TOMATO HOUSE LLC. v. EVENSEN FARMS INC. et al
Plaintiff: TOMATO HOUSE LLC.
Defendant: EVENSEN FARMS INC. and RALPH SAMUEL EVENSEN, JR.
Case Number: 9:2023cv80272
Filed: February 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Bruce E Reinhart
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499 Agricultural Commodities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Motion is denied without prejudice because, pursuant to Rule 65(a), a preliminary injunction may only issue upon notice to the adverse party. The Plaintiff may renew its motion at such time as a Defendant appears in this action. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO PERMIT ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENAS FOR THE PURPOSE OF ATTEMPTING TO LEARN THE NAME AND ADDRESS OF THE PERSON(S) BEHIND EVENSEN FARMS INC.: ORDER granting #13 Motion. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Dismissing Party RALPH SAMUEL EVENSEN, JR. Defendant Ralph Samuel Evensen, Jr. is dismissed from the case, and the Temporary Restraining Order [DE 7] is vacated as to Ralph Samuel Evensen, Jr. The Temporary Restraining Order [DE 7] is not vacated as to Evensen Farms Inc. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/27/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
February 27, 2023 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the contact information for attorney Christopher Donald Cathey re #11 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. (cw)
February 27, 2023 Filing 16 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/27/2023. Total time in court: 50 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Robert Eric Goldman, Court Reporter: Pauline Stipes, 561-803-3434 / Pauline_Stipes@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mg)
February 26, 2023 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM of Law re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Dissipation of PACA Trust Assets by TOMATO HOUSE LLC.. (Goldman, Robert)
February 26, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE by TOMATO HOUSE LLC. of Filing Declaration of Robert E. Goldman re Service of TRO (Goldman, Robert)
February 26, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Permit Issuance of Supboenas to Attempt to Locate the Name and Address of the Person(s) Behind Evensen Farms Inc. by TOMATO HOUSE LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Goldman, Robert)
February 26, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Ralph Samuel Evensen, Jr. by TOMATO HOUSE LLC. (Goldman, Robert)
February 24, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Christopher Donald Cathey (Cathey, Christopher)
February 23, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Donald Cathey on behalf of RALPH SAMUEL EVENSEN, JR. Attorney Christopher Donald Cathey added to party RALPH SAMUEL EVENSEN, JR(pty:dft). (Cathey, Christopher)
February 23, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by TOMATO HOUSE LLC. re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Dissipation of PACA Trust Assets (Declaration of Robert E. Goldman w/ Exhibits) (Goldman, Robert)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ONSERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/21/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 2/27/2023 10:30 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg See attached document for full details. (ccr) ORDER [VACATED] AS TO RALPH SAMUEL EVENSEN, JR. The Temporary Restraining Order is [NOT] vacated as to Evensen Farms, Inc. Per Order, DE#18 . Modified text on 2/28/2023 (nan).
February 21, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Prevent Dissipation of PACA Trust Assets by TOMATO HOUSE LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Alberto Cantu, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mark Vestal, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Robert E. Goldman)(Goldman, Robert)
February 21, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order to Prevent Dissipation of PACA Trust Assets by TOMATO HOUSE LLC.. Responses due by 3/7/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Alberto Cantu, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Mark Vestal, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Robert E. Goldman, #4 Exhibit D - Prior TRO's, #5 Certification by Attorney re No Notice, #6 Text of Proposed Order Granting TRO)(Goldman, Robert)
February 21, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOMATO HOUSE LLC. (Goldman, Robert)
February 21, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to RALPH SAMUEL EVENSEN, JR, EVENSEN FARMS INC. (rbe)
February 20, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
February 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RALPH SAMUEL EVENSEN, JR, EVENSEN FARMS INC.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16345760, filed by TOMATO HOUSE LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Evenson Farms Inc., #2 Summon(s) Ralph Evenson, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOMATO HOUSE LLC. v. EVENSEN FARMS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMATO HOUSE LLC.
Represented By: Robert Eric Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVENSEN FARMS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RALPH SAMUEL EVENSEN, JR.
Represented By: Christopher Donald Cathey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?