Goetz et al v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Plaintiff: James E Goetz and Baum Hedlund Aristei and Goldman, PC, a Professional Corporation
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Case Number: 9:2022cv81371
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by U.S. Food and Drug Administration. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party U.S. Food and Drug Administration (pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
September 6, 2022 Filing 11 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Southern District of Florida. Case Number 3:22-cv-04768 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:22-cv-81371-RLR. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-2924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (pes)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (pes)
September 6, 2022 Filing 9 Case transferred in from California Northern; Case Number 3:22-cv-04768. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes).
September 6, 2022 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) by MDL Panel on 9/2/2022. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James E Goetz, Baum Hedlund Aristei and Goldman, PC, a Professional Corporation. U.S. Food and Drug Administration served on 8/23/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 25, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Baum Hedlund Aristei and Goldman, PC, a Professional Corporation, James E Goetz re #1 Complaint,, #2 Proposed Summons (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 22, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Food and Drug Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2022)
August 19, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 19, 2022 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/2/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 19, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Food and Drug Administration ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17458189.). Filed byJames E Goetz, Baum Hedlund Aristei and Goldman, PC, a Professional Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-FOIA Request, #2 Exhibit 2-Correspondence with FDA, #3 Exhibit 3-FOIA Appeal, #4 Exhibit 4-FDA Appeal Denial, #5 Exhibit 5-Goetz Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6-MDL Order re Spaulding Subpoena, #7 Exhibit 7-MDL Order re Objections to Order re Spaulding Subpoena, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wisner, Robert) (Filed on 8/19/2022)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goetz et al v. U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Goetz
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baum Hedlund Aristei and Goldman, PC, a Professional Corporation
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?