MISTRAL AVIATION, LLC v. BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC et al
Plaintiff: MISTRAL AVIATION, LLC
Defendant: BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, TR REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC, RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., RHCF INC., RHCF TWO INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC. and RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC.
Case Number: 9:2022cv81940
Filed: December 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Jane Barney on behalf of BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF INC., RHCF TWO INC., RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC., TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, TR REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC. Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party EG REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party M REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party NH REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party RHCF INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party RHCF TWO INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party TR REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Jane Barney added to party WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC(pty:dft). (Barney, Sarah)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff may file any reply in support of the Motion for Remand #10 on or before February 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/9/2023. (kts)
February 8, 2023 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by MISTRAL AVIATION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Juarez, Michelle)
February 3, 2023 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,, filed by BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF INC., RHCF TWO INC., RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC., TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, TR REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC. (Fenton-Valdivia, Lauren)
February 3, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF INC., RHCF TWO INC., RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC., TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, TR REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC. Replies due by 2/10/2023. (Fenton-Valdivia, Lauren)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kalie Marie Maniglia representing BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant) and ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant) and EG REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and TR REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and NH REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and M REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC (Defendant); and TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC (Defendant); and RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC. (Defendant); and RHCF INC. (Defendant); and RHCF TWO INC. (Defendant); and RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC. (Defendant); and RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC. (Defendant); withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
January 30, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kalie M. Maniglia for / by BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF INC., RHCF TWO INC., RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC., TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, TR REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC. Responses due by 2/13/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maniglia, Kalie)
January 19, 2023 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT Removal by BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF INC., RHCF TWO INC., RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC., TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, TR REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC (Fenton-Valdivia, Lauren)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before February 3, 2023, Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand #10 and any reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint #6 . Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/19/2023. (kts)
January 18, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, #10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF INC., RHCF TWO INC., RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC., TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, TR REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenton-Valdivia, Lauren)
January 13, 2023 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,, filed by MISTRAL AVIATION, LLC. Replies due by 1/20/2023. (Juarez, Michelle)
January 13, 2023 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by MISTRAL AVIATION, LLC. (Cohen, Jordan)
January 10, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Lauren Fenton-Valdivia (Fenton-Valdivia, Lauren)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint #6 on or before January 13, 2023. Moving forward, any requests for extension or enlargement must be filed sufficiently in advance of the deadline at issue. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/6/2023. (kts)
January 5, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by MISTRAL AVIATION, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Juarez, Michelle)
December 23, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,,, by BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF INC., RHCF TWO INC., RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC., TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, TR REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC. Responses due by 1/6/2023 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua J. Cauhorn, Esq., #2 Affidavit of Larry Rice, #3 Affidavit of Rubhen Rice)(Fenton-Valdivia, Lauren)
December 23, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF INC., RHCF TWO INC., RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC., RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC., TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, TR REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC (Fenton-Valdivia, Lauren)
December 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN REMOVAL CASES (Removal Status Report due by 1/19/2023.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 16, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
December 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Declaratory Relief) Filing fee $402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-16178312, payment transferred from : 22CV81934 Mistrial Aviation LLC vs. Birch Hill Real Estate, LLC, et al., filed by MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF TWO INC., KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC, BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC, RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC., WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC, TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC, RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC., PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC, NH REAL ESTATE LLC, ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC, MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC, MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC, WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC, MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC, RHCF INC., LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC, EG REAL ESTATE LLC, M REAL ESTATE LLC, RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC., TR REAL ESTATE LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fenton-Valdivia, Lauren) No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed. Modified Text/Attachment Description on 12/16/2022 (nwn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MISTRAL AVIATION, LLC v. BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MISTRAL AVIATION, LLC
Represented By: Jordan Scott Cohen
Represented By: Michelle Alexa Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIRCH HILL REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLSWORTH REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EG REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TR REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEWAUNEE REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANCASTER REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAPLE LANE REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENOMINEE REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINERAL POINT REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKSIDE REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUTH REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMS BAY ASSISTED LIVING LLC
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TNIOP REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAMS BAY REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WISCONSIN RAPIDS REAL ESTATE LLC
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICE HEALTHCARE FACILITIES OF WISCONSIN INC.
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHCF INC.
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHCF TWO INC.
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICE HOUSING FACILITIES INC.
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICE HOUSING FACILITIES TWO INC.
Represented By: Kalie Marie Maniglia
Represented By: Lauren Fenton-Valdivia
Represented By: Sarah Jane Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?