Hornig et al v. Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edward Hornig, Jr. and Cyndi Hornig
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi U.S. Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Inc Pfizer
Case Number: 9:2021cv81831
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 10/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction. Document Filed in Wrong Case; DE# 14 and DE# 15 , Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 21-cv-81381. (jas)
September 29, 2021 Filing 13 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Nebraska. Case Number 8:21-cv-00349 with documents 1-10. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-81831-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number Hornig et al v. Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC et al on 9/29/2021 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 77. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 12 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 11 Case transferred in from Nebraska; Case Number 8:21-cv-00349. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
September 27, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924., Civil Case Terminated. (Attachments: #1 MDL Letter) (MKR)
September 27, 2021 Filing 9 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (ADB)
September 27, 2021 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Florida. Original electronic file sent. (MKR)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER by Clerk regarding Complaint #1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Pfizer, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Domina, David)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Domina, David)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Sanofi US Services, Inc regarding Complaint, #1 . (Domina, David)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Sanofi-Aventis US LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Domina, David)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4471773), by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Edward Hornig, Jr., Cyndi Hornig (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Short Form Complaint)(Domina, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hornig et al v. Sanofi-Aventis US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hornig, Jr.
Represented By: Christian T. Williams
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyndi Hornig
Represented By: Christian T. Williams
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc Pfizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?