EFN West Palm Motors Sales, LLC et al v. Hyundai Motor America
Plaintiff: North Palm Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Napleton's North Palm Hyundai, EFN West Palm Motors Sales, LLC d/b/a Napleton's West Palm Beach Hyundai, Florida Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, EFN West Palm Motors Sales, LLC doing business as Napleton's West Palm Beach Hyundai and North Palm Hyundai, LLC doing business as Napleton's North Palm Hyundai
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Case Number: 9:2021cv81050
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES Granting #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 7/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Christopher Genovese. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsel's pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 7/27/2021. (jrt)
July 27, 2021 Cases associated and Civil Case Terminated per DE #14 . Closing Case. (jbs)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Bruce E. Reinhart Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 7/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 26, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christopher Genovese. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14874733 by Hyundai Motor America. Responses due by 8/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification & Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear PHV)(Bertron, James)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Aileen M. Cannon for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 7/23/2021. Judge Raag Singhal no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (bms)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Hyundai Motor America (Bertron, James)
July 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Hyundai Motor America. Responses due by 8/4/2021 (Bertron, James)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 7, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Motor America identifying Corporate Parent Hyundai Motor Company for Hyundai Motor America (Bertron, James)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hyundai Motor America. Attorney James Andrew Bertron, Jr added to party Hyundai Motor America(pty:dft). (Bertron, James)
June 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/15/2021. (jhy)
June 14, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hyundai Motor America (jbs)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hyundai Motor America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14761969, filed by EFN West Palm Motors Sales, LLC d/b/a Napleton's West Palm Beach Hyundai, North Palm Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Napleton's North Palm Hyundai. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Bader, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EFN West Palm Motors Sales, LLC et al v. Hyundai Motor America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Palm Hyundai, LLC d/b/a Napleton's North Palm Hyundai
Represented By: Nicholas A Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EFN West Palm Motors Sales, LLC d/b/a Napleton's West Palm Beach Hyundai
Represented By: Nicholas A Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Represented By: Richard Neil Sox, Jr.
Represented By: W Kirby Bissell
Represented By: Nicholas A Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EFN West Palm Motors Sales, LLC doing business as Napleton's West Palm Beach Hyundai
Represented By: Richard Neil Sox, Jr.
Represented By: W Kirby Bissell
Represented By: Nicholas A Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Palm Hyundai, LLC doing business as Napleton's North Palm Hyundai
Represented By: Richard Neil Sox, Jr.
Represented By: W Kirby Bissell
Represented By: Nicholas A Bader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Motor America
Represented By: Christopher C. Genovese
Represented By: James Andrew Bertron, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?