Hemmeter v. Signorelli et al
Plaintiff: Debi Hemmeter
Defendant: Thomas Signorelli an individual doing business as WS CAPITAL FUND and WS Capital Fund Advisors, LLC
Case Number: 9:2022cv81808
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ryon M McCabe
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2023 Filing 48 JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Plaintiff DEBI HEMMETER against the Defendants THOMAS SIGNORELLI and WS CAPITAL FUND ADVISORS, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 4/26/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Consent Judgment Entry [DE 45] and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Consent Judgment Entry [DE 41]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 4/26/2023. (mw00)
April 26, 2023 Filing 46 PAPERLESS Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe: Zoom hearing held on 4/25/2023 regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Consent Judgment [DE 41]. The Court hereby orders as follows: The Plaintiff may provide the Court with a consent judgment discussed during the hearing on or before April 26, 2023, by 5:00 PM. The Defendant may respond by 5:00 pm on April 27, 2023. Attorney appearances: Alex McCallion, Esq. for the Plaintiff; Alan Espy, Esq. for the Defendant. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 07 minutes. (Digital 02:59-03:06 Entire Zoom Hearing) (mw00)
April 25, 2023 Filing 45 MOTION for Judgment Proposed Order for Consent Judgment by Debi Hemmeter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kupcinskas, Alicia)
April 25, 2023 Filing 44 Notice: Today's hearing at 3:00 PM on Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Consent Judgment [DE 41] shall be conducted via Zoom video teleconference (VTC) in the West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Ryon McCabe. To log in through ZoomGov Meeting, use Meeting ID: 160 562 6259 and Passcode: 508973. All participants at the hearing are expected to appear by both audio and video. (mw00)
April 24, 2023 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Debra Hemmeter signed by: Debra Hemmeter by Debi Hemmeter (Kupcinskas, Alicia)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING a Zoom hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Consent Judgment [DE 41]. A hearing shall be conducted via Zoom video teleconference (VTC) on April 25, 2023, at 3:00 PM in the West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Ryon McCabe. One hour reserved. On or before April 24, 2023, the parties should file affidavits, or other suitable evidence, to allow the Court to determine what, if any, payments have been made on the settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 4/18/2023. (mw00)
April 10, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Debi Hemmeter. Responses due by 4/24/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Notice of Default)(Kupcinskas, Alicia)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (lgr)
March 27, 2023 Filing 39 Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Debi Hemmeter (Kupcinskas, Alicia)
March 24, 2023 Filing 38 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe: Zoom Settlement Conference held on 03/24/2023. Plaintiff present with counsel, Alex McCallion, Esq. Defendant present with counsel, Alan Espy, Esq. Good faith negotiations held. CASE SETTLED IN FULL. The Parties agreed to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction as part of the settlement. Dismissal papers shall be filed in accordance with the settlement agreement, with the undersigned reserving jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement. Start time 1:00 PM. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 34 minutes (Digital 01:00-04:34 entire Zoom SC) (mw00)
March 21, 2023 Filing 37 The Court is not in receipt of the Defendant's settlement memorandum pursuant to docket entry 34. Please submit/resubmit the settlement memorandum to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 3/21/2023. (mw00)
March 10, 2023 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Scott Randall Rost re #35 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Scott Randall Rost has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in any pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information (pt)
March 9, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Scott Randall Rost (Rost, Scott)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference Via Zoom VTC. Settlement Conference set for 3/24/2023 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe. Parties' confidential memos due by or on Tuesday, March 21, 2023 at 12:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 3/8/2023. See attached document for full details. (mw00)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER This matter has been referred to the undersigned for a settlement conference #32 . The parties shall contact the undersigned's Chambers by telephone (561-803-3470) or by email (McCabe@flsd.uscourts.gov) with three mutually agreed upon dates for a settlement conference in accordance with the Court's Order #32 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 3/3/2023. (mw00)
March 3, 2023 Filing 32 Referral for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (lgr)
March 3, 2023 Filing 31 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II: Zoom Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2023 re #27 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Debi Hemmeter. Attorney Appearance(s): Alex J. McCallion, Alicia Marie Kupcinskas, Alan Clayton Espy, Court Reporter: Ilona Lupowitz, 305-523-5737 / Ilona_lupowitz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (gp)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER providing Zoom Information for hearing on March 3, 2023 at 11:30 A.M. The Zoom conference can be accessed here: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603626919?pwd=VEMxT3lTVW9YZzhVN0pTWXJtQ0lxQT09. The Meeting ID is 160 362 6919 and the Passcode is 499042. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/1/2023. (lgr)
February 26, 2023 Reset Hearing as to #27 MOTION to Reopen Case . Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2023 11:30 AM before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. PER DE#29 (cds)
February 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER rescheduling hearing on Motion to Reactivate Case, ECF No. #27 , via Zoom to March 3, 2023 at 11:30 A.M. The Zoom conference log-in information will be provided by separate order. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/24/2023. (lgr)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER setting hearing on Motion to Reactivate Case, ECF No. #27 via Zoom on March 1, 2023 at 4:00 P.M. The Zoom conference log-in information will be provided by separate order. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/17/2023. (lgr)
February 17, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Reopen Case by Debi Hemmeter. (Rost, Scott)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Administratively Closing Case. Motions terminated: #23 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by Thomas Signorelli. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/10/2023. See attached document for full details. (lgr)
February 10, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE by Thomas Signorelli Joint Notice to Court (Espy, Alan)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER requesting clarification as to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. #23 . By tomorrow, February 10, 2023, at 5:00 P.M., the parties shall submit a joint notice informing the Court as to whether the representation in Defendant's Motion that "the parties have been engaged in settlement negotiations and have reached a tentative settlement agreement" includes all named Defendants, even though there is no indication that service has been perfected as to Defendant WS Capital Fund Advisors, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/9/2023. (lgr)
February 9, 2023 Filing 23 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Thomas Signorelli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Espy, Alan)
January 30, 2023 Set Response/Answer Due Deadline: Thomas Signorelli response/answer due 2/15/2023; WS Capital Fund Advisors, LLC response/answer due 2/15/2023. PER DE#22 (cds)
January 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time, ECF No. #21 . Defendant shall file a response to the Amended Complaint on or before February 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/28/2023. (lgr)
January 27, 2023 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Thomas Signorelli. (Espy, Alan)
January 27, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by Thomas Signorelli Notice of Appearance and Email Designation. Attorney Alan Clayton Espy added to party Thomas Signorelli(pty:dft). (Espy, Alan)
January 26, 2023 Filing 19 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Debi Hemmeter (Battern, Alicia)
January 26, 2023 Filing 18 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (drz)
January 26, 2023 Filing 17 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Debi Hemmeter (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Battern, Alicia)
January 26, 2023 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Debi Hemmeter (Battern, Alicia)
January 12, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Thomas Signorelli, WS Capital Fund Advisors, LLC filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Debi Hemmeter.(Battern, Alicia)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion to Amend Complaint, ECF No. #13 . Plaintiff shall file Amended Complaint on the docket separate and apart from Plaintiff's Motion on or before January 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/12/2023. (lgr)
January 5, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Debi Hemmeter. Responses due by 1/19/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Battern, Alicia)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/4/2023. See attached document for full details. (lgr)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for attorney Alex J. McCallion, ECF No. #10 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/4/2023. (lgr)
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alex J. McCallion. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16209848 by Debi Hemmeter. Responses due by 1/17/2023 (Rost, Scott)
December 28, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Thomas Signorelli. (cds)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Perfect Service. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (lgr)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the contact information for attorney Alicia Marie Battern re #5 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. (cw)
November 29, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address or secondary email information for attorney Alicia Marie Battern re #5 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney has not followed the required procedures for updating their address or secondary email information with the Court. Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their address information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Court's website for detailed instructions. #www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information. (cw)
November 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Alicia Marie Battern (Battern, Alicia)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (nwn)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thomas Signorelli, WS Capital Fund Advisors, LLC. (nwn)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thomas Signorelli, WS Capital Fund Advisors LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16115489, filed by Debi Hemmeter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - Signorelli, #5 Summon(s) Proposed Summons - WS Capital Fund Advisors)(Battern, Alicia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hemmeter v. Signorelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debi Hemmeter
Represented By: Scott Randall Rost
Represented By: Alicia Marie Battern
Represented By: Alex J. McCallion
Represented By: Alicia Marie Kupcinskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Signorelli an individual doing business as WS CAPITAL FUND
Represented By: Alan Clayton Espy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WS Capital Fund Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?