Tebbutt et al v. Anderson
Plaintiff: Tim Tebbutt and June Heather Tebbutt
Defendant: Robert Anderson
Case Number: 9:2021cv81602
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE re #9 Clerks Entry/Non-Entry of Default. Plaintiffs' failure to file for a motion for default final judgment or notice of joint liability within the specified time will result in a dismissal without prejudice as to these Defendants. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to Robert Anderson. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/22/2021. (jas)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Affidavit. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 7 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Robert Anderson by Tim Tebbutt, June Heather Tebbutt. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jackson Pellingra, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Clerks Default)(Pellingra, Jackson)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Joint Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. (Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates Of Interested Parties due by 11/19/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tim Tebbutt, June Heather Tebbutt. Robert Anderson served on 9/14/2021, response/answer due 10/5/2021. (jas)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE signed by: Kenny Allen re #3 Summons Issued by June Heather Tebbutt, Tim Tebbutt (Minerley, Kenneth)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robert Anderson. (ebz)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Anderson. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14994200, filed by Tim Tebbutt, June Heather Tebbutt. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Robert Anderson, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint)(Minerley, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tebbutt et al v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Tebbutt
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Minerley
Represented By: Jackson Alexander Pellingra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Heather Tebbutt
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Minerley
Represented By: Jackson Alexander Pellingra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?