Leach v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patrick J.P. Leach
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 9:2022cv80315
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to file an action in this Court. The Complaint filed at DE #1 is deemed timely filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/9/2022. (jgy)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 3/3/2022 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS900007763. (drz)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #1 Complaint filed by Patrick J.P. Leach. Case not filed with required filing fees of $ 402.00 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1914(a), and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Summons(es) will not be issued until the filing fee is paid or an order granting the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is entered. Civil Cover Sheet not filed pursuant to Local Rule 3.3. (mab)
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time for filing an action in this court by Patrick J.P. Leach. Responses due by 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(mab)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mab)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Patrick J.P. Leach. Filing fee of $402 not paid/No IFP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summon(s))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leach v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick J.P. Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?