Spindler v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al
Plaintiff: Richard Spindler
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc. and JANE DOE
Case Number: 9:2021cv82012
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 25 Clerks Notice to Filer re #24 Reply to Response to Motion,. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (dj)
December 15, 2021 Filing 24 Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Their re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (D.E. 1-3) filed by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. (Glazer, Ari) Modified on 12/16/2021 (dj).
December 8, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (D.E. 1-3) filed by Richard Spindler. Replies due by 12/15/2021. (Goldberger, Matthew)
November 29, 2021 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc. (Glazer, Ari)
November 24, 2021 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (D.E. 1-3) Declaration of Ari J. Glazer filed by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Requisition Order Dated March 18, 2021)(Glazer, Ari)
November 24, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (D.E. 1-3) by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 12/8/2021 (Glazer, Ari)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 and #18 the Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consents to Designation, and Requests to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Robert Steiner and Malavika Rao. The Court reserves the power to withdraw permission for special appearance prior to and during the time of trial. Failure to abide by any Court order or failure to appear at any scheduled matter may result in immediate revocation of counsels' pro hac vice status. Local counsel must be ready to adequately represent the party at any time, including conducting the actual trial. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/17/2021. (dsy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 18 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Malavika Rao. Corrected Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 11/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Ari)
November 16, 2021 Filing 17 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert Steiner. Corrected Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 11/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Ari)
November 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Striking #14 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert Steiner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Fili filed by Medtox Laboratories, Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America, #15 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Malavika Rao. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing filed by Medtox Laboratories, Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc. (Glazer, Ari)
November 16, 2021 Filing 15 STRICKEN Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Malavika Rao. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 11/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Ari) Modified per DE#16 NOTICE OF STRIKING on 11/16/2021 (ebz).
November 16, 2021 Filing 14 STRICKEN Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert Steiner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 11/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Ari) Modified per DE#16 NOTICE OF STRIKING on 11/16/2021 (ebz).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Attorneys Robert Steiner DE#9 and Malavika Rao DE#10 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Local counsel may submit a renewed motion for admission to appear pro hac vice that fully complies with Local Rule 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorneys. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of #11 the Order Granting Motion to Drop Defendant Jane Doe, #8 Defendants Laboratory Corporation of America and Medtox Laboratories, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint is granted. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before November 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/16/2021. (dsy)
November 16, 2021 Attorney Malavika A. Rao representing Laboratory Corporation of America (Defendant) and Medtox Laboratories, Inc. (Defendant); Attorney Robert I. Steiner representing Laboratory Corporation of America (Defendant) and Medtox Laboratories, Inc. (Defendant); Activated. (pt)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DROP. The Motion DE#7 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall TERMINATE Jane Doe as a Defendant. JANE DOE (in her capacity as an employee of LABORATORY CORPORATION OF AMERICA) terminated. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
November 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Malavika Rao. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15167433 by JANE DOE, Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 11/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Ari)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert Steiner. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15167426 by JANE DOE, Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. Responses due by 11/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Ari)
November 11, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glazer, Ari)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Party by Richard Spindler. Responses due by 11/24/2021 (Goldberger, Matthew)
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN REMOVAL CASES. (Status Report due by 11/29/2021) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. To better manage the orderly progress of the case, it is hereby ORDERED that no Defendant shall file a response or answer until all Defendants in this action have been served. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings for Laboratory Corporation of America, Medtox Laboratories, Inc. (Glazer, Ari)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Robert Steiner and Malavika Rao, mailing date November 2, 2021, (pt)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Richard Spindler v. Laboratory Corporation of America, et al.) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15141286, filed by JANE DOE, Medtox Laboratories, Inc., Laboratory Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Ari J. Glazer, #3 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - State Court Docket and Filings, #5 Exhibit C - Defendants' Corporate Filings, #6 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Settlement Demand)(Glazer, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spindler v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Spindler
Represented By: Matthew Alan Goldberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America
Represented By: Malavika A. Rao
Represented By: Robert I. Steiner
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtox Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Malavika A. Rao
Represented By: Robert I. Steiner
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Represented By: Malavika A. Rao
Represented By: Robert I. Steiner
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Glazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?