Radical Investments Ltd. v. Good Vibrations Entertainment LLC et al
Plaintiff: Radical Investments Ltd.
Defendant: Alex Lee Moore, Jr., Moniladae Coley, Charles Zohan Stein Esq., Good Vibrations Entertainment LLC, Alex Moore, Flex Moore, Prestige Pegasus LLC, Moniladai D. Coley, Charlie Stein, Davidovich Stein Law Group LLLP and RDS CARGO GROUP DWC LLC
Case Number: 9:2021cv81761
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 and #21 the Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consents to Designation, and Requests to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Brian T. Smith and Rinat Klier-Erlich. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/15/2021. (dsy)
November 10, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rinat Klier-Erlich. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15165594 by Davidovich Stein Law Group LLLP, Charles Zohan Stein Esq.. Responses due by 11/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolton, Seth)
November 10, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian T. Smith. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15165566 by Davidovich Stein Law Group LLLP, Charles Zohan Stein Esq.. Responses due by 11/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolton, Seth)
November 10, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Adam Kolton on behalf of Davidovich Stein Law Group LLLP, Charles Zohan Stein Esq.. Attorney Seth Adam Kolton added to party Davidovich Stein Law Group LLLP(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Adam Kolton added to party Charles Zohan Stein Esq. (pty:dft). (Kolton, Seth)
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Radical Investments Ltd. on Defendant Prestige Pegasus LLC (Longo, Ralph)
October 20, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Radical Investments Ltd. on Defendant Moniladai Coley (Longo, Ralph)
October 18, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Radical Investments Ltd. on Defendant Davidovich Stein Law Group (Longo, Ralph)
October 18, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Radical Investments Ltd. on Defendant Charles Z. Stein (Longo, Ralph)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 10/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (jas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Radical Investments Ltd. a St. Lucia Company against Moniladae Coley, Davidovich Stein Law Group LLLP, Good Vibrations Entertainment LLC, Alex Lee Moore, Jr, Prestige Pegasus LLC, Charles Zohan Stein Esq., filed by Radical Investments Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Amended Complaint (Redacted), #2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits to Amended Complaint)(Longo, Ralph)
September 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Order to File an Amended Complaint Clarifying the Citizenship of each Defendant. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint that clarifies the citizenship of each Defendant on or before September 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on September 26, 2021. (ahz)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO THE COURTS ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT CLARIFYING THE CITIZENSHIP OF EACH DEFENDANT re #9 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines by Radical Investments Ltd.. Responses due by 10/8/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Herzberg, Steven)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven B. Herzberg on behalf of Radical Investments Ltd.. Attorney Steven B. Herzberg added to party Radical Investments Ltd.(pty:pla). (Herzberg, Steven)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO CLARIFY CITIZENSHIP re #1 Complaint,, filed by Radical Investments Ltd. (Amended Complaint due by 9/24/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 9/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Ralph Robert Longo, IV (Longo, Ralph)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 EXHIBITS Exhibits to Plaintiff's Complaint 1-22 by Radical Investments Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Batch of Exhibits 1-22 (Redacted))(Longo, Ralph)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Moniladae Coley, Davidovich Stein Law Group LLLP, Good Vibrations Entertainment LLC, Alex Lee Moore, Jr, Prestige Pegasus LLC, RDS CARGO GROUP DWC LLC, Charles Zohan Stein Esq. (pes)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the complaint does not match the signature on the pdf document. The attorney listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pes)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Aliases Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the parties. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pes)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party names in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pes)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Radical Investments Ltd. a St. Lucia Company against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-15017384, payment transferred from : 9:21CV81755 Radical Investments Ltd. a St. Lucia Company vs. Good Vibrations Entertainment, a Florida Corporation, filed by Radical Investments Ltd., a St. Lucia Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons to Def. Coley, #3 Summon(s) Summons to Def. Davidovich, #4 Summon(s) Summons to Def. Good Vibrations, #5 Summon(s) Summons to Def. Moore, #6 Summon(s) Summons to Def. Prestige, #7 Summon(s) Summons to Def. RDS, #8 Summon(s) Summons to Def. Stein)(Longo, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radical Investments Ltd. v. Good Vibrations Entertainment LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Lee Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moniladae Coley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Zohan Stein Esq.
Represented By: Seth Adam Kolton
Represented By: Brian T. Smith
Represented By: Rinat Klier-Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Vibrations Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flex Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Pegasus LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moniladai D. Coley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Stein
Represented By: Seth Adam Kolton
Represented By: Brian T. Smith
Represented By: Rinat Klier-Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidovich Stein Law Group LLLP
Represented By: Seth Adam Kolton
Represented By: Brian T. Smith
Represented By: Rinat Klier-Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RDS CARGO GROUP DWC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radical Investments Ltd.
Represented By: Gerardo Alvaro Vazquez
Represented By: Ralph Robert Longo, IV
Represented By: Steven B. Herzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?