SCHNEIDER v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: staci schneider
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 9:2023cv80047
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS, granting #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Amended Complaint due by 3/20/2023. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/9/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee)
March 8, 2023 Filing 27 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of North America (Gerson, Shari)
March 6, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM pursuant Order to Show Cause re #25 filed by STACI SCHNEIDER. Replies due by 3/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Robert)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. Show Cause Response due by 3/7/2023. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 3/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Immediate Depositions of Jefferey H. and Shari Gerson and for an Early Rule 16 Pretrial Conference given Judge Rosenberg's Scheduling Order (ECF No. 21). The denial is without prejudice to Plaintiff noticing the requested depositions and Defendants objecting to the depositions or moving for a protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/24/2023. (kso)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING ZOOM DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE. Final Discovery Status Conference set for 5/30/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Status Report due by 5/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee) Modified on 2/22/2023 (mee).
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee)
February 21, 2023 Final Discovery Status Conference set for 5/30/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart per d.e. #23 Order. (mee)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 7/1/2023., Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2023., Jury Trial set for 11/20/2023 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 11/15/2023 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 10/4/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Mediation Deadline 8/18/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 8/18/2023.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 8/18/2023.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to withdraw and/or substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery.. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 17, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by Life Insurance Company of North America re #17 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Garcia, Kelly Jean)
February 16, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Immediate Depositions of Jeffrey H. and Shari Gerson filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Replies due by 2/23/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Gerson, Shari)
February 14, 2023 Filing 18 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Life Insurance Company of North America. Responses due by 2/28/2023 (Gerson, Shari)
February 9, 2023 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Life Insurance Company of North America (Gerson, Shari)
February 8, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Jean Howard Garcia on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Kelly Jean Howard Garcia added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft). (Garcia, Kelly Jean)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER taking under advisement #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Immediate Depositions of Jeffrey H. and Shari Gerson and for an Early Rule 16 Pretrial Conference. Defendant shall respond to the Motion on or before February 16, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/8/2023. (kso)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE #12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Immediate Depositions of Jeffrey H. and Shari Gerson filed by STACI SCHNEIDER. Motions referred to Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/7/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee)
February 2, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by STACI SCHNEIDER. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 1/25/2023, response/answer due 2/15/2023. (Rubin, Robert)
February 2, 2023 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Immediate Depositions of Jeffrey H. and Shari Gerson by STACI SCHNEIDER. Responses due by 2/16/2023 (Rubin, Robert)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (mee)
January 26, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shari Lyn Gerson on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Shari Lyn Gerson added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft). (Gerson, Shari)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (pcs)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by STACI SCHNEIDER (Rubin, Robert)
January 16, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee $402.00, receipt number AFLSDC-16242200, Electronic Civil Case Filing re 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, (Rubin, Robert)
January 16, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by STACI SCHNEIDER re 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (See ECF 4) (Rubin, Robert)
January 13, 2023 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (nwn)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (nwn)
January 13, 2023 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $402.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (nwn)
January 12, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
January 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive relief under E.R.I.S.A. against Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fees $ 402.00. Not Paid/No IFP, filed by staci schneider.(Rubin, Robert) Modified Text on 1/13/2023 (nwn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHNEIDER v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: staci schneider
Represented By: Robert Ian Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Shari Lyn Gerson
Represented By: Kelly Jean Howard Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?