ICON EV, LLC v. SUN AND FUN DAYS INC.
Plaintiff: ICON EV, LLC
Defendant: SUN AND FUN DAYS INC. a Florida corporation doing business as PRIME GOLF CARS
Case Number: 9:2021cv81768
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME denying #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by SUN AND FUN DAYS INC.. Attorney Adam Gruder Wasch added to party SUN AND FUN DAYS INC.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wasch, Adam)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by ICON EV, LLC. SUN AND FUN DAYS INC. served on 10/15/2021, response/answer due 11/5/2021. (McConnell, Beatriz)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 12/2/2021., Discovery due by 3/24/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/2/2021., In Limine Motions due by 4/7/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 4/7/2022., Motions due by 4/7/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/9/2022.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William Matthewman on 10/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/1/2022 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for to enter a Scheduling Order with notices (NEFs for Events only) for all filings in case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to SUN AND FUN DAYS INC.. (kpe)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by ICON EV, LLC (McConnell, Beatriz)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by ICON EV, LLC as to SUN AND FUN DAYS INC.. (McConnell, Beatriz)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Kathryn J. Copeland, mailing date September 20, 2021, (pt)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SUN AND FUN DAYS INC. (pcs)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUN AND FUN DAYS INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15021324, filed by c/o Beatriz McConnel ICON EV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s))(McConnell, Beatriz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ICON EV, LLC v. SUN AND FUN DAYS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICON EV, LLC
Represented By: David Shawn Delrahim
Represented By: Beatriz Sanchez McConnell
Represented By: Kathryn J. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN AND FUN DAYS INC. a Florida corporation doing business as PRIME GOLF CARS
Represented By: Adam Gruder Wasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?