgment by Randy Doty re #71 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, (Raggio, John)
January 7, 2022 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Randy Doty. Replies due by 1/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Aff of R. Doty, #2 Exhibit 2 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 Planck Dep, #4 Exhibit 4 Emond Dep, #5 Exhibit 5 (Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 Def ADT Ans and Obj to P's ROGs_3rd set, #8 Exhibit 8 (Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 9 Cole Dep (redacted), #10 Exhibit 10 Def ADT Ans and Obj to P's ROGs_1st set, #11 Exhibit 11 (Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 12 (Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 13 US v Aviles Factual Resume, #14 Exhibit 14 (Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 15 (Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 16 (Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 17 (Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 18 (Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 19 (Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 20 (Under Seal), #21 Exhibit 21 Expert Rep of E.B. Cole, PHD, #22 Exhibit 22 (Under Seal), #23 Exhibit 23 (Under Seal), #24 Exhibit 24 (Under Seal), #25 Exhibit 25 Email frm H. England to S. Doty, #26 Exhibit 26 (Under Seal), #27 Exhibit 27 (Under Seal), #28 Exhibit 28 Comparison Chart of ADT arguments, #29 Exhibit 29 North Dep, #30 Exhibit 30 (Under Seal), #31 Exhibit 31 (Under Seal), #32 Exhibit 32 Survey re ADT 01.27.20, #33 Exhibit 33 (Under Seal), #34 Exhibit 34 Screenshot frm ADT website)(Raggio, John)
January 7, 2022 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 73 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (2011237)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Case Number 20-60972-CIV-SINGHAL is CONSOLIDATED with Case Number 21-80645-CIV-SINGHAL.Henceforth, all pleadings and papers shall be filed only in Case No. 20-60972- CIV-SINGHAL and shall bear the new consolidated caption set forth by the Court on page 1 of this Order. However, Plaintiffs response and Defendants reply memorandum to ADT, LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment filed in Case No. 21-80645-CIV-SINGHAL shall be filed in that case. But all other motions and notices shall only be filed in Case No. 20-60972-CIV-SINGHAL. Case No. 21-80645-CIV-SINGHAL shall be ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED.Any documents filed in the administratively closed case in the future (exceptPlaintiffs response and Defendants reply memorandum to ADT, LLCs Motionfor Summary Judgment) shall be automatically stricken. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #27 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Randy Doty filed by Randy Doty, #56 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ADT, LLC, #43 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #27 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Randy Doty filed by Randy Doty. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
December 29, 2021 Cases associated per #70 Order. (asl)
December 29, 2021 Cases associated. (drz)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/7/2022. Replies due by 1/21/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/27/2021. (pb00)
December 22, 2021 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Summary Judgement Briefing Deadlines re #56 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Randy Doty. Responses due by 1/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raggio, John)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #48 Motion to Modify the Case Schedule. Discovery due by 1/19/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
December 16, 2021 Filing 66 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Randy Doty (Raggio, John)
December 9, 2021 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Modify the Case Schedule filed by Randy Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Raggio, John)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/31/2021. Replies due by 1/17/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/9/2021. (pb00)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #61 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Christopher Michael Brown representing Doty, Randy (Plaintiff) terminated. Attorney John W. Raggio of the Fears Nachawati, PLLC, will continue as counsel for the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/9/2021. (pb00)
December 8, 2021 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #56 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by Randy Doty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 61 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting John W. Raggio for Christopher Brown by Randy Doty. Attorney John Warren Raggio added to party Randy Doty(pty:pla). Responses due by 12/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Raggio, John)
December 7, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 60 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1039344)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting #52 Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (pes)
December 3, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE by ADT, LLC re #56 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT INDEX TO ADT LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (McLoone, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Filing 57 Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment by ADT, LLC re #56 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(McLoone, Jennifer)
December 3, 2021 Filing 56 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment by ADT, LLC. Responses due by 12/17/2021 (McLoone, Jennifer)
December 2, 2021 Filing 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Modify the Case Schedule filed by ADT, LLC. Replies due by 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McLoone, Jennifer)
December 2, 2021 Filing 54 Clerks Notice to Filer re #52 Unopposed MOTION To File Exhibits Under Seal . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (mc)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nicholas H. Rosinia. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/2/2021. (pb00)
December 2, 2021 Filing 52 Unopposed MOTION To File Exhibits Under Seal by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer) Modified relief on 12/2/2021 (mc).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ADT LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment shall not exceed 25 pages, double-spaced, 12-point font, with no excessive footnotes. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/1/2021. (pb00)
December 1, 2021 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
November 30, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicholas H. Rosinia. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15205966 by Randy Doty. Responses due by 12/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Nicholas H. Rosinia, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
November 18, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION to Modify the Case Schedule by Randy Doty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
November 18, 2021 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2021 before Judge Raag Singhal, 1-19 pages, Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2022. (Shires, Karl)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part #27 Motion to Certify Class. Plaintiff shall have until January 28, 2022 to dismiss the class allegations of the Amended Complaint and withdraw the Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 11/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
November 5, 2021 Filing 45 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Raag Singhal: Hearing on 138 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Stay Ruling on Motion for Class Certification held on 11/5/2021. Order forthcoming. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Jennifer Ann McLoone, Charles C. Eblen, Matthew Ryan McCarley, Nicholas Rosinia, Heather V. Davis, Amy K. Carter. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Karl Shires, 954-769-5496 / Karl_Shires@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pb00)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on Motion #43 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #27 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Randy Doty : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Raag Singhal. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified on 10/27/2021 (drz).
October 27, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #43 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #27 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Randy Doty . **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Per Order DE#44 . Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Raag Singhal. (drz)
October 26, 2021 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #27 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Randy Doty by Randy Doty. Responses due by 11/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline. Discovery to be completed by 11/19/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/20/2021. (pb00)
October 20, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline by Randy Doty. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
September 24, 2021 Filing 40 SUR REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Randy Doty filed by Randy Doty. (Brown, Christopher)
September 20, 2021 Filing 39 SUR REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Randy Doty filed by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Defendant ADT. Defendant may file a 3-page sur-reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class no later than 9/20/2021. Plaintiff may file a 2-page response to the sur-reply no later than 9/24/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/15/2021. (pb00)
September 14, 2021 Filing 37 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
September 8, 2021 Filing 36 REPLY to #35 Response/Reply (Other), Opposition to Class Certification by Randy Doty. (Brown, Christopher)
August 18, 2021 Filing 35 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum of Law to #27 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Randy Doty by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McLoone, Jennifer)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Certify Class. Responses due by 8/18/2021. Replies due by 9/8/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/10/2021. (pb00)
August 10, 2021 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 29 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(McLoone, Jennifer)
July 19, 2021 Filing 32 PARTIAL FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of ADT, LLC against Randy Doty on Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (asl).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #24 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 16, 2021 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Randy Doty (Brown, Christopher)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion Agreed Motion Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Defendants Opposition to Class Certification will be due on 8/11/2021 and Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Class Certification will be due on 9/1/2021. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/14/2021. (pb00)
July 13, 2021 Filing 28 Agreed MOTION Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule by ADT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLoone, Jennifer)
July 12, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Certify Class , MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Randy Doty by Randy Doty. Responses due by 7/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Brown, Christopher)
July 8, 2021 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ADT Inc. for ADT, LLC (McLoone, Jennifer)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRINGMEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 3/28/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 3/25/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Discovery due by 11/5/2021., Expert Discovery due by 11/5/2021., Mediation Deadline 11/12/2021., In Limine Motions due by 2/16/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2021., Motions due by 12/3/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/15/2022.). Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
July 6, 2021 Filing 24 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
July 6, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by ADT, LLC. (McLoone, Jennifer)
July 2, 2021 Filing 22 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Randy Doty (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
July 1, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Ann McLoone on behalf of ADT, LLC. Attorney Jennifer Ann McLoone added to party ADT, LLC(pty:dft). (McLoone, Jennifer)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to perfect service on or before July 6, 2021 re #1 Complaint, filed by Randy Doty, #4 Summons Issued. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jay Edelson. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/12/2021. (pb00)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Amy K. Carter. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/12/2021. (pb00)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney J. Eli Wade-Scott. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/12/2021. (pb00)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Heather Davis. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/12/2021. (pb00)
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Heather Davis. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14595285 by Randy Doty. Responses due by 4/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
April 9, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Amy Carter. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14595281 by Randy Doty. Responses due by 4/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS Order to Vacate re #8 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/9/2021. (eca)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Matthew R. McCarley. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/9/2021. (pb00)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for J. Eli Wade-Scott. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14591536 by Randy Doty. Responses due by 4/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jay Edelson. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14591510 by Randy Doty. Responses due by 4/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Christopher)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew R. McCarley. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14590632 by Randy Doty. Responses due by 4/22/2021 (Brown, Christopher)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/8/2021. (pb00)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 4/6/2021. Judge Aileen M. Cannon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (bms)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jay Edelson, Matthew R. McCarley and Amy M. Carter, mailing date April 2, 2021, (pt)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ADT, LLC, Telesforo Aviles. (drz)
April 2, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
April 2, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Dave Lee Brannon is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
April 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADT, LLC, Telesforo Aviles. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14573520, filed by Randy Doty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A - Factual Resume, #4 Exhibit B - Information, #5 Exhibit C - Plea Agreement)(Brown, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doty v. ADT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT, LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as ADT Security Services
Represented By: Jennifer Ann McLoone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telesforo Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Doty
Represented By: Christopher Michael Brown
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Amy M. Carter
Represented By: Heather V. Davis
Represented By: J. Eli Wade-Scott
Represented By: Amy K. Carter
Represented By: John Warren Raggio
Represented By: Nicholas H. Rosinia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?