Skulsky v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Skulsky
Defendant: Chattem Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, SANOFI S.A and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2021cv81057
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of New York. Case Number 1:21-cv-04633 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81057-RLR Skulsky v. Sanofi S.A. et al on 6/14/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred in from New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04633. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/7/2021) (sjo)
June 7, 2021 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (sjo)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/28/2021) (nb)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Anand Agneshwar dated May 27, 2021. Document filed by Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc...(Agneshwar, Anand)
May 25, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc)
May 25, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc.. Document filed by Chattem, Inc...(Agneshwar, Anand)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc.. Document filed by Sanofi US Services Inc...(Agneshwar, Anand)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Agneshwar, Anand)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 153724-2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24580509).Document filed by Sanofi US Services Inc., Chattem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Skulsky State Court Docket).(Agneshwar, Anand)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skulsky v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem Inc.
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Anand Agneshwar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI S.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Zousmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Skulsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?