Rosenthal v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan M. Rosenthal
Defendant: United States of America, United States Internal Revenue Service and Commissioner of the United States Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 9:2024cv80354
Filed: March 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: David S Leibowitz
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Filing 28 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #25 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 27 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
April 29, 2024 Filing 27 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Jonathan M. Rosenthal. Commissioner of the United States Internal Revenue Service served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 6/21/2024; United States Internal Revenue Service served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 6/21/2024; United States of America served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 6/21/2024. (See DE#25 for document images). (jas)
April 29, 2024 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas S. Willingham on behalf of United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. Attorney Nicholas S. Willingham added to party United States Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas S. Willingham added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Willingham, Nicholas)
April 24, 2024 Filing 25 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jonathan M. Rosenthal. Commissioner of the United States Internal Revenue Service served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024; United States Internal Revenue Service served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024; United States of America served on 4/22/2024, response/answer due 5/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Yanez, Anthony)
April 23, 2024 Filing 24 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #20 Certificate of Service, #21 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see DE# 22 , and DE# 23 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
April 23, 2024 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Jonathan M. Rosenthal. (See DE#21 for document image). (jas)
April 23, 2024 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Jonathan M. Rosenthal, United States of America. (See DE#20 for document for image). (jas)
April 23, 2024 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan M. Rosenthal (Yanez, Anthony)
April 23, 2024 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan M. Rosenthal (Yanez, Anthony)
April 9, 2024 Filing 19 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #13 Certificate of Service, #14 Certificate of Service, #15 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The documents were re-docketed by the Clerk, see 16 , 17 , 18 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
April 9, 2024 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #15 Certificate of Service filed by Jonathan M. Rosenthal. (jas)
April 9, 2024 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #14 Certificate of Service filed by Jonathan M. Rosenthal. (jas)
April 9, 2024 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #13 Certificate of Service filed by Jonathan M. Rosenthal. (jas)
April 9, 2024 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan M. Rosenthal re #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Issued as to USA Daniel Werfel Commissioner of the USA IRS (Yanez, Anthony)
April 9, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan M. Rosenthal re #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Issued as to USA Internal Revenue Service (Yanez, Anthony)
April 9, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jonathan M. Rosenthal re #1 Complaint, #9 Summons Issued as to USA (Yanez, Anthony)
April 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Striking by Jonathan M. Rosenthal (Yanez, Anthony)
April 8, 2024 Filing 11 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #10 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and LR 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (jas)
April 5, 2024 Filing 10 STRICKEN per DE#12 , NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Yanez on behalf of Jonathan M. Rosenthal. (Yanez, Anthony) Modified text on 4/8/2024 (jas).
April 4, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the United States Internal Revenue Service, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. (kpe)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jonathan M. Rosenthal (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Yanez, Anthony)
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) will not be issued. Defendants' address is not listed. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached. (ls)
April 2, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jonathan M. Rosenthal (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Yanez, Anthony)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Yanez on behalf of Jonathan M. Rosenthal. Attorney Anthony Yanez added to party Jonathan M. Rosenthal(pty:pla). (Yanez, Anthony)
March 25, 2024 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney James M. Bandoblu, Jr., mailing date March 25, 2024, (pt)
March 22, 2024 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document(No Venue Selected on Civil Cover Sheet). The Clerks Office confirmed Palm Beach (Office - West Palm Beach) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (wce)
March 22, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge David S. Leibowitz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
March 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America, Daniel Werfel. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17390080, filed by Jonathan M. Rosenthal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaplan, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenthal v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan M. Rosenthal
Represented By: Charles Henry Kaplan
Represented By: Anthony Yanez
Represented By: James M. Bandoblu, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Nicholas S. Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Nicholas S. Willingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the United States Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?